American Commerce Insurance Company v. Greentouch USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: American Commerce Insurance Company a/s/o Marcia Bartha and American Commerce Insurance Co
Defendant: Greentouch USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00174
Filed: February 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Utke on behalf of American Commerce Insurance Co (Utke, Mark)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Mark E. Utke, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 8/3/2023. (Sichanh, Christina)
August 2, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark E. Utke, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7435977) by American Commerce Insurance Co. (Donnelly, Derek)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #19 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by May 15, 2024, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by May 15, 2024, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by June 17, 2024. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by June 17, 2024, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on February 16, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/6/2023.(Lewis, D)
July 5, 2023 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Berglund, Curtis)
July 5, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis A Berglund on behalf of Greentouch USA, Inc. (Berglund, Curtis)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. It appears that the parties have yet to file a Rule 26(f) report. The parties shall file a Rule 26(f) report by July 7, 2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/23/2023. (Wang, S.)
May 17, 2023 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Greentouch USA, Inc.. (Campbell, James)
May 17, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand GREENTOUCH USA INC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND by Greentouch USA, Inc..(Campbell, James)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/17/23DEFENDANT'S ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS File Responsive Pleadings #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/28/2023. (Lewis, D)
April 28, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Greentouch USA, Inc. to 5/17/2023. (Lewis, D)
April 27, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/17/23DEFENDANT'S ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS File Responsive Pleadings #1 Complaint by Greentouch USA, Inc.. (Campbell, James)
April 27, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of Greentouch USA, Inc. (Campbell, James)
March 16, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Commerce Insurance Co. Greentouch USA, Inc. served on 3/6/2023, answer due 3/27/2023. (Donnelly, Derek)
February 21, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Commerce Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent MAPFRE, U.S.A, Corp. for American Commerce Insurance Co. (Donnelly, Derek)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 GENERAL ORDER OF REFERRAL OF PRE-TRIAL MOTIONS TO SEAL AND DISCOVERY MOTIONS. The Court REFERS to U.S. Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia the following non-dispositive pre-trial motions: (1) all motions to seal, and (2) all discovery motions and related motions for extension of time with respect to the litigation of any discovery dispute. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/14/23.(Barry, Donna)
February 14, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Greentouch USA, Inc. * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Derek E. Donnelly* *Law Office of Stuart G. Blackburn* *2 Concorde Way # 3C; P.O. Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
February 14, 2023 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR - ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Greentouch USA, Inc. * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Derek E. Donnelly* *Law Office of Stuart G. Blackburn* *2 Concorde Way # 3C P.O., Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Chartier, AnnMarie) Modified on 2/14/2023 (Chartier, AnnMarie).
February 14, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by American Commerce Insurance Co, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 2/14/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
February 13, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Greentouch USA, Inc.. (Donnelly, Derek)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/10/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/10/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/11/2023 Discovery due by 8/12/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 9/16/2023 Signed by Clerk on 2/10/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
February 10, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/23.(Hushin, Z.)
February 10, 2023 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)
February 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greentouch USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7233439.), filed by American Commerce Insurance Company.(Donnelly, Derek) Modified on 2/13/2023 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Commerce Insurance Company v. Greentouch USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Commerce Insurance Company a/s/o Marcia Bartha
Represented By: Derek E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Commerce Insurance Co
Represented By: Derek E. Donnelly
Represented By: Mark E. Utke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greentouch USA, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis A Berglund
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?