Joseph v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Cindy R Joseph
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv01700
Filed: October 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. Plaintiff has failed to file an appearance in this action by December 4, 2024. Defendant has also been unable to reach Plaintiff, despite multiple attempts to do so, to complete the Form AO-121 and to prepare the 26(f) report. See ECF Nos. #22 , #31 . Accordingly, the Court will not issue a scheduling order. Pursuant to Local Rule 41(a), the Court will dismiss this case for failure to prosecute if Plaintiff fails to appear and explain the reasons for her failure to prosecute by January 2, 2025. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/11/2024. (Vo, C)
December 9, 2024 Filing 31 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vick, Kevin)
December 3, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas R. Hartmann on behalf of Apple Inc. (Hartmann, Nicholas)
December 3, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Vick on behalf of Apple Inc. (Vick, Kevin)
December 3, 2024 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin L. Vick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7954960) by Apple Inc.. (Vick, Kevin)
December 3, 2024 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas R. Hartmann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7955005) by Apple Inc.. (Hartmann, Nicholas)
November 22, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 12/12/2024 (Bergeson, S)
November 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. Defendant has now filed the Local Rule 12(a) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Concerning Motion to Dismiss. The Court presumes it was mailed to Plaintiff at her address of record, in addition to being filed on the docket. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss by December 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/22/2024. (Vo, C)
November 21, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE by Apple Inc. to Self-Represented Litigant Concerning Motion to Dismiss (Pia, Gerald)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. Pursuant to Local Rule 12(a), any represented party moving to dismiss the complaint of a self-represented party shall file and serve, as a separate document, the "Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Concerning Motion to Dismiss" discussed in the Rule. Although Defendant has moved to dismiss the complaint, it has not filed the required Notice. Defendant shall file the Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Concerning Motion to Dismiss by November 25, 2024. Plaintiff's 21-day deadline to respond to the motion to dismiss will begin upon the filing of the Notice. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/20/2024. (Vo, C)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order and the District of Connecticut's Notice of Pro Se Appearance form to Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. Plaintiff must file the notice of appearance by December 4, 2024. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/20/2024. (Vo, C)
November 19, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE by Apple Inc. OF FILING OF COPYRIGHT FORM AO-121 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COPYRIGHT FORM AO-121)(Pia, Gerald)
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. For the Clerk to comply with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. sec. 508, the parties are required to complete the form attached at ECF No. 11. This form was due November 7, 2024, and has not been filed to date. Although the Court acknowledges Defendant's position that Plaintiff does not have a copyright registration number, the parties must still complete the form and file it pursuant to the directions in ECF No. 11. The completed form must be filed by November 19, 2024. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/12/2024. (Vo, C)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas R. Hartmann. Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/3/2025 Signed by Clerk on 11/4/2024. (Gaskins, A)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin L. Vick. Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/3/2025 Signed by Clerk on 11/4/2024. (Gaskins, A)
November 1, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas R. Hartmann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7955005) by Apple Inc.. (Pia, Gerald)
November 1, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin L. Vick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7954960) by Apple Inc.. (Pia, Gerald)
October 31, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Apple Inc..Responses due by 11/21/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Pia, Gerald)
October 30, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Roche on behalf of Apple Inc. (Roche, Brian)
October 28, 2024 Answer deadline updated for Apple Inc. to 10/31/2024. (Bergeson, S)
October 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by October 31, 2024. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/28/2024. (Vo, C)
October 28, 2024 Filing 13 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES. Signed by Clerk on 10/28/2024. (Mendez, D)
October 28, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 6 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #11 Requirement to file Copyright Form AO-121, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #10 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #9 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Apple Inc., #8 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/28/2024. (Mendez, D)
October 24, 2024 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel: For the Clerk to comply with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, you are requested to complete the top half of the attached form and efile it with the Clerk in ECF as an Other Document > Report on Copyright Form within 14 days. Copyright Form due by 11/7/2024. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2024. (Mendez, D)
October 24, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Mendez, D)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/24/2024. (Mendez, D)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/24/2024. (Mendez, D)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2024. Discovery due by 4/25/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2025. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2024. (Mendez, D)
October 24, 2024 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/9/2024 (Bergeson, S)
October 24, 2024 Filing 6 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/24.(Hushin, Z.)
October 24, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc.. (Pia, Gerald)
October 24, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Pending Motions (Pia, Gerald)
October 24, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re Local Rule 5(5) (Pia, Gerald)
October 24, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Removal Statement (Pia, Gerald)
October 24, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Apple Inc. from Connecticut Superior Court, case number FST-CV24-5031269-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7946181, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pia, Gerald)
October 24, 2024 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy R Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Gerald C. Pia, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas R. Hartmann
Represented By: Kevin Vick
Represented By: Brian C. Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?