Davis, et al v. Mountaire Farms,Inc., et al

Case Number: 1:2004cv00414
Filed: June 21, 2004
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
Presiding Judge: Vacant Judgeship
Referring Judge: Mary Pat Thynge
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2009 155 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/24/2009. (nmf)
March 6, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/6/2009. (nmf)
January 22, 2009 148 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/22/2009. (nmf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis, et al v. Mountaire Farms,Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?