Robinson v. Macy's Inc et al
Plaintiff: Wesley B. Robinson
Defendant: Macy's Inc, American Express National Bank, Citibank NA and Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00544
Filed: April 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Macy's Inc by Wesley B. Robinson. (Fanelle, N.)
May 22, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION for More Definite Statement by American Express National Bank.Responses due by 6/12/2024 (Beck, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2024 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement by American Express National Bank identifying Corporate Parent American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., Corporate Parent American Express, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway for American Express National Bank. (Beck, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Beck on behalf of American Express National Bank (Beck, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Citibank, N.A. shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before June 22, 2024. This deadline is not likely to be further extended absent unforeseen circumstances. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/7/2024. (Alquesta, S)
May 7, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wesley B. Robinson. Macy's Inc served on 5/3/2024, answer due 5/24/2024. Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC served. (Fanelle, N.)
May 6, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 22, 2024 to Plead, move or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by Citibank NA. (Loney, Anthony)
May 6, 2024 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement by Citibank NA identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc. for Citibank NA. (Loney, Anthony)
May 6, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Ethan Loney on behalf of Citibank NA (Loney, Anthony)
May 6, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC by Wesley B. Robinson. (Fanelle, N.)
May 6, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wesley B. Robinson. American Express National Bank served on 4/18/2024, answer due 5/9/2024; Citibank NA served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
April 11, 2024 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *American Express National Bank, Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Citibank NA, Macy's Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Wesley B. Robinson* *119 Smith Street* *Bridgeport, CT 06607*. (Oliver, T.)
April 11, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to American Express National Bank, Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Citibank NA, Macy's Inc. (Oliver, T.)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing. Self-Represented Filers are Required to Comply with the Standard Electronic Filing Order Docketed at Case Opening. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/3/2024. (Gould, K.)
April 2, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING SERVICE: The self-represented plaintiff shall proceed with service upon the defendant(s) pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and may refer to pages 8-11 of the Court's Guide for Self-Represented Parties found on our website here: https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/rules-and-forms. If service is not effected by 7/1/2024, the case will be subject to dismissal. Dismissal due by 7/1/2024. Signed by Clerk on 4/2/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
April 2, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Consent to Electronic Notice filed by Wesley B. Robinson, #7 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Wesley B. Robinson, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing filed by Wesley B. Robinson, #8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #6 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 4/2/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
April 1, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Fanelle, N.)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/1/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/1/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2024 Discovery due by 10/1/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 11/5/2024 Signed by Clerk on 4/1/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
April 1, 2024 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/2/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
April 1, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Wesley B. Robinson. (Fanelle, N.)
April 1, 2024 Filing 2 Consent to Electronic Notice by Wesley B. Robinson (Fanelle, N.)
April 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Express National Bank, Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Citibank NA, Macy's Inc, filed by Wesley B. Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fanelle, N.)
April 1, 2024 Filing fee received from Wesley B Robinson: $ 405.00, receipt number BPT-374026. (Fanelle, N.)
April 1, 2024 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Reis, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Macy's Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley B. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express National Bank
Represented By: Jeffrey Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank NA
Represented By: Anthony Ethan Loney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?