Doe et al v. Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00154
Filed: February 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: William I Garfinkel
2 Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Hearing set for 10/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel. PLEASE NOTE: Courtroom change. (Esposito, A.)
October 19, 2023 Filing 71 MOTION for Settlement - Motion for Final Approval and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Attorney Kelly E. Reardon, Esq.)(Reardon, Kelly)
October 18, 2023 Filing 70 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel: Status Conference held on 10/18/2023. 42 minutes. (Esposito, A.)
October 17, 2023 Filing 69 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Hearing set for 10/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel. (Esposito, A.)
October 17, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/18/2023 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel. Counsel for one of the parties will provide a call-in number. (Esposito, A.)
September 14, 2023 Filing 67 NOTICE by John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated) Declaration of Attorney Kelly E. Reardon, Esq. Confirming Mailing of Notices and Claim Forms to Settlement Class Members (Reardon, Kelly)
September 6, 2023 Filing 66 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 9/6/23. (Velez, F.)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73, and consistent with the consent of the parties, the court refers all proceedings relating to the final approval of the preliminary settlement, see ECF No. #62 , and the issuance of the final judgment, to United States Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel. It is so ordered. The court thanks Judge Garfinkel for his time and attention in this matter. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 9/6/23. (Velez, F.)
September 5, 2023 Filing 64 Joint NOTICE by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC and Plaintiffs to Consent to Referral of Proceedings Relating to Settlement to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) (Clarke, John)
August 31, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Hearing set for 10/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel. (Esposito, A.)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Class Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel on 8/31/23. (Attachments: Exhibit 1-Notice of Settlement, Exhibit 2-Claim Form). (Esposito, A.)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #53 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel on 8/31/23. (Esposito, A.)
August 30, 2023 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/30/2023. 34 minutes. (Esposito, A.)
August 30, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/30/2023 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel. Counsel for the Defendant has emailed the call-in information to the parties. (Esposito, A.)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order referring #53 Motion for Settlement to United States Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1), and consistent with parties' request in the motion for settlement, the court refers the instant matter to Judge Garfinkel. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 08/29/2023. (Kim, Hyo June)
August 22, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC re #53 MOTION for Settlement - Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Proof of Service of CAFA Notice to Federal and State Officials (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Stephanie J. Fiereck)(Clarke, John)
August 10, 2023 Filing 56 PROPOSED ORDER Preliminary Approving Settlement and Providing for Class Notice by John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated). (Reardon, Kelly)
August 10, 2023 Filing 55 Memorandum in Support re #53 MOTION for Settlement - Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated). (Reardon, Kelly)
August 10, 2023 Filing 54 STIPULATION of Settlement by John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit B)(Reardon, Kelly)
August 10, 2023 Filing 53 MOTION for Settlement - Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated). (Reardon, Kelly)
August 3, 2023 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/3/2023. Total Time: 1 hours and 00 minutes (Imbriani, Susan)
July 21, 2023 Filing 50 Joint STATUS REPORT by John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated). (Reardon, Kelly)
July 20, 2023 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel: Follow-up Telephone Conference held on 7/20/2023. Total time: 18 minutes (Imbriani, Susan)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. The parties are instructed to file a status report on or before July 21, 2023, stating the outcome of settlement negotiations thus far, proposed deadlines going forward, and whether they wish to consent to a United States Magistrate Judge presiding over this action. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 7/14/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
July 14, 2023 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel: Settlement Conference held on 7/13/2023. Total Time: 9 hours and 5 minutes. (Esposito, A.)
July 14, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 7/21/2023 (Wagner, Rebecca)
June 29, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. The Settlement Conference set for 7/18/23 is RESCHEDULED to 7/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 306, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel. Conferences are scheduled for July 13, 14 and 19 (if needed). (Esposito, A.)
June 14, 2023 Filing 46 Joint STATUS REPORT by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Clarke, John)
June 7, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Follow-up Settlement Conferences are scheduled for 7/18/2023 and 7/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 306, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel. (Esposito, A.)
June 5, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 7/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 306, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel. Please read and comply with the attached conference order. The parties may submit their ex parte statement to alyssa_esposito@ctd.uscourts.gov on or before July 7, 2023.(Esposito, A.)
June 5, 2023 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel: Pre-Settlement Conference held on 6/5/2023. 26 minutes. A settlement conference will be held on July 13, 2023 at 10:00 AM. (Esposito, A.)
June 1, 2023 Filing 42 Docket Entry Correction to reflect correct time, phone number and pass code of the telephonic pre-settlement conference re 40 Calendar Entry. (Santos, Sarah)
June 1, 2023 Filing 41 Docket Entry Correction to reflect correct date of the telephonic pre-settlement conference re 40 Calendar Entry. (Santos, Sarah)
June 1, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic pre-settlement conference set for June 5, 2023, at 2:30 PM. before Judge William I Garfinkel. Please call in to the Court's conference call line at 1-888-472-4293 and enter the pass code of 9714627# when prompted. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. Because the parties will likely be ordered to attend the conference, either in-person or via videoconference, counsel are instructed to obtain their client's schedules over the next ninety days and have them available during the pre-conference. Counsel should also have their own calendars available to aid in scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what, if any, information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference to maximize its chances of success. If either counsel has a firm, unavoidable conflict at the appointed date and time, e.g., a previously-scheduled appearance in another court, s/he should not file a motion for continuance on the docket but rather should call Alyssa Esposito, law clerk, at 203-773-2022 as soon as possible with opposing counsel on the line to work out an alternate day and time for the pre-conference. (Esposito, A.) Modified to correct text on 6/1/2023 (Santos, Sarah).
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel for Mediation. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 5/30/23. (Velez, F.)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER approving ECF No. #37 , the parties' joint Stipulation For Reference To ADR. Pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 16(h), the court hereby approves the alternative dispute resolution outlined by the parties in the stipulation. The court hereby stays all deadlines in this case pending the termination of non-binding mediation by the Honorable Judge William I. Garfinkel regarding settlement of all pending issues. The court instructs the parties to file a joint status report on or before June 19, 2023, which shall inform the court whether Judge Garfinkel is able to accommodate them and the time and date scheduled for mediation. The parties shall also file a joint status report within 45 days of the mediation session, which shall inform the court of the posture of the case going forward. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 5/26/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
May 26, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 6/19/2023 (Wagner, Rebecca)
May 24, 2023 Filing 37 Joint STIPULATION For Reference To ADR by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Clarke, John)
May 22, 2023 Filing 36 Emergency MOTION to Strike #35 Objection, Plaintiffs' Unauthorized Sur-Reply by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.Responses due by 6/12/2023 (Clarke, John)
May 16, 2023 Filing 35 Supplemental OBJECTION re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for a Stay of Proceedings In Favor of Arbitration, #33 Objection, #29 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reardon, Kelly)
May 8, 2023 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for a Stay of Proceedings In Favor of Arbitration - Reply Memorandum In Further Support Of Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For A Stay Of Proceedings In Favor Of Arbitration - filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Clarke, John)
April 24, 2023 Filing 33 OBJECTION re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for a Stay of Proceedings In Favor of Arbitration, #29 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of the Plaintiff's Objection to the Motion to Dismiss)(Reardon, Kelly)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. The court thanks the parties for their Local Rule 26(f) Report. See ECF No. #31 . The court hereby APPROVES and ADOPTS all deadlines proposed therein. All discovery shall be completed on or before April 4, 2024, and all interim discovery deadlines hereby are incorporated by reference. All interim discovery deadlines may be amended by agreement of the parties without the court's approval provided those amendments do not delay the deadline for completion of all discovery. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before May 31, 2024. The parties' joint trial memorandum shall be filed on or before June 30, 2024, if no dispositive motions are filed, or within the period set by the court upon its disposition of any dispositive motions that are filed. The court thereafter will set a jury selection date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to trial on July 31, 2024. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 4/24/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
April 5, 2023 Filing 31 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reardon, Kelly)
April 3, 2023 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for a Stay of Proceedings In Favor of Arbitration, #29 Memorandum in Support of Motion - DECLARATION Signed By John C. Clarke, Jr. filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - To Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - To Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration)(Clarke, John)
April 3, 2023 Filing 29 Memorandum in Support re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for a Stay of Proceedings In Favor of Arbitration filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Clarke, John)
April 3, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for a Stay of Proceedings In Favor of Arbitration by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC.Responses due by 4/24/2023 (Clarke, John)
March 17, 2023 Filing 27 OBJECTION to Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed by John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated). (Reardon, Kelly)
March 17, 2023 Filing 26 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Certify Class . Responses due by 6/6/2023 (Wagner, Rebecca)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part ECF No. #23 , Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the pending motion for class certification on or before June 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 3/17/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
March 16, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Kessler on behalf of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC (Kessler, Rachael)
March 16, 2023 Filing 23 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time until July 6, 2023 - Emergency Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Plaintiffs' Motion To Certify Class - #15 MOTION to Certify Class by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Clarke, John)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting ECF No. #20 , Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Although the motion is accompanied by a declaration and not an affidavit, the court finds that Attorney Kessler's declaration, being signed by the declarant and submitting to the penalties of perjury, satisfies the requirement of Local Rule 83.1(d). Further, the court waives the requirement that the sponsoring attorney have an office within the District of Connecticut, see D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 83.1(c), but cautions both the sponsoring attorney and the visiting attorney that they will be responsible for ensuring that they receive all filings electronically and that they timely respond to all filings as necessary. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 3/15/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
March 15, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Louis Weber on behalf of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC (Weber, Scott)
March 14, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Rachael C. Kessler to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7272585) by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration Of Rachel C. Kessler In Support Of Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing)(Clarke, John)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting ECF No. #18 , Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Although the motion is accompanied by a declaration and not an affidavit, the court finds that Attorney Weber's declaration, being signed by the declarant and submitting to the penalties of perjury, satisfies the requirement of Local Rule 83.1(d). Further, the court waives the requirement that the sponsoring attorney have an office within the District of Connecticut, see D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 83.1(c), but cautions both the sponsoring attorney and the visiting attorney that they will be responsible for ensuring that they receive all filings electronically and that they timely respond to all filings as necessary. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 3/14/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
March 6, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Scott Louis Weber to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7261221) by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Scott Louis Weber in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac of Vice -, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Clarke, John)
March 3, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Barnes on behalf of John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated) (Barnes, Joseph)
March 3, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert I. Reardon, Jr on behalf of John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated) (Reardon, Robert)
March 2, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Certify Class by John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated).Responses due by 3/23/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Reardon, Kelly)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting ECF No. #12 , Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before April 3, 2023. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 3/1/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
March 1, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC to 4/3/2023. (Wagner, Rebecca)
February 24, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated). Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC served on 2/13/2023, answer due 3/6/2023. (Reardon, Kelly)
February 23, 2023 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/7/2023. (Velez, F.)
February 22, 2023 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 3, 2023 to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Clarke, John)
February 22, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Epiq Systems Acquisition, Inc. for Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Clarke, John)
February 22, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Clarke, Jr on behalf of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC (Clarke, John)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting ECF No. #3 , Motion for Permission to File Complaint Using Pseudonym. The Second Circuit has held that "when determining whether a plaintiff may be allowed to maintain an action under a pseudonym, the plaintiff's interest in anonymity must be balanced against both the public interest in disclosure and any prejudice to the defendant." Sealed Plaintiff v. Sealed Defendant, 537 F.3d 185, 189 (2d Cir. 2008). The court has considered the factors relevant to this inquiry, see id. at 189-90, and finds that this action does involve highly sensitive matters, that identification does pose a risk of mental harm to the plaintiffs, that there is no alternative means of protecting plaintiff's confidentiality, and that no prejudice will inure to the defendant if the plaintiffs are permitted to proceed under a pseudonym. Further, given that this case involves a related action in which the court ordered that the plaintiffs' identities were to be kept confidential, and that this suit concerns a violation of that confidentiality order, the court finds it appropriate to grant the motion. Plaintiffs will be permitted to use a pseudonym. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 2/9/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
February 9, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kelly E. Reardon* *The Reardon Law Firm P.C.* *160 Hempstead Street* *New London, CT 06320*. (Barry, L)
February 8, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 MOTION for Permission to File Complaint Using Pseudonym, and Memorandum in Support Thereof Order filed by John Doe, #5 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by John Doe Signed by Clerk on 2/8/2023. (Barry, L)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 2/8/2023. (Barry, L)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 2/8/2023. (Barry, L)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/9/2023 Discovery due by 8/10/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 9/14/2023 Signed by Clerk on 2/8/2023. (Barry, L)
February 8, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Permission to File Complaint Using Pseudonym, and Memorandum in Support Thereof Order by John Doe(#2, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), John Doe(#1, On behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated). (Reardon, Kelly)
February 8, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/8/23.(Hushin, Z.)
February 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Relief against Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7229579.), filed by John Doe #2, John Doe #1.(Reardon, Kelly)
February 8, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Reardon, Kelly)
February 8, 2023 Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Kelly E. Reardon
Represented By: Joseph M. Barnes
Represented By: Robert I. Reardon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr.
Represented By: Rachael Kessler
Represented By: Scott Louis Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?