Dwamena v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kofi Essumang Dwamena
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2025cv00097
Filed: January 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER. The Government having filed the administrative record on March 18, 2025, the Court hereby enters the following Scheduling Order:Plaintiff shall file a motion to reverse and/or remand and supporting memorandum of law no later than April 17, 2025. Defendant shall then have until May 19, 2025 to file a motion to affirm or a motion for voluntary remand. Within 14 days after Defendant files its motion, Plaintiff may file a reply pursuant to Local Rule 7(d). The Court reminds the parties of the previously filed Standing Order which sets forth page limits and form and content requirements for motions and supporting memoranda. In addition to complying with these requirements, memoranda should avoid boilerplate discussions of the governing legal standards as the Court is familiar with the standard of review and the sequential evaluation process employed in the analysis of Social Security disability applications. The parties should focus on informing the Court of relevant and controlling legal authority and applying it to the facts of this case.Motions filed by the parties must comply with the requirements set forth above, in the Standing Order, and in the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply may result in denial of the motion. Any motion for extension of a deadline must comply with the Social Security Standing Order and Local Rule 7(b)(2) and must be filed at least three (3) days before the existing deadline.The Court notes that the administrative record in this case is unusually large. Plaintiff's counsel is respectfully encouraged to start working on his brief right away, and once he identifies the claims of error he will be asserting, he is directed to meet and confer with the Commissioner's counsel promptly in an effort to determine whether a reversal and voluntary remand are appropriate; if the parties do not so agree, then the Commissioner can likewise start working on his brief as soon as possible. Motions to amend the foregoing schedule are likely to be viewed liberally in light of the size of the record, if they represent that counsel has been working diligently on the case since the record was first docketed, but have been unable to meet the deadline in light of the record's size. Motions to amend that cannot make that representation may be received differently. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 3/20/25.(Wood, R.)
March 18, 2025 Filing 10 Social Security Transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Part 2 of 4, #2 Supplement Part 3 of 4, #3 Supplement Part 4 of 4)(Molinaro, John)
February 13, 2025 Filing 9 Consent and Transfer to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas O. Farrish. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 2/13/2025.(Nuzzi, T)
February 12, 2025 Filing 8 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Kofi Essumang Dwamena (Olinsky, Howard)
February 10, 2025 Filing 7 Notice of New SSA Action: Electronic service of the complaint was made by the Clerk's Office upon the Social Security Office of General Counsel and the US Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/2025.(Chartier, A.)
January 24, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Molinaro appearing for Commissioner of Social Security, bar number 206955. (Paperless filing) (Molinaro, John)
January 20, 2025 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel: Due to privacy restrictions on social security cases, absent both a consent to electronic notice and an approved motion for efiling privileges, counsel must mail paper copies to self-represented litigants. Signed by Clerk on 1/20/2025.(Chartier, A.)
January 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 1/20/2025.(Chartier, A.)
January 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order re: Social Security Cases. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 1/20/2025.(Chartier, A.)
January 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order regarding Assignment of Appeals of Social Security Administration Decisions. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 1/20/2025. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Chartier, A.)
January 20, 2025 Answer deadline updated for Commissioner of Social Security to 3/20/2025. (Chartier, A.)
January 20, 2025 Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)
January 20, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-8036775.), filed by Kofi Essumang Dwamena. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dwamena v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kofi Essumang Dwamena
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John Molinaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?