Series 15-09-321 v. Travelers Companies et al
Plaintiff: a designated series of MSP Recovery Series, LLC SERIES 15-09-321 and Series 15-09-321
Defendant: INC THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, COMPANY TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE, Travelers Companies, Inc and Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2023cv01344
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bryce L. Friedman. Certificate of Good Standing due by 2/9/2024. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/2023. (Freberg, B)
December 7, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryce L. Friedman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7574943) by Travelers Companies, Inc, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Friedman Declaration))(Scully, Joseph)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alan C. Turner. Certificate of Good Standing due by 2/4/2024. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2023. (Freberg, B)
December 1, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alan C. Turner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Travelers Companies, Inc, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Alan C. Turner)(Scully, Joseph) Payment received (ECF #22 - receipt number ACTDC-7546980) Modified on 12/1/2023 (Peterson, M).
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying without prejudice #23 Motion for Attorney Bryce L. Friedman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d). Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/14/2023. (Sichanh, Christina)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying without prejudice #22 Motion for Attorney Alan C. Turner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d). Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/14/2023. (Sichanh, Christina)
November 13, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryce L. Friedman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7546999) by Travelers Companies, Inc, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Bryce L. Friedman)(Scully, Joseph)
November 13, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alan C. Turner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7546980) by Travelers Companies, Inc, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Alan C. Turner)(Scully, Joseph)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jordan M. Macejka. Signed by Clerk on 11/9/2023. (Sichanh, Christina)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin G. Day. Signed by Clerk on 11/9/2023. (Sichanh, Christina)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl J. Amelchenko. Signed by Clerk on 11/9/2023.(Sichanh, Christina)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 13, 2023 to file a response to the #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/9/2023. (Sichanh, Christina)
November 9, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Travelers Companies, Inc to 12/13/2023; Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company to 12/13/2023. (Sichanh, Christina)
November 8, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan M. Macejka to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7543054) by Series 15-09-321. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Jordan M. Macejka)(Dumain, Sanford)
November 8, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin G. Day to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7543044) by Series 15-09-321. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Justin G. Day)(Dumain, Sanford)
November 8, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Karl J. Amelchenko to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7543028) by Series 15-09-321. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Karl Amelchenko)(Dumain, Sanford)
November 8, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen D. Monnes on behalf of Travelers Companies, Inc, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company (Monnes, Kathleen)
November 8, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 13, 2023 to file a response to the Complaint #1 Complaint, by Travelers Companies, Inc, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Scully, Joseph)
November 8, 2023 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement by Travelers Companies, Inc, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Scully, Joseph)
November 8, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Kevin Scully on behalf of Travelers Companies, Inc, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company (Scully, Joseph)
October 24, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Series 15-09-321. Travelers Companies, Inc served on 10/23/2023, answer due 11/13/2023; Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company served on 10/23/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Returned Executed Summons - Travelers Companies Inc, #2 Exhibit B - Returned Executed Summons - Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company)(Dumain, Sanford)
October 16, 2023 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement & Certificate of Interested Parties by Series 15-09-321 identifying Corporate Parent MSP Recovery, LLC, Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Corporate Parent Subrogation Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Lionheart II Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent MSP Recovery, Inc. for Series 15-09-321. (Dumain, Sanford)
October 16, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Travelers Companies, Inc, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Sanford P. Dumain* *Milberg LLP* *One Pennsylvania Plaza* *New York, NY 10119-0165*. (Freberg, B)
October 16, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Protective Order, #6 Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Series 15-09-321. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER RE DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/13/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/13/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/13/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/12/2023; Discovery due by 4/13/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 5/18/2024. Signed by Clerk on 10/13/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 13, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/13/23.(Hushin, Z.)
October 13, 2023 Judge Janet C. Hall and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7514770.), filed by Series 15-09-321. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Travelers Corporate Structure, #2 Travelers - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC., #4 Summons - TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY)(Dumain, Sanford) Modified on 10/16/2023 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
October 13, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Dumain, Sanford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Series 15-09-321 v. Travelers Companies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: a designated series of MSP Recovery Series, LLC SERIES 15-09-321
Represented By: Sanford P. Dumain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Series 15-09-321
Represented By: Sanford P. Dumain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INC THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPANY TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Companies, Inc
Represented By: Joseph Kevin Scully
Represented By: Kathleen D. Monnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen D. Monnes
Represented By: Joseph Kevin Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?