Hazard v. Semple et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Hazard
Defendant: Semple, J. Dzurenda, Maldonado, Roy, Cero and Gero
Case Number: 3:2024cv00682
Filed: April 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert A Richardson
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2024 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dennis Hazard. (Attachments: #1 copy of envelope) (Oliver, T.)
April 15, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INSUFFICIENCY. The plaintiff has filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; in other words, he seeks to commence a federal lawsuit without pre-paying the filing fee. A federal law, 28 U.S.C. 1915, permits him to do so if, among other things, he files a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement for the six month period preceding his complaint. In this case, the plaintiff did not do so. The plaintiff is therefore directed to file with the Clerk of the Court a copy of his inmate trust account statement covering at least the period from October 10, 2024 to April 10, 2024. This account must be certified by a prison official as instructed on page five of the standard form. If the plaintiff does not submit a certified account by May 6, 2024, his case may be dismissed. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 4/15/2024.(Corriette, M.)
April 10, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Oliver, T.)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Chief Judge on 6/22/2016. (Oliver, T.)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Protective Order Signed by District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/10/2024. (Oliver, T.)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/10/2024. (Oliver, T.)
April 10, 2024 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/10/2024.(Gaskins, A)
April 10, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis Hazard. (Gaskins, A)
April 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cero, J. Dzurenda, Maldonado, Roy, Semple, filed by Dennis Hazard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Gaskins, A)
April 10, 2024 District Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Shafer, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hazard v. Semple et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Hazard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Semple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?