Rice v. El Sol News, LLC
Plaintiff: John Curtis Rice
Defendant: El Sol News, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv02002
Filed: December 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2025 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Curtis Rice. El Sol News, LLC served on 1/3/2025, answer due 1/24/2025. (Sanders, Craig)
December 20, 2024 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *El Sol News, LLC * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig B. Sanders* *Sanders Law Group* *333 Earle Ovington Boulevard, Suite 402* *Uniondale, NY 11553*. (Peterson, M)
December 20, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Report on Copyright Form, #8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #7 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by John Curtis Rice, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Disclosure Statement filed by John Curtis Rice, #6 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2024. (Peterson, M)
December 18, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Peterson, M)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 12/18/2024. (Peterson, M)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 12/18/2024. (Peterson, M)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2025. Discovery due by 6/20/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 7/24/2025. Signed by Clerk on 12/18/2024. (Peterson, M)
December 18, 2024 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/18/24.(Hushin, Z.)
December 18, 2024 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by John Curtis Rice. (Sanders, Craig)
December 18, 2024 Filing 2 AO 121 Report on the re: Copyright Form Completed. (Sanders, Craig)
December 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against El Sol News, LLC ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-8006533.), filed by John Curtis Rice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photograph, #2 Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photograph, #3 Exhibit DMCA Screengrab of the Infringement, #4 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Craig)
December 18, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to El Sol News, LLC. (Sanders, Craig)
December 18, 2024 Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. El Sol News, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Curtis Rice
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Sol News, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?