Friedeberg v. Dr. Bryan Meriam et al
Plaintiff: Donna L. Friedeberg
Defendant: Dr. Bryan Meriam and Dr. Jordan Greenberg
Case Number: 3:2024cv01977
Filed: December 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: Robert A Richardson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. By Order dated December 12, 2024, Plaintiff was advised that if she intended to prosecute her claims she must file a fully executed motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee by January 13, 2025. See ECF No. 6. She has not done so. Accordingly, it is ordered that this matter is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/27/2025.(Gould, K)
December 12, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2024.(Fanelle, N.)
December 12, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.(Fanelle, N.)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/12/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/12/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2025 Discovery due by 6/13/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 7/18/2025 Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
December 12, 2024 Filing 7 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2024.(Freberg, B)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: We received your Complaint which has been assigned case number 24cv1977. In order to proceed, the filing fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis must be submitted to the Court by 1/13/2025 or the case will be subject to dismissal. Fee information and the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis form may be found on the Court's website at ctd.uscourts.gov. Dismissal due by 1/13/2025. Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2024.(Freberg, B)
December 12, 2024 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-09074. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 12, 2024 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Freberg, B)
November 27, 2024 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Connecticut.(sgz)
November 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this court. This order closes this case in this court. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962).SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/27/2024) (sgz) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
November 27, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case..(tro)
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may #consent to electronic service to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for #permission to file documents electronically. Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (vba)
November 26, 2024 CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see #Rule 9.2 of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information..(vba)
November 26, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (vba)
November 22, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (vba)
November 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dr. Bryan Meriam, Dr. Jordan Greenberg. Document filed by Donna L. Friedbeberg.(vba)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friedeberg v. Dr. Bryan Meriam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L. Friedeberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Bryan Meriam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jordan Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?