Smith v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2025cv00103
Filed: January 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah F Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2025 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Goico, Allison)
January 29, 2025 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Mia C. Larson on behalf of United Parcel Service, Inc. (Larson, Mia)
January 29, 2025 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Louise Goico on behalf of United Parcel Service, Inc. (Goico, Allison)
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mia C. Larson. Signed by Clerk on 1/29/2025. (Freberg, B)
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Allison L. Goico. Signed by Clerk on 1/29/2025. (Freberg, B)
January 28, 2025 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mia C. Larson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Flores, Javier)
January 28, 2025 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Allison L. Goico to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Flores, Javier)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mia C. Larson. Signed by District Judge Sarah F. Russell on 1/28/2025. (Chartier, A.)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Allison L. Goico. Signed by District Judge Sarah F. Russell on 1/28/2025. (Chartier, A.)
January 24, 2025 Answer deadline updated for United Parcel Service, Inc. to 2/18/2025. (Imbriani, S)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before February 18, 2025. Signed by District Judge Sarah F. Russell on 01/24/2025. (Neier, S)
January 24, 2025 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mia C. Larson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-8043319) by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Flores, Javier)
January 24, 2025 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Allison L. Goico to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-8043289) by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Flores, Javier)
January 23, 2025 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 18, 2025 In which to plead, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Michael Smith by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Flores, Javier)
January 23, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE by United Parcel Service, Inc. Of Pending Motions (Flores, Javier)
January 23, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE by United Parcel Service, Inc. Defendant's Statement as to Diversity of Citizenship (Flores, Javier)
January 22, 2025 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Michael Smith. (Reilly, Michael)
January 22, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #9 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols, #8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., #7 Standing Protective Order, #4 Disclosure Statement filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 1/22/2025. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Oliver, T.)
January 22, 2025 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by United Parcel Service, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. for United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Flores, Javier)
January 21, 2025 Filing 9 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 1/21/2025. (Attachments: #1 Discovery attachment) (Oliver, T.)
January 21, 2025 Filing 8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Oliver, T.)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Protective Order Signed by District Judge Sarah F. Russell on 1/21/2025. (Oliver, T.)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by District Judge Sarah F. Russell on 1/21/2025. (Oliver, T.)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/24/2025 Discovery due by 7/23/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 8/27/2025 Signed by Clerk on 1/21/2025. (Oliver, T.)
January 21, 2025 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/21/2025.(Perez, J.)
January 21, 2025 Judge Sarah F. Russell and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)
January 21, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Javier Flores on behalf of United Parcel Service, Inc. (Flores, Javier)
January 21, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Parcel Service, Inc. from CONNECTICUT SUPERIOR COURT HARTFORD JUDICIAL DISTRICT, case number HHD-CV-25-6197147-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-8038520, filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Return of Service, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filling Notice of Removal)(Flores, Javier)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Mia C. Larson
Represented By: Javier Flores
Represented By: Allison Louise Goico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?