Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2024cv01702
Filed: October 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 504 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 MOTION to Expedite Third Party Early Discovery by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/12/2024. (Lewis, D) (Lewis, D).
November 11, 2024 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Expedite Third Party Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Paige, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Arco, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Stalzer)(James, Jacqueline)
November 11, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite Third Party Early Discovery by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
October 25, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Report on Copyright Form, #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, Staff Notes, #1 Complaint filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #9 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, 5 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #8 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 10/25/2024.(Chartier, A.)
October 24, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.(Chartier, A.)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/24/2024.(Chartier, A.)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/24/2024.(Chartier, A.)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2024 Discovery due by 4/25/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2025 Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2024.(Chartier, A.)
October 24, 2024 Filing 5 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/24.(Hushin, Z.)
October 24, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re #1 Complaint Civil coversheet (James, Jacqueline)
October 24, 2024 Filing 3 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(James, Jacqueline)
October 24, 2024 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (James, Jacqueline)
October 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7946522.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(James, Jacqueline)
October 24, 2024 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?