Apple Inc. v. Atico International USA Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Apple Inc. alleged that Defendants Atico International USA Inc. and New Atico International Limited Corporation manufactured and sold iPod accessories which were not licensed or otherwise sponsored by Apple. Defendants also allegedly infringed U.S. Patent No. 7,305,506 entitled "Method and System for Transferring Status Information Between a Media Player and an Accessory," Nos. D551,212, D551,213, and D552,085 entitled "Dock Insert," and No. D558,738 entitled "Docking Station."

Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Defendant: Atico International USA Inc. and New Atico International Limited Corporation
Case Number: 1:2008cv00283
Filed: May 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Patent Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2008 CASE CLOSED (asw)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 15 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Apple Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/24/2008. (asw)
September 22, 2008 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Apple Inc.. (Gaza, Anne)
July 8, 2008 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Atico International USA Inc., New Atico International Limited Corporation. (Seitz, Collins)
July 8, 2008 Filing 13 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Atico International USA Inc., New Atico International Limited Corporation.(Seitz, Collins)
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint with Proposed Order to July 8, 2008 filed by New Atico International Limited Corporation, Atico International USA Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Atico International USA Inc. answer due 7/8/2008; New Atico International Limited Corporation answer due 7/8/2008. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/25/2008. (asw)
June 25, 2008 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint with Proposed Order to July 8, 2008 - filed by Atico International USA Inc., New Atico International Limited Corporation. (Brady, Kevin)
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 10 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or other respond to Apple's Complaint (REVISED MOTION) filed by Apple Inc., 11 Proposed Order filed by Apple Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Atico International USA Inc. answer due 6/25/2008; New Atico International Limited Corporation answer due 6/25/2008. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/4/2008. (asw)
June 4, 2008 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER to move, answer or otherwise respond to Complaint (REVISED) re 10 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or other respond to Apple's Complaint (REVISED MOTION) by Apple Inc.. (Gaza, Anne)
June 4, 2008 Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or other respond to Apple's Complaint (REVISED MOTION) - filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaza, Anne)
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond to Apple's Complaint filed by Apple Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/4/2008. (asw)
June 4, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond to Apple's Complaint - filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaza, Anne)
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Theodore T. Herhold, Angus M. MacDonald and Priya Sreenivasan filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/30/08. (mmm)
May 29, 2008 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Theodore T. Herhold, Angus M. MacDonald and Priya Sreenivasan - filed by Apple Inc.. (Gaza, Anne)
May 21, 2008 Case assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 16, 2008 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc.. Atico International USA Inc. served on 5/15/2008, answer due 6/4/2008. (Gaza, Anne)
May 16, 2008 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc.. New Atico International Limited Corporation served on 5/15/2008, answer due 6/4/2008. (Gaza, Anne)
May 15, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Moyer on behalf of Apple Inc. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2008 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,305,506 B1; D551,212 S; D551,213 S; D552,085 S; D558,738 S; (sns, )
May 14, 2008 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Apple Inc. (sns, )
May 14, 2008 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of a U.S. Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction (sns, )
May 14, 2008 Summons Issued as to Atico International USA Inc. on 5/14/2008; New Atico International Limited Corporation on 5/14/2008. (sns, )
May 14, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Duty against Atico International USA Inc., New Atico International Limited Corporation -(Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 03110000000000446806.) - filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sns, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2008: # 2 Exhibit A-E) (sns, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Atico International USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atico International USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Atico International Limited Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?