Cayer v. Novo Nordisk A/S et al
Plaintiff: Diane Cayer
Defendant: Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk North America Operations A/S, Novo Nordisk US Holdings Inc., Novo Nordisk US Commercial Holdings Inc., Novo Nordisk Inc., Novo Nordisk Research Center Seattle, Inc. and Novo Nordisk Pharmaceutical Industries LP
Case Number: 3:2024cv00809
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2024 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fanelle, N.)
May 17, 2024 Filing 10 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Clerk Tiffaney D. Pete, MDL Panel. (Fanelle, N.)
May 17, 2024 Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (Freberg, B)
May 3, 2024 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc., Novo Nordisk North America Operations A/S, Novo Nordisk Pharmaceutical Industries LP, Novo Nordisk Research Center Seattle, Inc., Novo Nordisk US Commercial Holdings Inc., Novo Nordisk US Holdings Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kelly A. Fitzpatrick* *Koskoff Koskoff & Bieder, PC* *350 Fairfield Avenue* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Fanelle, N.)
May 3, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #2 Exhibit filed by Diane Cayer, #6 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Diane Cayer. Signed by Clerk on 5/3/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
May 2, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Fanelle, N.)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/2/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/2/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2024 Discovery due by 11/1/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 12/6/2024. Signed by Clerk on 5/2/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
May 2, 2024 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/2/2024.(Perez, J.)
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet by Diane Cayer re #1 Complaint. (Fitzpatrick, Kelly)
May 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7746426.), filed by Diane Cayer.(Fitzpatrick, Kelly)
May 2, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Fitzpatrick, Kelly)
May 2, 2024 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cayer v. Novo Nordisk A/S et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Cayer
Represented By: Kelly A. Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk North America Operations A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk US Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk US Commercial Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Research Center Seattle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Pharmaceutical Industries LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?