Oppenheimer v. AI Engineers, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Gordon Oppenheimer
Defendant: AI Engineers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv01998
Filed: December 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2025 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement by AI Engineers, Inc.. (Voloshchuk, Tatyana)
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by February 25, 2025.Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/29/2025. (Lacina, A)
January 29, 2025 Answer deadline updated for Defendant to 2/25/2025. (Lacina, A)
January 28, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Tatyana Voloshchuk on behalf of AI Engineers, Inc. (Voloshchuk, Tatyana)
January 28, 2025 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 25, 2025 To Respond #1 Complaint, by AI Engineers, Inc.. (Corea, Andy)
January 28, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andy I. Corea on behalf of AI Engineers, Inc. (Corea, Andy)
January 6, 2025 Filing 10 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Fanelle, N.)
December 18, 2024 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *AI Engineers, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph Dunne* *SRIPLAW, P.A.* *41 Madison Avenue, Ste 25th Floor* *New York, NY 10010*. (Fanelle, N.)
December 18, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by David Gordon Oppenheimer, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 12/18/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
December 17, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel: For the Clerk to comply with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, you are requested to complete the top half of the attached form and efile it with the Clerk in ECF as an Other Document > Report on Copyright Form within 14 days. Copyright Form due by 1/2/2025. Signed by Clerk on 12/17/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
December 17, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.(Fanelle, N.)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/17/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/17/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2025 Discovery due by 6/18/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 7/23/2025 Signed by Clerk on 12/17/2024. (Fanelle, N.)
December 17, 2024 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/17/24.(Hushin, Z.)
December 17, 2024 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.)
December 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against AI Engineers, Inc. ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-8005636.), filed by David Gordon Oppenheimer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Registration, #2 Exhibit 2-Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunne, Joseph)
December 17, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to AI Engineers, Inc.. (Dunne, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. AI Engineers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gordon Oppenheimer
Represented By: Joseph Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AI Engineers, Inc.
Represented By: Tatyana Voloshchuk
Represented By: Andy I. Corea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?