DeMerchant v. CoventBridge (USA), Inc.
Plaintiff: David DeMerchant
Defendant: CoventBridge (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 3:2025cv00233
Filed: February 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah F Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial disclosures due by May 30, 2025. Discovery due by March 16, 2026. Dispositive motions due by May 15, 2026. Initial Status Report due by December 16, 2025. Second Status Report due by March 23, 2026.All further deadlines are set forth in the attached scheduling order. Note that some of the dates in the scheduling order differ from those proposed by the parties' Rule 26(f) Report. Signed by Judge Sarah F. Russell on 04/08/2025.(Neier, S)
April 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Re: Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Judge Sarah F. Russell on 4/4/25.(Pesta, J.)
March 24, 2025 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by CoventBridge (USA), Inc..(Golicz, James)
March 19, 2025 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Golicz, James)
March 17, 2025 Answer deadline updated for CoventBridge (USA), Inc. to 3/24/2025. (Imbriani, S)
March 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time #8 . Defendant's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to on or before March 24, 2025. Signed by Judge Sarah F. Russell on 03/17/2025. (Neier, S)
February 19, 2025 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Notice (Other) filed by CoventBridge (USA), Inc., #8 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 24, 2025 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CoventBridge (USA), Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by CoventBridge (USA), Inc., #6 Disclosure Statement filed by CoventBridge (USA), Inc., #3 Notice of Appearance filed by CoventBridge (USA), Inc., #11 Standing Protective Order, #13 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by CoventBridge (USA), Inc., #12 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 7 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by CoventBridge (USA), Inc. Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2025. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Chartier, A.)
February 14, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 24, 2025 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CoventBridge (USA), Inc.. (Golicz, James)
February 14, 2025 CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Sarah F. Russell assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Spector. (Freberg, B)
February 13, 2025 Filing 13 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2025. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Chartier, A.) Modified on 2/20/2025 to correct signature (Nuzzi, T).
February 13, 2025 Filing 12 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.(Chartier, A.)
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Sarah F. Russell on 2/13/2025.(Chartier, A.)
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah F. Russell on 2/13/2025.(Chartier, A.)
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2025 Discovery due by 8/15/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 9/19/2025 Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2025.(Chartier, A.)
February 13, 2025 Filing 7 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2025.(Higgins, J.)
February 13, 2025 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by CoventBridge (USA), Inc.. (Golicz, James)
February 13, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE by CoventBridge (USA), Inc. Defendant's Notice of No Pending Motions (Golicz, James)
February 13, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE by CoventBridge (USA), Inc. Defendant's Statement re Removed Case (Golicz, James)
February 13, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula N. Anthony on behalf of CoventBridge (USA), Inc. (Anthony, Paula)
February 13, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James Golicz on behalf of CoventBridge (USA), Inc. (Golicz, James)
February 13, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CoventBridge (USA), Inc. from State of Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of Middlesex at Middletown, case number MMX-CV25-6044198-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-8066153, filed by CoventBridge (USA), Inc..(Golicz, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeMerchant v. CoventBridge (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David DeMerchant
Represented By: James V. Sabatini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoventBridge (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Paula N. Anthony
Represented By: James Golicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?