Pupovic et al v. Diamond Tucker St. Property, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Karen Pupovic and Ismet Pupovic
Defendant: Diamond Tucker St. Property, LLC and Redemption, LLC
Case Number: 3:2025cv00081
Filed: January 15, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2025 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #18 Emergency MOTION for Application to Discharge Lis Pendens Order Sur-Reply filed by Ismet Pupovic, Karen Pupovic. (Sternberg, Jenna)
March 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Any such sur-reply must be filed by March 17, 2025. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/13/25. (Nelson, J)
March 12, 2025 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply (relating to ECF 18) by Ismet Pupovic, Karen Pupovic. (Sternberg, Jenna)
March 11, 2025 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #18 Emergency MOTION for Application to Discharge Lis Pendens Order filed by Diamond Tucker St. Property, LLC, Redemption, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment Lien, #2 Exhibit CUFTA Complaint, #3 Exhibit June 21, 2024 Hearing Transcript)(Woods, Roderick)
March 3, 2025 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition re #18 Emergency MOTION for Application to Discharge Lis Pendens Order filed by Ismet Pupovic, Karen Pupovic. (Sternberg, Jenna)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER.The Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to respond to the Defendant's emergency motion for application to discharge lis pendens order, ECF No. #18 , by March 7, 2025, and any reply to the response is due by March 14, 2025.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/25/2025.(McCowan, D)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/24/2025.(Gould, K)
February 23, 2025 Filing 18 Emergency MOTION for Application to Discharge Lis Pendens Order by Diamond Tucker St. Property, LLC, Redemption, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lis Pendens, #2 Exhibit June 21, 2024 Hearing Transcript)(Woods, Roderick)
February 12, 2025 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #12 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with respectfully request case number 3:24-cv-01969 be consolidated with the instant case Reply to Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendants' Motion to Consolidate filed by Diamond Tucker St. Property, LLC, Redemption, LLC. (Woods, Roderick)
February 11, 2025 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with respectfully request case number 3:24-cv-01969 be consolidated with the instant case filed by Karen Pupovic, Ismet Pupovic. (Sternberg, Jenna)
February 11, 2025 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement by Karen Pupovic, Ismet Pupovic. (Sternberg, Jenna)
January 24, 2025 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna N. Sternberg on behalf of Karen Pupovic, Ismet Pupovic (Sternberg, Jenna)
January 24, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brennen Cutter Maki on behalf of Karen Pupovic, Ismet Pupovic (Maki, Brennen)
January 23, 2025 Filing 12 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with respectfully request case number 3:24-cv-01969 be consolidated with the instant case by Diamond Tucker St. Property, LLC, Redemption, LLC.Responses due by 2/13/2025 (Woods, Roderick)
January 23, 2025 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) by Redemption, LLC. (Woods, Roderick)
January 23, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Roderick David Woods on behalf of Diamond Tucker St. Property, LLC, Redemption, LLC (Woods, Roderick)
January 22, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE by Diamond Tucker St. Property, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Statement pursuant to standing order on removed cases (Woods, Roderick)
January 22, 2025 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7,1(a)(2) by Diamond Tucker St. Property, LLC. (Woods, Roderick)
January 16, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Diamond Tucker St. Property, LLC. Signed by Clerk on 1/15/2025. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Fanelle, N.)
January 15, 2025 Filing 6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Fanelle, N.)
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/15/2025. (Fanelle, N.)
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/15/2025. (Fanelle, N.)
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/17/2025 Discovery due by 7/17/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 8/21/2025 Signed by Clerk on 1/15/2025. (Fanelle, N.)
January 15, 2025 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/15/2025.(Perez, J.)
January 15, 2025 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)
January 15, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diamond Tucker St. Property, LLC from Superior Court of Connecticut, case number FBT-CV24-6139704-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-8033401, filed by Diamond Tucker St. Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(Woods, Roderick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pupovic et al v. Diamond Tucker St. Property, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Pupovic
Represented By: Brennen Cutter Maki
Represented By: Jenna N. Sternberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismet Pupovic
Represented By: Brennen Cutter Maki
Represented By: Jenna N. Sternberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Tucker St. Property, LLC
Represented By: Roderick David Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redemption, LLC
Represented By: Roderick David Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?