Palifka v. Fischer Property Group LLC
Plaintiff: Kenneth Palifka
Defendant: Fischer Property Group LLC, Willi Schmidt d/b/a Schmidt Property Maintenance and Willi Schmidt doing business as Schmidt Property Maintenance
3Rd Party Defendant: USA
Case Number: 3:2023cv00101
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Robert A Richardson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2023 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Supplement Return - Signed Green Card Acknowledgment filed by Kenneth Palifka. (O'Brien, Gregory)
March 20, 2023 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Willi Schmidt* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregory E. O'Brien* *Moore, O'Brien & Foti* * 891 Straits Turnpike* *Middlebury, CT 06762*. (Samson, Jessalyn)
March 16, 2023 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Kenneth Palifka.(O'Brien, Gregory)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Please read full text of attached Order for details. Discovery due by 3/1/2024; Initial Status Report due by 6/16/2023; Prefiling Conference Request Re: Dispositive Motions due 1/16/2024; Settlement Conference 4/2024; Trial Ready Date 6/15/2024; Trial Brief due by 4/15/2024. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/16/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Second Amended Complaint must be e-filed no later than 3/20/2023. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/16/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
March 14, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Willi Schmidt d/b/a Schmidt Property Maintenance. (O'Brien, Gregory)
March 10, 2023 Filing 18 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Miller, Eric)
March 8, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Kenneth Palifka. (O'Brien, Gregory) Modified on 3/10/2023 to update docket text. (Samson, Jessalyn).
March 2, 2023 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fischer Property Group LLC. (Samson, Jessalyn)
March 2, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by Fischer Property Group LLC Regarding Third-Party Complaint (Attachments: #1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT)(Ayes, Mitchell)
March 1, 2023 Answer deadline updated for USA. Answer due 4/15/2023. (Samson, Jessalyn)
February 24, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth Palifka re #13 Amended Complaint, #14 Electronic Summons Issued, (O'Brien, Gregory)
February 8, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *USA* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Gregory E. O'Brien* *Moore, O'Brien & Foti* *891 Straits Turnpike* *Middlebury, CT 06762*. (Samson, Jessalyn)
February 1, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by Kenneth Palifka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Brien, Gregory)
February 1, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to USA. (O'Brien, Gregory)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Coonsent Motion for Extension of Time to April 3, 2023 to Plead in Response to Third Party Complaint #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/30/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
January 30, 2023 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 3, 2023 to Plead in Response to Third Party Complaint #1 Notice of Removal by USA. (Miller, Eric)
January 30, 2023 Answer deadline updated for USA to 4/3/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
January 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #9 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 1/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Samson, Jessalyn)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/26/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/26/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/27/2023. Discovery due by 7/28/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2023. Signed by Clerk on 1/26/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
January 26, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory E. O'Brien on behalf of Kenneth Palifka (O'Brien, Gregory)
January 26, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by USA re #1 Notice of Removal STATEMENT CONCERNING REMOVAL (Miller, Eric)
January 26, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/26/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
January 26, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Ayes on behalf of Fischer Property Group LLC (Anastasio, F.)
January 26, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by USA re #1 Notice of Removal NOTICE OF NO PENDING MOTIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Docket Sheet))(Miller, Eric)
January 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USA from Superior Court Judicial District of Litchfield, case number LLI-CV22-6030649-S., filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Original Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (Third Party Complaint))(Miller, Eric)
January 26, 2023 Judge Robert N. Chatigny and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palifka v. Fischer Property Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Palifka
Represented By: Gregory E. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fischer Property Group LLC
Represented By: Mitchell Ayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willi Schmidt d/b/a Schmidt Property Maintenance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willi Schmidt doing business as Schmidt Property Maintenance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: USA
Represented By: Eric Benjamin Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?