Cooper v. International Business Machines Corporation
Plaintiff: Simon J Cooper
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Case Number: 3:2024cv00656
Filed: April 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT against International Business Machines Corporation, filed by Simon J Cooper.(Cooper, Simon)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Edward Holzapfel on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation (Holzapfel, Michael)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE re #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Simon J Cooper. (Cooper, Simon)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS Defendant's motion for extension of time until the resolution of the pending motion to dismiss to file a Rule 26(f) Report.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/24/2024. (Thompson, M.)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until After Court Decides its Pending Motion to Dismiss To File 26(f) Report by International Business Machines Corporation. (Dearington, Allison)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE by International Business Machines Corporation re #27 MOTION to Dismiss (Dearington, Allison)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by International Business Machines Corporation.Responses due by 6/6/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Dearington, Allison)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #15 Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael E. Holzapfel. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/18/2024. Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2024. (Barry, L.)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying as moot #21 Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing. In light of ECF No. 20, the motion to participate in electronic filing is DENIED as moot.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/19/2024. (Thompson, M.)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #23 Motion to Set Aside. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion to set aside the Court's order granting Defendant's motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. See ECF No. 14. Consistent with its inherent authority to manage this case, see Dietz v. Bouldin, 579 U.S. 40, 47 (2016) ("[D]istrict courts have the inherent authority to manage their dockets and courtrooms with a view toward the efficient and expedient resolution of cases."), the Court appropriately acted in providing Defendant additional time.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/19/2024. (Thompson, M.)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Set Aside 14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Simon J Cooper. (Cooper, Simon)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Appearance Self Represented Party by Simon J Cooper (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Barry, L.)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Simon J Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Barry, L.)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting #18 Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing; granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Se.Self-Represented Filers are Required to Comply with the Standard Electronic Filing Order Docketed at Case Opening.Attorney Beverley Rogers terminated.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/18/2024. (Thompson, M.)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Appearance of Self-represented Party Order by Simon J Cooper. (Rogers, Beverley)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Simon J Cooper. (Rogers, Beverley)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Beverley Rogers to Withdraw as Attorney by Simon J Cooper. (Rogers, Beverley)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael E. Holzapfel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7722411) by International Business Machines Corporation. (Dearington, Allison)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael E. Holzapfel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7722411) by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Dearington, Allison)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS Defendant's motion for extension of time until May 16, 2024, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/12/2024. (Thompson, M.)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #7 Disclosure Statement filed by International Business Machines Corporation, #3 Notice (Other) filed by International Business Machines Corporation, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice (Other) filed by International Business Machines Corporation, #11 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal filed by International Business Machines Corporation, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #12 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #6 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 16, 2024 Respond to Complaint #1 Notice of Removal filed by International Business Machines Corporation, #4 Notice (Other) filed by International Business Machines Corporation, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by International Business Machines Corporation Signed by Clerk on 4/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Imbriani, S)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Imbriani, S)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/9/2024.(Imbriani, S)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/9/2024.(Imbriani, S)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/8/2024, Discovery due by 10/9/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 11/13/2024. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/2024.(Imbriani, S)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/24.(Hushin, Z.)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by International Business Machines Corporation. (Dearington, Allison)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 16, 2024 Respond to Complaint #1 Notice of Removal by International Business Machines Corporation. (Dearington, Allison)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by International Business Machines Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal Statement of Removal (Dearington, Allison)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by International Business Machines Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal Notice of Pending Motions (Dearington, Allison)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by International Business Machines Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dearington, Allison)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison P. Dearington on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation (Dearington, Allison)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by International Business Machines Corporation Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7715929, filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dearington, Allison)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge Victor A. Bolden and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon J Cooper
Represented By: Beverley Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Allison P. Dearington
Represented By: Michael Edward Holzapfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?