Wallace v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Wallace
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2023cv01319
Filed: October 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Vernon Dion Oliver
2 Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of SSA Decision DIWC - Title II Worker or Child Claims
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by Kilolo Kijakazi of Unofficial text-searchable copy of Certified Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unofficial text-searchable copy of Certified Administrative Record Pt 1, #2 Exhibit Unofficial text-searchable copy of Certified Administrative Record Pt 2, #3 Exhibit Unofficial text-searchable copy of Certified Administrative Record Pt 3)(Morrison, Graham)
December 8, 2023 Filing 10 Social Security Transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit part 1, #2 Exhibit part 2, #3 Exhibit part 3, #4 Exhibit part 4, #5 Exhibit part 5, #6 Exhibit part 6, #7 Exhibit part 7, #8 Exhibit part 8, #9 Exhibit part 9, #10 Exhibit part 10, #11 Exhibit part 11, #12 Exhibit part 12, #13 Exhibit part 13, #14 Exhibit part 14, #15 Exhibit part 15, #16 Exhibit part 16, #17 Exhibit part 17, #18 Exhibit part 18, #19 Exhibit part 19, #20 Exhibit part 20, #21 Exhibit part 21)(Morrison, Graham)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Vernon D. Oliver for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/31/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
October 11, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Graham Morrison on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Morrison, Graham)
October 10, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan Michael Katz on behalf of Jacqueline Wallace (Chartier, A)
October 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filed by Jacqueline Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chartier, A)
October 10, 2023 Judge Michael P. Shea and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)
October 10, 2023 Filing fee received from Law Offices of Ivan M. Katz: $ 402.00, receipt number: #27587 (Chartier, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Wallace
Represented By: Ivan Michael Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Graham Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?