Series 15-09-321 v. Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc et al
Plaintiff: SERIES 15-09-321 SERIES 15-09-321, a designated series of MSP Recovery Series, LLC and Series 15-09-321
Defendant: THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST, HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, Hartford Accident And Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company and Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2023cv01342
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS the motion for extension of time until January 16, 2024 for Defendants to respond to the Complaint. The Court also grants a corresponding extension for the parties to comply with with Local Rule 26(f). The parties shall confer on or before January 12, 2024 and file a 26(f) report by January 26, 2024. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/7/23. (Chan, A.)
December 6, 2023 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 16, 2024 to Respond to the Complaint and a Corresponding 30-day Extension To Comply with Local Rule 26(f) by Hartford Accident And Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Rinehart, Kim)
November 21, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Related Case by Hartford Accident And Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rinehart, Kim)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Austin M. Krtausch.. Signed by Clerk on 11/15/2023. (Barry, L)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin G. Day.. Signed by Clerk on 11/15/2023. (Barry, L)
November 13, 2023 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement by Hartford Accident And Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company for Hartford Accident And Indemnity Company, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company; Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Rinehart, Kim)
November 13, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Austin M. Krtausch to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7547280) by Series 15-09-321. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Austin M. Krtausch)(Dumain, Sanford)
November 13, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin G. Day to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7547235) by Series 15-09-321. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Justin G. Day)(Dumain, Sanford)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS the motion for extension of time until December 15, 2023 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/13/23. (Chan, A.)
November 10, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Series 15-09-321. Hartford Accident And Indemnity Company served on 10/25/2023, answer due 11/15/2023; Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc served on 10/25/2023, answer due 11/15/2023; Hartford Fire Insurance Company served on 10/25/2023, answer due 11/15/2023; Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest served on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/23/2023; Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast served on 10/25/2023, answer due 11/15/2023; Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company served on 10/25/2023, answer due 11/15/2023; Twin City Fire Insurance Company served on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Summons - SERIES 15-09-321 v. Hartford Financial Services et al)(Dumain, Sanford)
November 10, 2023 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 15, 2023 to Respond to the Complaint by Hartford Accident And Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Rinehart, Kim)
November 10, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim E. Rinehart on behalf of Hartford Accident And Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Rinehart, Kim)
October 17, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Accident And Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Sanford P. Dumain* *Milberg LLP* *One Pennsylvania Plaza* *New York, NY 10119-0165*. (Barry, L)
October 17, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Disclosure Statement, filed by Series 15-09-321, #7 Protective Order, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint,,, filed by Series 15-09-321, #2 Notice (Other), filed by Series 15-09-321 Signed by Clerk on 10/17/2023.(Barry, L)
October 16, 2023 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement & Certificate of Interested Parties by Series 15-09-321 identifying Corporate Parent MSP Recovery, LLC, Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Corporate Parent Subrogation Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Lionheart II Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent MSP Recovery, Inc. for Series 15-09-321. (Silvey, Mark)
October 14, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by SERIES 15-09-321 re #1 Complaint, Plaintiff's Notice of Exhibits Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FW Hartford MAP lien process_Redacted, #2 Exhibit B - Hartford Life and Accident Corporate Structure)(Dumain, Sanford) Modified on 10/16/2023 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/13/2023.(Barry, L)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/13/2023.(Barry, L)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/12/2023 Discovery due by 4/13/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 5/18/2024 Signed by Clerk on 10/13/2023.(Barry, L)
October 13, 2023 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/13/23.(Hushin, Z.)
October 13, 2023 Judge Victor A. Bolden and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc, Hartford Accident And Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7514750.), filed by Series 15-09-321. (Attachments: #1 Series 15 09 321 v Hartford et al - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, #3 mons - HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, #4 Summons - HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, #5 Summons - HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST, #6 Summons - HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, #7 Summons - The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc, #8 Summons - TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE)(Dumain, Sanford) Modified on 10/16/2023 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).
October 13, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Dumain, Sanford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Series 15-09-321 v. Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES 15-09-321 SERIES 15-09-321, a designated series of MSP Recovery Series, LLC
Represented By: Sanford P. Dumain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Series 15-09-321
Represented By: Sanford P. Dumain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident And Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?