TLOA of CT, LLC v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: TLOA of CT, LLC
Defendant: HEDCO, Inc., Valerie Brown Miller, Lottie Mae Wright, Hartford Economic Dev Corp, U.S. Internal Revenue Service, Hastings Group LLC, Metropolitan District, New London Windustrial Company, USA, Saint Francis Hospital, City of Hartford, American Tax Funding, LLC, CT Tax Liens 2, LLC and US Bank, Custodian/PFS Financial 1, LLC
Cross Defendant: Department of Revenue Services
Counter Defendant: Estate of Fredericka M. Brown, Deceased
Case Number: 3:2023cv00141
Filed: February 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Maria E Garcia
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2023 Filing 22 ANSWER to #18 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,, by TLOA of CT, LLC.(Greene, Gary)
March 15, 2023 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *American Tax Funding, LLC, CT Tax Liens 2, LLC, Estate of Fredericka M. Brown, Deceased, HEDCO, Inc., City of Hartford, Hastings Group LLC, Metropolitan District, Valerie Brown Miller, New London Windustrial Company, Department of Revenue Services, Saint Francis Hospital, TLOA of CT, LLC, US Bank, Custodian/PFS Financial 1, LLC, Lottie Mae Wright* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey Nathan Nunez* *US Department of Justice - Tax Division* *Ben Franklin Station, PO Box 7328* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Imbriani, Susan)
March 14, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Clayton Paul on behalf of USA (Paul, Curtis)
March 14, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to American Tax Funding, LLC, CT Tax Liens 2, LLC, Estate of Fredericka M. Brown, Deceased, HEDCO, Inc., City of Hartford, Hastings Group LLC, Metropolitan District, Valerie Brown Miller, New London Windustrial Company, Department of Revenue Services, Saint Francis Hospital, TLOA of CT, LLC, US Bank, Custodian/PFS Financial 1, LLC, Lottie Mae Wright. (Nunez, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Nathan Nunez on behalf of U.S. Internal Revenue Service, USA (Nunez, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against Department of Revenue Services, Saint Francis Hospital, Lottie Mae Wright, Hastings Group LLC, New London Windustrial Company, Valerie Brown Miller, City of Hartford, US Bank, Custodian/PFS Financial 1, LLC, CT Tax Liens 2, LLC, Metropolitan District, HEDCO, Inc., American Tax Funding, LLC, Estate of Fredericka M. Brown, Deceased, COUNTERCLAIM against TLOA of CT, LLC, Estate of Fredericka M. Brown, Deceased by USA.(Nunez, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Department of Revenue Services.(Launer, Krislyn)
February 16, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Krislyn Mina Launer on behalf of Department of Revenue Services (Launer, Krislyn)
February 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion for Judgment. The Court DENIES as moot the motion for judgment, in light of granting the motion to withdraw, ECF No. 14 . Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 02/11/2023. (Jean-Jacques, Walter)
February 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION to Withdraw #5 MOTION for Judgment .The Court GRANTS the motion to withdraw the motion for judgment. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 02/11/2023. (Jean-Jacques, Walter)
February 10, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw #5 MOTION for Judgment by TLOA of CT, LLC. (Greene, Gary)
February 9, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TLOA of CT, LLC. (Greene, Gary)
February 7, 2023 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Murphy, Tatihana)
February 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 13, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #1 Notice of Removal. The Court GRANTS the motion for extension of time until March 13, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 02/04/2023. (Jean-Jacques, Walter)
February 3, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by U.S. Internal Revenue Service, USA, #9 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by U.S. Internal Revenue Service, USA, #4 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 13, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, filed by U.S. Internal Revenue Service, USA, #3 Notice (Other) filed by U.S. Internal Revenue Service, USA, 6 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, #5 MOTION for Judgment filed by TLOA of CT, LLC Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Imbriani, Susan)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/3/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/3/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/4/2023; Discovery due by 8/5/2023; Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2023. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
February 3, 2023 Filing 6 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
February 3, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Judgment of Strict Foreclosure and Finding of Entitlement to Possession by TLOA of CT, LLC.Responses due by 2/24/2023 (Anastasio, F.)
February 3, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 13, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by U.S. Internal Revenue Service, USA. (Turbert, Julie)
February 3, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by USA, United States Internal Revenue Service re #1 Notice of Removal, of Pending Motion in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit Motion for Judgment)(Turbert, Julie)
February 3, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie G. Turbert on behalf of USA, United States Internal Revenue Service (Turbert, Julie)
February 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USA, United States Internal Revenue Service from Hartford Superior Court, case number HHD-CV-21-6148321-S., filed by USA, United States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Turbert, Julie)
February 3, 2023 Judge Victor A. Bolden and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TLOA of CT, LLC v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEDCO, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Brown Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lottie Mae Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Economic Dev Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Represented By: Jeffrey Nathan Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hastings Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New London Windustrial Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Represented By: Curtis Clayton Paul
Represented By: Jeffrey Nathan Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Francis Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Tax Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CT Tax Liens 2, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank, Custodian/PFS Financial 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TLOA of CT, LLC
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Department of Revenue Services
Represented By: Krislyn Mina Launer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Estate of Fredericka M. Brown, Deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?