Trojanowski v. Philips Respironics
Plaintiff: Helen Trojanowski
Defendant: Philips Respironics
Case Number: 3:2024cv01259
Filed: July 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Referring Judge: Robert A Richardson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2024 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement, by Helen Trojanowski. (Mendez, D)
August 21, 2024 Case electronically transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania. (Freberg, B)
August 19, 2024 Filing 12 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Clerk Marcella R. Lockert, MDL Panel on 8/19/2024.(Mendez, D)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 disclosure statement fails to identify her own citizenship. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) provides, "The statement must name -- and identify the citizenship of -- every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party." Plaintiff shall file her amended Rule 7.1 disclosure statement by August 22, 2024. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 8/15/2024. (Vo, C)
August 14, 2024 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement, by Helen Trojanowski. (Mendez, D)
August 14, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Exhibits, served on Philips Respironc on 8/3/2024, filed by Helen Trojanowski. (Mendez, D)
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The Court has received Plaintiff's filing fee for this action. Accordingly, Plaintiff may now proceed to service of the complaint. The Court reminds Plaintiff that it is her responsibility to serve a summons and the operative complaint on Defendant, or request that Defendant waive service, and to file either proof of service or an executed waiver of service with the Court. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), Defendant must be served or waive service by October 28, 2024. If Plaintiff fails to file a proof of service showing that Defendant was served or has waived service by October 28, 2024, this action will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m). Plaintiff is directed to review the District Court's Guide for Self-Represented Litigants, available at https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/guide-self-represented-litigants, which provides guidance regarding service and other matters. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 7/31/2024. (Vo, C)
July 31, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Protective Order, #6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, and 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement. Signed by Clerk on 7-31-2024. (Shafer, J.)
July 29, 2024 Set Deadlines: Dismissal due by 10/29/2024. (Bergeson, Samantha)
July 29, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Shafer, J.)
July 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 7-29-2024. (Shafer, J.)
July 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 7-29-2024. (Shafer, J.)
July 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: amended pleadings due by 9-27-2024, discovery due by 1-28-2025, and dispositive motions due by 3-4-2025. Signed by Clerk on 7-29-2024. (Shafer, J.)
July 29, 2024 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2024.(Chartier, A.)
July 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Philips Respironics, filed by Helen Trojanowski.(Chartier, A.)
July 29, 2024 Filing fee received from Helen Trojanowski: $ 405.00, receipt number 28981 Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2024.(Chartier, A.)
July 29, 2024 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trojanowski v. Philips Respironics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Respironics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Trojanowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?