Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. v. Jajliardo
Plaintiff: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Erica Jajliardo
Case Number: 3:2025cv00259
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah F Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2025 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. re #14 Judgment (McClendon, Regina)
March 28, 2025 Filing 14 DECLARATORY JUDGMENT.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 3/28/2025.(Imbriani, S)
March 28, 2025 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Imbriani, S)
March 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting #12 Stipulation for Entry of Declaratory Judgment. The clerk is respectfully directed to close the case following entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Sarah F. Russell on 3/27/2025. (McDonough, J)
March 25, 2025 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Entry of Judgment by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Judgment)(McClendon, Regina)
March 25, 2025 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. Erica Jajliardo served on 3/12/2025, answer due 4/2/2025. (McClendon, Regina)
March 14, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (McClendon, Regina)
February 21, 2025 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Erica Jajliardo* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Regina J. McClendon* *Troutman Pepper Locke LLP* *Three Embarcadero Center, Suite 800* *San Francisco, CA 94111*. (Chartier, A.)
February 21, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Standing Protective Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Disclosure Statement, filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., #1 Complaint filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2025.(Chartier, A.)
February 20, 2025 Filing 7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.(Chartier, A.)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Sarah F. Russell on 2/20/2025.(Chartier, A.)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah F. Russell on 2/20/2025.(Chartier, A.)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/21/2025 Discovery due by 8/22/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 9/26/2025 Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2025.(Chartier, A.)
February 20, 2025 CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Sarah F. Russell assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Spector. (Freberg, B)
February 20, 2025 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2025.(Higgins, J.)
February 20, 2025 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Corporate Parent ICE Mortgage Services, LLC for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (McClendon, Regina)
February 20, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Erica Jajliardo ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-8072622.), filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McClendon, Regina)
February 20, 2025 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Erica Jajliardo. (McClendon, Regina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. v. Jajliardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Regina J. McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Jajliardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?