Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2024cv01522
Filed: September 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert A Richardson
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re #12 Order on Motion for Leave to File Third Party Early Discovery Proof of service to ISP (James, Jacqueline)
October 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The #10 motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena is GRANTED subject to the conditions set forth in the attached.Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 10/11/2024. (Metzroth, R)
October 8, 2024 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Paige, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Arco, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Stalzer)(James, Jacqueline)
October 8, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Early Discovery by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
September 24, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #3 Report on Copyright Form, #7 Standing Protective Order, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #6 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 9/24/2024. (Peterson, M)
September 23, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.(Peterson, M)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 09/23/2024. (Peterson, M)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 09/23/2024. (Peterson, M)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/22/2024. Discovery due by 3/25/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2025. Signed by Clerk on 09/23/2024. (Peterson, M)
September 23, 2024 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/23/24.(Hushin, Z.)
September 23, 2024 Filing 3 AO 121 Report on the Case of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)
September 23, 2024 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (James, Jacqueline)
September 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7912138.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(James, Jacqueline)
September 23, 2024 Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?