Cornish, Jr. v. Tripp et al
Plaintiff: ORane M. Cornish, Jr.
Defendant: Cheyanne Tripp and Cristina Lopez
Case Number: 3:2024cv02019
Filed: December 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia to conduct an initial review of #18 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on February 13, 2025. (Bergeson, S)
February 11, 2025 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ORane M. Cornish, Jr.(Cornish, ORane) Modified on 2/11/2025 to correct document title. (Bergeson, S).
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion. The Court acknowledges that Plaintiff did not receive electronic notice of the order dated January 7, 2025, ECF No. 11. Due to an error in the system, notice of the order, ECF No. 11, was not electronically delivered. The error has since been corrected, and Plaintiff should receive electronic notice in this case going forward. In any event, Plaintiff had timely renewed his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, which was granted on January 21, 2025. ECF No. 15. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 1/23/2025. (Vo, C)
January 22, 2025 Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/12/2025 (Bergeson, S)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before February 12, 2025, after which it will undergo initial review by the Court before service is ordered. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 1/22/2025. (Vo, C)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 1/21/2025. (Vo, C)
January 20, 2025 Filing 14 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint by ORane M. Cornish, Jr. (Cornish, ORane) Modified on 1/22/2025 to correct document title. (Bergeson, S).
January 20, 2025 Filing 13 First RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS MOTION REGARDING FAILURE TO RECEIVE EMAIL NOTIFICATION OF COURT ORDER filed by ORane M. Cornish, Jr. (Cornish, ORane)
January 20, 2025 Filing 12 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ORane M. Cornish, Jr. (Cornish, ORane)
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Plaintiff was required to file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee by January 6, 2025. To date, he has done neither. The Court sua sponte extends the deadline for Plaintiff to file the renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or to pay the filing fee to January 21, 2025. If Plaintiff fails to take either action by this new deadline, the Court will dismiss the complaint and close the case. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 1/7/2025. (Vo, C)
January 7, 2025 Set Deadlines: Dismissal due by 1/21/2025. (Bergeson, S)
December 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing. Self-represented filers are required to comply with the standard electronic filing order docketed at case opening. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/26/2024. (Vo, C)
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis that fails to provide information about his employment. See ECF No. 2 at 3. Accordingly, this motion is denied without prejudice to Plaintiff refiling a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis addressing this deficiency. Plaintiff shall ensure he completes all relevant portions of the questionnaire before resubmitting the motion. Plaintiff must file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee on or before January 6, 2025. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/23/2024. (Vo, C)
December 19, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.(Gaskins, A)
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/19/2024.(Gaskins, A)
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/19/2024. (Gaskins, A)
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2025 Discovery due by 6/20/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/2025 Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2024.(Gaskins, A)
December 19, 2024 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Sichanh, C)
December 19, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by ORane M. Cornish, Jr. (Gaskins, A)
December 19, 2024 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2024.(Gaskins, A)
December 19, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ORane M. Cornish, Jr. (Gaskins, A)
December 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cristina Lopez, Cheyanne Tripp, filed by ORane M. Cornish, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 attachments)(Gaskins, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornish, Jr. v. Tripp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORane M. Cornish, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheyanne Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristina Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?