Lang v. GoSupps.com LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Lang
Defendant: GoSupps.com LLC and Digital Incorporations LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv01779
Filed: November 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2025 Filing 20 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Digital Incorporations LLC.Responses due by 1/24/2025 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Miller, Mary)
December 31, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE by Robert Lang re #1 Complaint, of Errata - Corrected Complaint for ECF 1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Complaint)(Dunne, Joseph)
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to 1/5/2025 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/4/2024. (Rickevicius, L.)
December 4, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead by Digital Incorporations LLC. (Miller, Mary)
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying without prejudice #15 Motion for Extension of Time for failure to comply with Local Rule 7(b)(2). So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/4/2024. (Rickevicius, L.)
December 4, 2024 Answer deadline updated for Digital Incorporations LLC to 1/5/2025. (Rickevicius, L.)
December 3, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead by Digital Incorporations LLC. (Miller, Mary)
December 3, 2024 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement by Digital Incorporations LLC. (Miller, Mary)
December 3, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Mintel Miller on behalf of Digital Incorporations LLC (Miller, Mary)
November 15, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Lang. Digital Incorporations LLC served on 11/15/2024, answer due 12/6/2024. (Dunne, Joseph)
November 13, 2024 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Digital Incorporations LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph Dunne* *SRIPLAW, P.A.* *41 Madison Avenue Ste 25th Floor* *New York, NY 10010*. (Mendez, D)
November 13, 2024 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *GoSupps.com LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph Dunne* *SRIPLAW, P.A.* *41 Madison Avenue Ste 25th Floor* *New York, NY 10010*. (Mendez, D)
November 13, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Lang, #6 Electronic Filing Order, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 11/13/2024. (Mendez, D)
November 8, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Mendez, D)
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/8/2024. (Mendez, D)
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/8/2024. (Mendez, D)
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2025. Discovery due by 5/10/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 6/14/2025. Signed by Clerk on 11/8/2024. (Mendez, D)
November 8, 2024 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Robert Lang. (Dunne, Joseph)
November 8, 2024 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 11/8/24.(Hushin, Z.)
November 8, 2024 Filing 2 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Dunne, Joseph)
November 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement - Injunctive Relief Demanded against Digital Incorporations LLC, GoSupps.com LLC ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7963697.), filed by Robert Lang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunne, Joseph)
November 8, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to GoSupps.com LLC. (Dunne, Joseph)
November 8, 2024 Judge Robert N. Chatigny and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)
November 8, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Digital Incorporations LLC. (Dunne, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lang v. GoSupps.com LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoSupps.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Incorporations LLC
Represented By: Mary Mintel Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lang
Represented By: Joseph Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?