Verch v. Portland Automotive, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Defendant: Portland Automotive, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv02009
Filed: December 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2025 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement by Portland Automotive, Inc.. (Zakrzewski, Steven)
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Extension of Time; denying as moot #14 Motion to Withdraw; granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time.The Court GRANTS Portland Automotive's consent motion for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading to Mr. Verch's Complaint until February 20, 2025.Accordingly, the Court DENIES Portland Automotive's earlier motion for extension of time, ECF No. #13 , and DENIES AS MOOT Portland Automotive's motion to withdraw that motion for extension of time, ECF No. #14 , in light of the extension of time already granted by the Court.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/17/2025. (McCowan, D)
January 16, 2025 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 20, 2025 to Plead by Portland Automotive, Inc.. (Zakrzewski, Steven)
January 16, 2025 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw #13 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 9, 2025 to Plead by Portland Automotive, Inc.. (Zakrzewski, Steven)
January 16, 2025 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 9, 2025 to Plead by Portland Automotive, Inc.. (Zakrzewski, Steven)
January 16, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J Zakrzewski on behalf of Portland Automotive, Inc. (Zakrzewski, Steven)
January 6, 2025 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marco Verch. Portland Automotive, Inc. served on 12/31/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (Dunne, Joseph)
December 20, 2024 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Portland Automotive, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph Dunne* *SRIPLAW, P.A.* *41 Madison Avenue Ste 25th Floor* *New York, NY 10010*. (Freberg, B)
December 20, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Marco Verch, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Report on Copyright Form, #8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #1 Complaint filed by Marco Verch, #7 Standing Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2024.(Freberg, B)
December 18, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.(Freberg, B)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/18/2024.(Freberg, B)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/18/2024.(Freberg, B) (Freberg, B).
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2025 Discovery due by 6/20/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 7/24/2025 Signed by Clerk on 12/18/2024.(Freberg, B)
December 18, 2024 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/18/2024.(Perez, J.)
December 18, 2024 Judge Victor A. Bolden and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)
December 18, 2024 Filing 3 AO 121 Report on the re: Copyright Form Completed. (Dunne, Joseph)
December 18, 2024 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Marco Verch. (Dunne, Joseph)
December 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portland Automotive, Inc. ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-8007294.), filed by Marco Verch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunne, Joseph)
December 18, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Portland Automotive, Inc.. (Dunne, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verch v. Portland Automotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portland Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J Zakrzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Represented By: Joseph Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?