Lugo v. Crothall Healthcare, Inc.
Plaintiff: Teresa Lugo
Defendant: Crothall Healthcare, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00320
Filed: March 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/7/2024 (Johnson, D.)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 26(f) NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties' compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 14 days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than 30 days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case, but no report has been filed. If the parties are unable to confer, they should each file their own, separate report. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties must file on or before May 7, 2024: (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a Form 26(f) report; or (2) a Form 26(f) Report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties' failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint and/or monetary sanctions being imposed on counsel. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 4/23/2024.(Bassali, D)
April 17, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Special Defenses by Crothall Healthcare, Inc..(McKenna, Elizabeth)
March 20, 2024 Answer deadline updated for Crothall Healthcare, Inc. to 4/18/2024. (Johnson, D.)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The #13 motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Defendant must file a responsive pleading by April 18, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 3/20/2024. (Bassali, D)
March 19, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 18, 2024 to Respond to Complaint by Crothall Healthcare, Inc.. (Beckwith, Mathew)
March 11, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #11 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #10 Standing Protective Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Crothall Healthcare, Inc., 7 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #6 Disclosure Statement filed by Crothall Healthcare, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Crothall Healthcare, Inc., #5 Notice (Other) filed by Crothall Healthcare, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal filed by Crothall Healthcare, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Crothall Healthcare, Inc., #9 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 3/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
March 8, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Peterson, M)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 03/08/2024. (Peterson, M)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 03/08/2024. (Peterson, M)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/7/2024. Discovery due by 9/7/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 10/12/2024. Signed by Clerk on 03/08/2024. (Peterson, M)
March 8, 2024 Filing 7 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 3/8/2024.(Perez, J.)
March 8, 2024 Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)
March 8, 2024 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by Crothall Healthcare, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Compass Group USA, Inc. for Crothall Healthcare, Inc.. (Beckwith, Mathew)
March 8, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE by Crothall Healthcare, Inc. Defendant's Notice of No Pending Motions (Beckwith, Mathew)
March 8, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by Crothall Healthcare, Inc. Defendant's Statement re Removed Case (Beckwith, Mathew)
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth R. McKenna on behalf of Crothall Healthcare, Inc. (McKenna, Elizabeth)
March 8, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew William Beckwith on behalf of Crothall Healthcare, Inc. (Beckwith, Mathew)
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crothall Healthcare, Inc. from CT Superior Court, case number HHB-CV24-6084696-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7676674, filed by Crothall Healthcare, Inc..(Beckwith, Mathew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lugo v. Crothall Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Lugo
Represented By: James V. Sabatini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crothall Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth R. McKenna
Represented By: Mathew William Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?