Griffin Health Services Corporation et al v. Novo Nordisk Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Griffin Hospital and Griffin Health Services Corporation doing business as Griffin Hospital
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv01045
Filed: June 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part #24 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #19 MOTION to Request for Judicial Notice re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Oppositions due by 9/2/2024. Reply due by 9/16/2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/7/2024. (Barry, L.)
August 6, 2024 Filing 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #19 MOTION to Request for Judicial Notice re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint until September 9, 2024 by Griffin Health Services Corporation, Griffin Hospital. (Sconziano, Matthew)
August 6, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Sconziano on behalf of Griffin Health Services Corporation, Griffin Hospital (Sconziano, Matthew)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/12/2024 Rule 26(f) Report. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/25/2024. (Barry, L.)
July 25, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/12/2024 (Barry, L.)
July 24, 2024 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/12/2024 Rule 26(f) Report by Griffin Health Services Corporation, Griffin Hospital. (Wagner, Christopher)
July 19, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Lee Wagner on behalf of Griffin Health Services Corporation, Griffin Hospital for Attorney Matthew Sconziano (Wagner, Christopher)
July 18, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Request for Judicial Notice re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Novo Nordisk Inc..Responses due by 8/8/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Chuang, Lesley)
July 18, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Novo Nordisk Inc..Responses due by 8/8/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Chuang, Lesley)
July 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Novo Nordisk Inc. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/16/2024. (Barry, L.)
July 15, 2024 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Novo Nordisk U.S. Commercial Holdings, Inc., Novo Nordisk U.S. Holdings, Inc., Novo Nordisk Pharmaceutical Industries, LP, and Novo Nordisk Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. [Joint Stipulation] by Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Chuang, Lesley)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 18, 2024 Briefing schedule in connection with Plaintiffs' Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/18/2024. (Barry, L.)
June 18, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/29/2024 (DeRubeis, B.)
June 17, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Lee Wagner on behalf of Griffin Health Services Corporation, Griffin Hospital (Wagner, Christopher)
June 17, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Novo Nordisk Inc., #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 18, 2024 Briefing schedule in connection with Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Novo Nordisk Inc., #12 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Novo Nordisk Inc., #5 Notice (Other) filed by Novo Nordisk Inc., 6 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Disclosure Statement filed by Novo Nordisk Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Novo Nordisk Inc., #10 Standing Protective Order, #11 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 6/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Barry, L.)
June 14, 2024 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 18, 2024 Briefing schedule in connection with Plaintiffs' Complaint by Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Chuang, Lesley)
June 13, 2024 Filing 12 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.(Barry, L.)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order re: Discovery. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/13/2024.(Barry, L.)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/13/2024.(Barry, L.)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/13/2024.(Barry, L.)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2024 Discovery due by 12/13/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2025 Signed by Clerk on 6/13/2024.(Barry, L.)
June 13, 2024 Filing 6 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 6/13/2024.(Maturo, F.)
June 13, 2024 Judge Janet C. Hall and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Hushin, Z.)
June 13, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE by Novo Nordisk Inc. Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases (Chuang, Lesley)
June 13, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by Novo Nordisk Inc. Notice of Pending Motions (Chuang, Lesley)
June 13, 2024 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Novo Nordisk Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Novo Nordisk US Commercial Holdings, Inc. for Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Chuang, Lesley)
June 13, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley P. Chuang on behalf of Novo Nordisk Inc. (Chuang, Lesley)
June 13, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Novo Nordisk Inc. from Ansonia-Milford Judicial District of the Superior Court of Connecticut, case number AAN-CV24-6056394-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7801032, filed by Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - NMI's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Exhibit C - Civil Docket Report, #5 Exhibit D - State Court Docket)(Chuang, Lesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin Health Services Corporation et al v. Novo Nordisk Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Griffin Hospital
Represented By: Christopher Lee Wagner
Represented By: Matthew M. Sconziano
Represented By: David J. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Griffin Health Services Corporation doing business as Griffin Hospital
Represented By: Christopher Lee Wagner
Represented By: Matthew M. Sconziano
Represented By: David J. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Inc.
Represented By: Lesley P. Chuang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?