Asik v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Hatice Asik
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 3:2023cv00135
Filed: February 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2023 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Esty, Miles)
March 21, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert James Weber, III on behalf of Hatice Asik (Weber, Robert)
February 6, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Esty, Miles)
February 2, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, #9 Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, 6 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, Signed by Clerk on 2/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Barry, L)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/2/2023. (Barry, L)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/2/2023. (Barry, L)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2023 Discovery due by 8/4/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 9/8/2023 Signed by Clerk on 2/2/2023. (Barry, L)
February 2, 2023 Filing 6 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/2/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
February 2, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Esty, Miles)
February 2, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Miles David Newman Esty on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (Esty, Miles)
February 2, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Esty, Miles)
February 2, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Notice of Pending Motions) (Esty, Miles)
February 2, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Costco Wholesale Corporation from Connecticut Superior Court New Haven, case number NNH-CV23-6129324-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7222054, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Esty, Miles)
February 2, 2023 Judge Alvin W. Thompson and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asik v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hatice Asik
Represented By: Jerome A. Lacobelle, Jr.
Represented By: Robert James Weber, III.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Miles David Newman Esty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?