Williamson v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Richard A. Williamson
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00216
Filed: February 19, 2014
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2015 Remark : ase transferred from Delaware has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:15-cv-00966, filed 03/03/2015. (rwc)
March 2, 2015 Case transferred electronically to the Northern District of California. (mdb)
March 2, 2015 67 Featured Case ORDER - granting 11 Motion to Transfer Case. This action is transferred to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/2/2015. (mdb)
February 27, 2015 66 DECLARATION re 64 Claim Construction Opening Brief of Eli Ewing by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 27, 2015 65 DECLARATION re 64 Claim Construction Opening Brief of Peter Alexander by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 27, 2015 64 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Main Document 64 replaced on 3/2/2015) (mdb).
February 27, 2015 63 DECLARATION re 62 Claim Construction Opening Brief of Audrey Maness by Richard A. Williamson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Farnan, Brian)
February 27, 2015 62 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Richard A. Williamson. (Farnan, Brian)
February 27, 2015 61 Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Defendant's February 26, 2015 Letter - re 59 Letter. (Farnan, Brian)
February 27, 2015 60 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J. Rosen of KEKER & VAN NEST LLP - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 26, 2015 59 Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Motion to Stay. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 26, 2015 58 DECLARATION re 57 Answering Brief in Opposition of Justin L. Constant by Richard A. Williamson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Farnan, Brian)
February 26, 2015 57 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 53 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Richard A. Williamson.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/9/2015. (Farnan, Brian)
February 25, 2015 56 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Google Inc. on 3/18/2015 filed by Richard A. Williamson.(Farnan, Brian)
February 17, 2015 55 DECLARATION re 53 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review -- Declaration of Eli Ewing -- by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibits F-I)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 17, 2015 54 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 53 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/6/2015. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 17, 2015 53 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 11, 2015 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Google Inc. and Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Google Inc. filed by Richard A. Williamson.(Farnan, Michael)
February 10, 2015 51 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Phillip Lindsay on March 3, 2015 filed by Richard A. Williamson.(Farnan, Michael)
February 10, 2015 50 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Scheele on March 3, 2015 filed by Richard A. Williamson.(Farnan, Michael)
February 10, 2015 49 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Russ Seligman on March 3, 2015 filed by Richard A. Williamson.(Farnan, Michael)
February 6, 2015 48 CLAIM Construction Chart by Richard A. Williamson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael)
January 30, 2015 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Disclosures Pursuant to Section 3 of the Stipulated Order Re: Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) filed by Richard A. Williamson.(Farnan, Brian)
January 30, 2015 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Section 3 of the Stipulated Order Re: Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 26, 2015 45 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Abhishek Bajoria as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with Keker & Van Nest LLP. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 26, 2015 Featured Case SO ORDERED - re 44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eli Ewing filed by Google Inc. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/26/2015. (mdb)
January 22, 2015 44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eli Ewing - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 21, 2015 43 Featured Case ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Telephone Conference is set for 6/4/2015 at 11:00 AM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Defense counsel to initiate the teleconference call. A Mediation Conference is set for 7/1/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/21/15. (cak)
January 20, 2015 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Preliminary Proposed Terms for Construction and Preliminary Proposed Claim Terms filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 9, 2015 Featured Case SO ORDERED - re 41 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit Final Joint Claim Chart to 2/6/2015 filed by Richard A. Williamson. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/9/2015. (mdb)
January 8, 2015 41 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit Final Joint Claim Chart to 2/6/2015 - filed by Richard A. Williamson. (Farnan, Brian)
December 19, 2014 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 4, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED - re 39 Proposed Order re: Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by filed by Richard A. Williamson. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/4/2014. (mdb)
December 1, 2014 39 PROPOSED ORDER [Stipulated] Order re: Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by Richard A. Williamson. (Farnan, Brian)
November 20, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED - re 38 Proposed Protective Order filed by Richard A. Williamson. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/20/2014. (mdb)
November 20, 2014 38 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Protective Order by Richard A. Williamson. (Farnan, Brian)
November 18, 2014 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s First Amended Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 13, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Discovery Telephone Conference held on 11/13/2014. Discussion on the issue outlined in 36 Letter. Counsel shall discuss the issue further using the guidance provided during the teleconference. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) (mdb)
November 7, 2014 36 Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Brian E. Farnan regarding Item to be presented at November 13, 2014 Teleconference. (Farnan, Brian)
November 5, 2014 Featured Case ORAL ORDER SCHEDULING A DISCOVERY TELECONFERENCE (#1): A Discovery Teleconference has been set in this matter for Thursday, November 13, 2014, at 10:30 AM with the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to arrange the conference call. A Joint Agenda letter (see court website for sample) shall be filed no later than NOON on Friday, November 7, 2014. The parties are directed to contact chambers at (302) 573-4559 once all parties are on the line. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/5/2014. (ctd)
October 30, 2014 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Claim Charts filed by Richard A. Williamson.(Farnan, Brian)
October 6, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Julius Jefferson for Richard A. Williamson added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
October 2, 2014 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant Google's First Set of Interrogatories; and (ii) Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant Google's First Set of Requests for Production filed by Richard A. Williamson.(Farnan, Brian)
September 22, 2014 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Google Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Richard A. Williamson's First Set of Interrogatories; (2) Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set fo Requests for Production and (3) Defendant Google Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Richard A. Williamson's First Set of Requests for Admission filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 21, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED - re 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julius Jefferson filed by Richard A. Williamson. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/21/2014. (mdb)
August 21, 2014 32 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: A teleconference has been scheduled for 1/14/15 at 11:00 AM EASTERN TIME with Judge Thynge. Counsel for Google shall initiate the teleconference call. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/21/14. (cak)
August 20, 2014 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Google Inc.; (ii) Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Google Inc.; and (iii) Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Google Inc. filed by Richard A. Williamson.(Farnan, Brian)
August 20, 2014 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julius Jefferson - filed by Richard A. Williamson. (Farnan, Brian)
July 31, 2014 29 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Richard A. Williamson re 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Farnan, Brian)
July 31, 2014 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Accused Products and Asserted Patents Pursuant to Section 4(a) of the Delaware Default Standard filed by Richard A. Williamson.(Farnan, Brian)
July 29, 2014 27 Official Transcript of t/c held on 06 23 14 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maurer. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/19/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2014. (kjm)
July 28, 2014 26 DECLARATION re 25 Reply Brief -- Declaration of Matthias A. Kamber -- by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 28, 2014 25 REPLY BRIEF re 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 23, 2014 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures filed by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 23, 2014 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Richard A. Williamson.(Farnan, Brian)
July 22, 2014 22 Featured Case ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 8/21/2014 at 11:30 AM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/22/14. (cak)
July 21, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Judge Thynge for Mediation. (cak)
July 18, 2014 21 DECLARATION re 19 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Richard A. Williamson by Richard A. Williamson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Farnan, Brian)
July 18, 2014 20 DECLARATION re 19 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Brian E. Farnan by Richard A. Williamson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V)(Farnan, Brian)
July 18, 2014 19 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Richard A. Williamson.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/28/2014. (Farnan, Brian)
July 11, 2014 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures of Accused Products and Asserted Patents Pursuant to Section 4(a) of the Delaware Default Standard filed by Richard A. Williamson.(Farnan, Brian)
July 3, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED - re 17 Proposed Order; Setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. ( Claim Construction: Opening Brief due by 2/27/2014, Answering Brief due 3/27/2015., Amended Pleadings due by 1/9/2015., Joinder of Parties due by 1/9/2015., Fact Discovery due by 3/29/2015., Expert Discovery: Opening Reports due 6/29/2015, Rebuttal Reports due 7/31/2015, Completed by 8/28/2015., Letter Briefing re Summary Judgment: Opening due by 9/18/2015, Answering due 10/2/2015, Reply due 10/9/2015., A 3-hour Markman Hearing is set for 4/29/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4A., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2016., A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A., A 7-day Jury Trial is set for 4/4/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Gregory M. Sleet.) Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/3/2014. (mdb)
July 2, 2014 17 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Richard A. Williamson. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet)(Farnan, Brian)
July 1, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED - re 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to respond to Google's Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) to 7/18/2014 filed by Richard A. Williamson; Set Briefing Schedule: re 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Answering Brief due 7/18/2014.) Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/1/2014. (mdb)
June 30, 2014 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to respond to Google's Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) to 7/18/2014 - filed by Richard A. Williamson. (Farnan, Brian)
June 23, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 6/23/2014. A 3-hour Markman Hearing is set for 4/29/2015 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4A; Final Pretrial Order due by the close of business on 2/22/2016; A Pretrial Conference is set for 3/21/2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4A; A 7-day Jury Trial is set for 4/4/2016 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4A. Counsel shall decide on the remaining scheduling order deadlines and submit a proposed scheduling order by 7/2/2014. Case is referred to the Magistrate Judge for exploring ADR. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) (mdb)
June 18, 2014 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by Richard A. Williamson. (Farnan, Brian)
June 17, 2014 14 DECLARATION re 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California (Declaration of Matthias A. Kamber) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 17, 2014 13 DECLARATION re 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California (Declaration of Abeer Dubey) by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 17, 2014 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/7/2014. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 17, 2014 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 10, 2014 Featured Case ORAL ORDER SCHEDULING A RULE 16.2b SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE: A Rule 16.2b Scheduling Teleconference has been set in this matter for Monday, June 23, 2014, at 9:30 AM with the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report (see court website for sample) no later than the close of business on Wednesday, June 18, 2014. Counsel for plaintiff(s) is directed to initiate the call and contact chambers at (302) 573-4559 once all parties are on the line. Ordered by Chief Judge Sleet 6/10/2014. (ctd)
April 14, 2014 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 14, 2014 9 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Google Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 8, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christa M Anderson for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
April 4, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthias Kamber,Robert A. Van Nest,Abhishek Bajoria for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
April 3, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert A. Van Nest; Christa Anderson; Matthias A. Kamber; and Abhishek Bajoria filed by Google Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/3/14. (mmm)
April 2, 2014 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert A. Van Nest; Christa Anderson; Matthias A. Kamber; and Abhishek Bajoria - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 21, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Audrey Maness,Garland Stephens,Jared Bobrow,Justin L. Constant for Richard A. Williamson added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
March 13, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Richard Slack for Richard A. Williamson added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 10, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jared Bobrow, Garland Stephens, Justin Constant, Richard Slack, and Audrey Maness filed by Richard A. Williamson. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/10/2014. (asw)
March 10, 2014 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Google Inc. answer due 4/14/2014. (asw)
March 10, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Respond to Complaint to April 14, 2014 filed by Google Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/10/2014. (asw)
March 10, 2014 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jared Bobrow, Garland Stephens, Justin Constant, Richard Slack, and Audrey Maness - filed by Richard A. Williamson. (Farnan, Brian)
March 3, 2014 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Respond to Complaint to April 14, 2014 - filed by Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 1, 2014 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Richard A. Williamson. (Farnan, Brian)
February 26, 2014 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 24, 2014 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard A. Williamson. Google Inc. served on 2/20/2014, answer due 3/13/2014. (Farnan, Brian)
February 20, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Google Inc. on 2/20/2014. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (dmp, )
February 19, 2014 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,014,698; US 6,286,045 B1;. (dmp, )
February 19, 2014 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (dmp, )
February 19, 2014 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Google Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-1464208.) - filed by Richard A. Williamson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Williamson
Represented By: Jared Bobrow
Represented By: Justin L. Constant
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
Represented By: Audrey Maness
Represented By: Richard Slack
Represented By: Garland Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?