In re: DNIB UNWIND, INC. et al.

Debtor: DNIB Unwind, Inc. et al.
Appellant: B.E. Capital Management Fund LP
Appellee: Geoffrey L. Berman
Case Number: 1:2017cv00945
Filed: July 14, 2017
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Withdrawing the Bankruptcy Appeal from Mediation granting 10 Recommendation; ORDER setting briefing schedule: ( Appellant Brief due by 8/28/2017., Appellee Brief due by 9/27/2017., Appellant Reply Brief due by 10/11/2017.). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/10/2017. (asw)
August 8, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 4 Emergency Motion. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/8/2017. (asw)
August 4, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/4/17. (kjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: DNIB UNWIND, INC. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: DNIB Unwind, Inc. et al.
Represented By: Amanda Rose Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: B.E. Capital Management Fund LP
Represented By: Julia Bettina Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Geoffrey L. Berman
Represented By: Amanda Rose Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?