Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London v. LC Mechanical, llc al
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London as Subrogee of Consolidated Ass'n of the Birches at Foxon, Inc. and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Defendant: LC Mechanical, llc f/k/a L.C. Mechanical, LLC, L.C. Mechanical, LLC., Luis Cordeiro and LC Mechanical, llc
Case Number: 3:2023cv01184
Filed: September 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The plaintiff's Motion for Evan J. Malinowski, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #12 ) is hereby GRANTED. The court notes Attorney Evan J. Malinowskis office address is: 28411 Northwestern Hwy., Suite 600, Southfield, MI 48034. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/31/2023. (Vascotto, J.)
October 27, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Evan J. Malinowski, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7530113) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Donnelly, Derek)
October 12, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. All Defendants. (Donnelly, Derek)
October 11, 2023 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by LC Mechanical, llc. (Huget, Kirby)
October 11, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirby G. Huget on behalf of LC Mechanical, llc, Luis Cordeiro (Huget, Kirby)
September 12, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Protective Order, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 9/12/2023. (Mendez, D)
September 12, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *L.C. Mechanical, LLC., LC Mechanical, llc, Luis Cordeiro* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Derek E. Donnelly* *Law Office of Stuart G. Blackburn* *2 Concorde Way # 3C P.O. Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Samson, Jessalyn)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/7/2023. (Mendez, D)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/7/2023. (Mendez, D)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2023. Discovery due by 3/8/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 4/12/2024. Signed by Clerk on 9/7/2023. (Mendez, D)
September 7, 2023 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/7/23.(Hushin, Z.)
September 7, 2023 Judge Alvin W. Thompson and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.)
September 7, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Donnelly, Derek) Modified on 9/8/2023 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
September 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7474853.), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London.(Donnelly, Derek) Modified on 9/8/2023 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
September 7, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Donnelly, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London v. LC Mechanical, llc al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London as Subrogee of Consolidated Ass'n of the Birches at Foxon, Inc.
Represented By: Derek E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Represented By: Derek E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LC Mechanical, llc f/k/a L.C. Mechanical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.C. Mechanical, LLC.
Represented By: Kirby G. Huget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Cordeiro
Represented By: Kirby G. Huget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LC Mechanical, llc
Represented By: Kirby G. Huget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?