Johnson v. King
Plaintiff: Rajia I. Johnson
Defendant: Michelle King
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2025cv00123
Filed: January 23, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 dc Review of SSA Decision SSDC - Concurrent Title II and Title XVI Claims
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2025 Filing 11 Social Security Transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9)(Peck, Jason)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, the case is reassigned to Judge Sarala V. Nagala for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2025.(Nuzzi, T)
February 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 2/6/2025. (Garcia, Maria)
January 28, 2025 Filing 8 Notice of New SSA Action: Electronic service of the complaint was made by the Clerk's Office upon the Social Security Office of General Counsel and the US Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. Signed by Clerk on 1/28/2025.(Chartier, A.)
January 28, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Peck appearing for Commissioner of Social Security, bar number (Paperless filing) (Peck, Jason)
January 23, 2025 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel: Due to privacy restrictions on social security cases, absent both a consent to electronic notice and an approved motion for efiling privileges, counsel must mail paper copies to self-represented litigants. Signed by Clerk on 1/23/2025.(Chartier, A.)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 1/23/2025.(Chartier, A.)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Social Security Cases. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 1/23/2025.(Chartier, A.)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order regarding Assignment of Appeals of Social Security Administration Decisions. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 1/23/2025. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Chartier, A.)
January 23, 2025 Answer deadline updated for Michelle King to 3/23/2025. (Chartier, A.)
January 23, 2025 Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)
January 23, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rajia I Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ramos, Ivan)
January 23, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Acting Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Rajia I Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramos, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajia I. Johnson
Represented By: Ivan A. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jason Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?