USA v. SDP L.L.C.
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: SDP L.L.C. doing business as Street Diesel Performance
Case Number: 3:2024cv02052
Filed: December 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vernon D Oliver
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2025 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *SDP L.L.C.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Alexandra B. Sherertz* *DOJ-Enrd* *P.O. Box 7611* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Gaskins, A)
January 22, 2025 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to SDP L.L.C.. (Sherertz, Alexandra)
January 2, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA, #6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Signed by Clerk on 1/2/2024.(Gaskins, A)
December 30, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.(Gaskins, A)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 12/30/2024.(Gaskins, A)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 12/30/2024.(Gaskins, A)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2025 Discovery due by 7/1/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 8/5/2025 Signed by Clerk on 12/30/2024.(Gaskins, A)
December 30, 2024 Judge Vernon D. Oliver and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Freberg, B)
December 30, 2024 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/30/24.(Hushin, Z.)
December 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SDP L.L.C., filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sherertz, Alexandra) Modified on 12/30/2024 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. SDP L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Anne F. Thidemann
Represented By: Alexandra B. Sherertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDP L.L.C. doing business as Street Diesel Performance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?