Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2024cv01346
Filed: August 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Third Party Early Discovery. The Court GRANTS the motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena before a Rule 26(f) conference, under the conditions outlined in the attached Order.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/13/2024. (McCowan, D)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Paige, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Arco, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Stalzer)(James, Jacqueline)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Early Discovery by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Standing Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Report on Copyright Form, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Signed by Clerk on 8/23/2024.(Freberg, B)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.(Freberg, B)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/22/2024.(Freberg, B)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/22/2024.(Freberg, B)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2024 Discovery due by 2/21/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 3/28/2025 Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2024.(Freberg, B)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/24.(Hushin, Z.)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO 121 Report on the case of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (James, Jacqueline)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7878335.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(James, Jacqueline)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge Victor A. Bolden and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?