Norman v. Elkin et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv00005
Filed: January 3, 2006
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MEMORANDUM OPINION re issues on remand. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/4/18. (ntl)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 306 MOTION to Amend Briefing Schedule Due to Settlement Discussions and for Expedited Consideration filed by David W. Elkin. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/12/17. (ntl)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying re 288 Emergency MOTION filed by Jeffrey M. Norman, denying without prejudice re 286 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by David W. Elkin. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/12/2016. (rpg)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 261 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest/MOTION for Sanctions, denying 266 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Renewed), denying 276 MOTION to Strike 274 Reply Brief, granting 253 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Renewed). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/14/2015. (rpg)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 192 motion to disqualify. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/10/14. (ntl)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM OPINION re plaintiff's motion for new trial (D.I. 159). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/26/12. (ntl)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 126 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 127 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Fiduciary Duty Claim, 134 MOTION for Pre-Judgment Interest, Post-Judgment Interest and Attorneys' Fees on Judgment for Brea ch of Contract, Fraud, and Unjust Enrichment Against Defendant David Elkin, and 153 MOTION to Strike 151 Reply Brief to Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/30/2010. (nms)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 82 Motion for Summary Judgment and 86 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/28/2009. (nms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Elkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?