Wolak v. Town of Old Saybrook et al
Plaintiff: Scott Wolak
Defendant: Town of Old Saybrook, Joshua Zarbo and James Simpson
Case Number: 3:2023cv00734
Filed: June 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert M Spector
Referring Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #13 ) is hereby DENIED as moot. See ECF No. #15 . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 08/04/2023. (Frazier, T.)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The defendants' Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #16 ) is hereby GRANTED. The defendants shall respond to the plaintiff's first set of interrogatories and requests for production dated July 5, 2023 on or before September 18, 2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 08/04/2023. (Frazier, T.)
July 31, 2023 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 18, 2023 (To Respond to Interrogatories and Production Requests Dated July 5, 2023) by James Simpson, Town of Old Saybrook, Joshua Zarbo. (Rule, Katherine)
July 31, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by James Simpson, Town of Old Saybrook, Joshua Zarbo.(Jakiela, Kristan)
July 27, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Paul Spinella on behalf of Scott Wolak (Spinella, A.)
July 6, 2023 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 2, 2023 to file a responsive pleading #1 Complaint by James Simpson, Town of Old Saybrook, Joshua Zarbo. (Jakiela, Kristan)
June 21, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristan M. Jakiela on behalf of James Simpson, Town of Old Saybrook, Joshua Zarbo (Jakiela, Kristan)
June 21, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Wolak (Attachments: #1 Return of Service-Simpson, #2 Return of Service-Zarbo)(Spinella, A.)
June 21, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E. Rule on behalf of James Simpson, Town of Old Saybrook, Joshua Zarbo (Rule, Katherine)
June 7, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *James Simpson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *A. Paul Spinella* *Spinella & Associates, LLC* *One Lewis Street* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Mendez, D)
June 7, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Joshua Zarbo* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *A. Paul Spinella* *Spinella & Associates, LLC* *One Lewis Street* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Mendez, D)
June 7, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Town of Old Saybrook* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *A. Paul Spinella* *Spinella & Associates, LLC* *One Lewis Street* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Mendez, D)
June 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint filed by Scott Wolak, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 6/7/2023.(Mendez, D)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/6/2023. (Mendez, D)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/6/2023. (Mendez, D)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/5/2023. Discovery due by 12/6/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2024. Signed by Clerk on 6/6/2023. (Mendez, D)
June 6, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 6/6/23.(Hushin, Z.)
June 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number BCTDC-7371912.), filed by Scott Wolak.(Spinella, A.)
June 6, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Town of Old Saybrook. (Spinella, A.)
June 6, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Joshua Zarbo. (Spinella, A.)
June 6, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to James Simpson. (Spinella, A.)
June 6, 2023 Judge Alvin W. Thompson and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolak v. Town of Old Saybrook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Wolak
Represented By: A. Paul Spinella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Old Saybrook
Represented By: Kristan M. Jakiela
Represented By: Katherine E. Rule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Zarbo
Represented By: Kristan M. Jakiela
Represented By: Katherine E. Rule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Simpson
Represented By: Katherine E. Rule
Represented By: Kristan M. Jakiela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?