King v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Plaintiff: John F. King
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv01579
Filed: October 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2024 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until January 6, 2025 Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Lyons, Thomas)
November 27, 2024 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Corporate by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Lyons, Thomas)
November 27, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Lyons, Thomas)
October 24, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Smith & Nephew, Inc. waiver sent on 10/7/2024, answer due 12/6/2024 filed by John F. King. (Davis, Alex)
October 24, 2024 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement for Plaintiff per Rule 7.1 by John F. King. (Davis, Alex)
October 24, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex C. Davis on behalf of John F. King (Davis, Alex)
October 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alex C. Davis. Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2024. (Freberg, B)
October 16, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alex C. Davis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7936909) by John F. King. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Murray, Brian)
October 4, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Smith & Nephew, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brian P. Murray* *Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP* *230 Park Avenue Suite 358* *New York, NY 10169*. (Freberg, B)
October 4, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by John F. King, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 10/4/2024.(Freberg, B)
October 2, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.(Freberg, B)
October 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/2/2024.(Freberg, B)
October 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/2/2024.(Freberg, B)
October 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2024 Discovery due by 4/3/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 5/8/2025 Signed by Clerk on 10/2/2024.(Freberg, B)
October 2, 2024 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/2/2024.(Perez, J.)
October 2, 2024 Judge Victor A. Bolden and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)
October 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7924201.), filed by John F. King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Murray, Brian)
October 2, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Murray, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. King
Represented By: Brian P. Murray
Represented By: Alex C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?