Kulmann v. Sullivan
Plaintiff: Linda Kulmann and Linda Ceniccola-Kulmann
Defendant: Timothy Sullivan
Case Number: 3:2025cv00275
Filed: February 25, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2025 Filing 11 OBJECTION to Magistrate Judge Recommendation filed by Linda Kulmann. (Kelsey, N)
March 6, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE for Filings Papers by Linda Kulmann (Peterson, M)
February 25, 2025 Filing 8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction.(Peterson, M)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order re: Letters. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 02/25/2025. (Peterson, M)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 02/25/2025. (Peterson, M)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 02/25/2025. (Peterson, M)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2025. Discovery due by 8/27/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2025. Signed by Clerk on 02/25/2025. (Peterson, M)
February 25, 2025 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/25/2025.(Gaskins, A)
February 25, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Linda Kulmann. (Gaskins, A) Modified on 2/28/2025 to correct name in docket text (Peterson, M).
February 25, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Sullivan, filed by Linda Kulmann. (Attachments: #1 attachments)(Gaskins, A) Modified on 2/28/2025 to correct name in docket text (Peterson, M).
February 25, 2025 CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Omar A. Williams assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti. (Sichanh, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kulmann v. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kulmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ceniccola-Kulmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?