Pease v. Crane Company
Plaintiff: Jeremy Pease, Christopher Pease and Herbert Pease
Defendant: CBS Corporation, Soco-West Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Navistar Inc., DaimlerChrysler Motors Corporation, Viacom Inc., General Motors Corporation, Yarway Corporation, Georgia Pacific Corporation, Leslie Controls Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc., Buffalo Pumps Inc., Ford Motor Company, RPM International, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, American Standard Inc., AGCO Corporation, A.W. Chesterton Company, Asbestos Corporation Limited, Caterpillar Inc., Armstrong International Inc., Deere & Company, Borg Warner Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Goulds Pumps Inc., Brenntag West Inc., Dana Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Imo Industries Inc., Bondex International Inc., ROM International Inc., Chrysler Corporation, Hopeman Brothers Inc., Peerless Industries Inc., Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC, Owens-Illinois Inc., Soco-Lynch Corporation, Quintec Industries Inc., International Truck & Engine Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Crane Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, T.H. Agriculture & Nutrition LLC, Copes-Vulcan Inc., General Electric Company, Garlock Inc., Gardner Denver Inc., Union Carbide Chemicals and Plastic Company Inc. and Uniroyal Inc.
Special Master: SPECIAL MASTER Vincent J. Poppiti, -SM-
Case Number: 1:2008cv00624
Filed: September 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Sue L Robinson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #165 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Based upon no defendants remaining filed by Herbert Pease, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/15/2012. (fms)
May 14, 2012 Motions No Longer Referred to Judge Sherry R. Fallon: #165 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Based upon no defendants remaining (fms)
May 11, 2012 Filing 165 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Based upon no defendants remaining - filed by Herbert Pease. (Crumplar, Thomas) Modified on 5/14/2012 (fms).
May 11, 2012 Filing 164 NOTICE of withdrawal of plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss by Jeremy Pease (Crumplar, Thomas)
May 10, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Status Telephone Conference held on 5/10/2012. (Court Reporter G. D'Amore (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
May 8, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. 163 has been modified to reflect that the motion is not referred to Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (lih)
May 8, 2012 Motion No Longer Referred to Judge Sherry R. Fallon: #163 First MOTION to Dismiss Based upon no defendants remaining. (lih)
May 8, 2012 Filing 163 First MOTION to Dismiss Based upon no defendants remaining - filed by Herbert Pease.(Crumplar, Thomas) Modified on 5/8/2012 (lih).
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Setting Status Teleconference (Counsel for plaintiff's shall initiate the call ): A Telephone Status Conference is set for 5/10/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/3/2012. (lih)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon.The referral of the case to Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti is hereby withdrawn. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/30/2012. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(fms)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; denying #142 Motion for Summary Judgment ; adopting #152 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/27/2012. (fms)
April 3, 2012 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally J. Daugherty on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Daugherty, Sally)
March 1, 2012 Filing 158 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to Thomas C Crumplar, Esq. re #154 Motion to Strike. Courtesy copy not received by end of next business day. (fms)
February 21, 2012 Filing 157 RESPONSE to Motion re #154 MOTION to Strike and Response to Crane Co.'s Objections to the Special Master's Report and Recomendation Regarding Crane Co.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Skiles, Nicholas)
February 20, 2012 Filing 156 Letter to Judge Robinson from Special Master Poppiti - re #152 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated January 6, 2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(fms)
February 10, 2012 Filing 155 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint - filed by Jeremy Pease. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit original complaint, #2 Certificate of Compliance notice of averment, #3 Exhibit Complaint with proposed changes, #4 Exhibit Clean complaint)(Crumplar, Thomas)
February 7, 2012 Filing 154 MOTION to Strike and Response to Crane Co.'s Objections to the Special Master's Report and Recomendation Regarding Crane Co.'s Motion for Summary Judgment - filed by Christopher Pease, Herbert Pease. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, Part 1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, Part 2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C, Part 2.1, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C, Part 3, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C, Part 4, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C, Part 5, #11 Exhibit Exhibit C, Part 6)(Crumplar, Thomas)
January 27, 2012 Filing 153 OBJECTION to #152 Report and Recommendations by Crane Company. (Skiles, Nicholas)
January 6, 2012 Filing 152 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re #143 Opening Brief in Support filed by Crane Company, #142 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crane Company. The Special Master recommends that Crane Co.'s Motion for Summary Judgment should be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 1/30/2012. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 1/6/2012. (fms)
December 12, 2011 Filing 151 Official Transcript of telephone conference held on December 1, 2011 before Judge Special Master Vincent Poppiti. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sandra Worrell,Telephone number (302) 571-0510. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2012. (vjg)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #150 PROPOSED SHORTEN TIME ORDER re #149 Order on Motion for Leave to File signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 11/7/2011. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/8/2011. (fms)
November 7, 2011 Filing 150 PROPOSED SHORTEN TIME ORDER re #149 Order on Motion for Leave to File signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 11/7/2011. (fms)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER dismissing #147 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 11/7/2011. (fms)
November 4, 2011 Filing 148 STATEMENT (7.1.1) of by Herbert Pease re #147 MOTION for Leave to File A surreply in Response to Crane's Motion for summary judgment (Crumplar, Thomas) Modified on 11/7/2011 (fms).
November 2, 2011 LOCAL RULE 7.1.1 NOTICE: In accordance with Local Rule 7.1.1, except for civil cases involving pro se parties or motions brought by nonparties, every nondispositive motion shall be accompanied by an averment of counsel for the moving party that a reasonable effort has been made to reach agreement with the opposing party on the matters set forth in the motion. Unless otherwise ordered, failure to so aver may result in dismissal of the motion. The records of this case do not reflect such an averment by counsel for DI # 147. (fms)
October 31, 2011 Filing 147 MOTION for Leave to File A surreply in Response to Crane's Motion for summary judgment - filed by Herbert Pease. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Prop[osed Order)(Crumplar, Thomas)
October 20, 2011 Filing 146 REPLY to Response to Motion re #142 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Skiles, Nicholas)
October 12, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: The certificates of service docketed as D.I. Nos. 146 and 147 have been deleted from the docket and have been attached to D.I. 145. Certificates of service, if necessary, should be included as either the last page of the main document or as an attachment to the main document. (fms)
October 11, 2011 Filing 145 First ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #142 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crane Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/21/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C part 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C part 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C part 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C part 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C part 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C part 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C part 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit C part 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit C part 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit C part 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit C part 12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit C part 13, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D part 1, #17 Exhibit Exhibit D part 2, #18 Exhibit Exhibit D part 3, #19 Exhibit Exhibit E part 1, #20 Exhibit Exhibit E part 2, #21 Exhibit Exhibit E part 3, #22 Exhibit Exhibit E part 4, #23 Exhibit Exhibit F, #24 Exhibit Exhibit G, #25 Exhibit Exhibit H, #26 Exhibit Exhibit I, #27 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Crumplar, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2011: #28 certificate of service, #29 certificate of service) (fms).
September 30, 2011 Filing 144 Letter to Counsel from Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti regarding the Motion for Summary Judgment. (fms)
September 16, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: The opening brief attached to the motion for summary jgm (D.I. 142) has been deleted as an attachment to D.I. 142 and docketed using the opening brief code. MOTIONS, BRIEFS AND APPENDICES should be filed as three separate documents using three separate docket codes. Standard briefing on a motion should utilize the codes Motion, Brief-Opening Brief in Support, Brief-Answering Brief in Opposition and Brief-Reply. (fms) Modified on 9/16/2011 (fms).
September 15, 2011 Filing 143 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #142 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crane Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/3/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C1, #4 Exhibit C2)(fms)
September 15, 2011 Filing 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C1, # 5 Exhibit C2, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Skiles, Nicholas)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER FOR MATTERS BEFORE SPECIAL MASTER: Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2011. Answering Brief due 10/10/2011. Reply Brief due 10/20/2011. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/2/2011. (nmf)
August 31, 2011 Filing 140 PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER FOR MATTERS BEFORE SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti 8/31/2011. (nmf)
August 15, 2011 Filing 139 PROPOSED ORDER Pretrial Scheduling Order for matters before Special Master by Crane Company. (Skiles, Nicholas)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER - on or before August 15, 2011, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a written report to the Court by close of business on that date. (See order for details). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/8/2011. (fms)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 REVISED ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/16/2011. (nmf)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #135 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney G. Sean Jez, Esquire filed by Christopher Pease, Jeremy Pease, Herbert Pease, #136 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William B. Allen filed by Christopher Pease, Jeremy Pease, Herbert Pease. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/10/11. (fms)
May 13, 2011 Filing 136 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William B. Allen - filed by Christopher Pease, Herbert Pease, Jeremy Pease. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion Notice of Motion, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certification of William B. Allen, Esq.)(Crumplar, Thomas)
May 13, 2011 Filing 135 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney G. Sean Jez, Esquire - filed by Christopher Pease, Herbert Pease, Jeremy Pease. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion Notice of Motion, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certification of G. Sean Jez)(Crumplar, Thomas)
May 5, 2011 Filing 134 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Christopher Pease, Herbert Pease, Jeremy Pease. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Status of Case)(Jacobs, Robert)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #133 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/3/11. (fms)
April 29, 2011 Filing 133 PROPOSED ORDER and Rule to Show Cause signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti. (fms)
March 31, 2011 Filing 131 Letter to Counsel from Special Master Poppiti regarding status conference. (nmf)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Special Master. Vincent J. Poppiti appointed. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/16/2011. (nmf)
March 10, 2011 Filing 132 DESIGNATION OF CONTENTS OF RECORD ON REMAND - pursuant to Rule 10.4(A) STATEMENT - filed by Crane Company. (The Designated Items can be found located under DI#'s 126, 127 & 128 of Delaware Case CA 08-624 SLR). (rwc)
March 8, 2011 Filing 129 Local Counsel Letter sent to Stewart R. Singer. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/8/2011. (rwc)
March 8, 2011 Filing 128 Record of Remand Case transferred in from District of ED/PA; Case Number in Other District: 09-cv-62581. (DI#'s 134 - 161 with exhibits attached (Attachments: #1 DI#134 Tab 1, #2 DI#134 Tab 2, #3 DI#134 Tab 3, #4 DI#134 Tab 4, #5 DI#134 Tab 5, #6 DI#134 Tab 6, #7 DI#134 Tab 7, #8 DI#134 Tab 8, #9 DI#134 Tab 9, #10 DI#134 Tab 10, #11 DI#134 Tab 11, #12 DI#134 Tab 12, #13 DI#134 Tab 13, #14 DI#134 Tab 14, #15 DI#134 Tab 15, #16 DI#134 Tab 16, #17 DI#134 Tab 17, #18 DI#134 Tab 18, #19 DI#134 Tab 19, #20 DI#134 Tab 20, #21 DI#134 Tab 21, #22 DI#134 Tab 22, #23 DI#134 Tab 23, #24 DI#134 Tab 24, #25 DI#134 Tab 25, #26 DI#134 Tab 26, #27 DI#134 Tab 27, #28 DI#134 Tab 28, #29 DI#134 Tab 29, #30 DI#134 Tab 30, #31 DI#134 Tab 31, #32 DI#134 Tab 32, #33 DI#134 Tab 33, #34 DI#134 Tab 34, #35 DI#134 Tab 35, #36 DI#135, #37 DI#136, #38 DI#137, #39 DI#138, #40 DI#139, #41 DI#140, #42 DI#141, #43 DI#142, #44 DI#143, #45 DI#144, #46 DI#145, #47 DI#146, #48 DI#147, #49 DI#148, #50 DI#149, #51 DI#150, #52 DI#151, #53 DI#152, #54 DI#153, #55 DI#154, #56 DI#156, #57 DI#157, #58 DI#158, #59 DI#159, #60 DI#160, #61 DI#161) - (NOTE: DI# 155 is a transcript which will be docketed separately once received. (rwc) Modified on 3/9/2011 (rwc).
March 8, 2011 Filing 127 Record of Remand Case transferred in from District of ED/PA; Case Number in Other District: 09-cv-62581. (DI#'s 126 - 133 with exhibits attached (Attachments: #1 DI#127, #2 DI#128, #3 DI#129, #4 DI#130, #5 DI#131, #6 DI#131 Tab 1, #7 DI#131 Tab 2, #8 DI#131 Tab 3, #9 DI#131 Tab 4, #10 DI#131 Tab 5, #11 DI#131 Tab 6, #12 DI#131 Tab 7, #13 DI#131 Tab 8, #14 DI#131 Tab 9, #15 DI#131 Tab 10, #16 DI#131 Tab 11, #17 DI#131 Tab 12, #18 DI#131 Tab 13, #19 DI#131 Tab 14, #20 DI#131 Tab 15, #21 DI#131 Tab 16, #22 DI#131 Tab 17, #23 DI#131 Tab 18, #24 DI#131 Tab 19, #25 DI#131 Tab 20, #26 DI#131 Tab 21, #27 DI#132, #28 DI#132 Tab 1, #29 DI#132 Tab 2, #30 DI#132 Tab 3, #31 DI#132 Tab 4, #32 DI#132 Tab 5, #33 DI#132 Tab 6, #34 DI#132 Tab 7, #35 DI#132 Tab 8, #36 DI#132 Tab 9, #37 DI#132 Tab 10, #38 DI#132 Tab 11, #39 DI#132 Tab 12, #40 DI#132 Tab 13, #41 DI#132 Tab 14, #42 DI#132 Tab 15, #43 DI#132 Tab 16, #44 DI#132 Tab 17, #45 DI#132 Tab 18, #46 DI#132 Tab 19, #47 DI#133, #48 DI#133 Tab 1, #49 DI#133 Tab 2, #50 DI#133 Tab 3, #51 DI#133 Tab 4, #52 DI#133 Tab 5, #53 DI#133 Tab 6, #54 DI#133 Tab 7, #55 DI#133 Tab 8, #56 DI#133 Tab 9, #57 DI#133 Tab 10) (rwc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2011: #58 DI#126) (rwc).
March 8, 2011 Filing 126 Record of Remand Case transferred in from District of ED/PA; Case Number in Other District: 09-cv-62581. (DI#'s 121 - 125 with exhibits attached) (Attachments: #1 DI#121 Tab 1, #2 DI#121 Tab 2, #3 DI#121 Tab 3, #4 DI#121 Tab 4, #5 DI#121 Tab 5, #6 DI#121 Tab 6, #7 DI#121 Tab 7, #8 DI#121 Tab 8, #9 DI#121 Tab 9, #10 DI#121 Tab 10, #11 DI#121 Tab 11, #12 DI#121 Tab 12, #13 DI#121 Tab 13, #14 DI#121 Tab 14, #15 DI#121 Tab 15, #16 DI#121 Tab 16, #17 DI#121 Tab 17, #18 DI#121 Tab 18, #19 DI#121 Tab 19, #20 DI#121 Tab 20, #21 DI#121 Tab 21, #22 DI#121 Tab 22, #23 DI#121 Tab 23, #24 DI#121 Tab 24, #25 DI#121 Tab 25, #26 DI#122, #27 DI#122 Tab 1, #28 DI#122 Tab 2, #29 DI#122 Tab 3, #30 DI#122 Tab 4, #31 DI#122 Tab 5, #32 DI#122 Tab 6, #33 DI#123, #34 DI#124, #35 DI#124 Tab 1, #36 DI#124 Tab 2, #37 DI#124 Tab 3, #38 DI#124 Tab 4, #39 DI#124 Tab 5, #40 DI#124 Tab 6, #41 DI#124 Tab 7, #42 DI#124 Tab 8, #43 DI#124 Tab 9, #44 DI#124 Tab 10, #45 DI#124 Tab 11) (NOTE: DI#125 is a hardcopy paper document).(rwc) Modified on 3/9/2011 (rwc).
March 8, 2011 Filing 125 Record of Remand Case transferred in from District of ED/PA; Case Number in Other District: 09-cv-62581. (DI#'s 79 - 120 attached) (Attachments: #1 DI#79 Ex 1, #2 DI#79 Ex 2, #3 DI#79 Ex 3, #4 DI#79 Ex 4, #5 DI#80, #6 DI#81, #7 DI#82, #8 DI#83, #9 DI#84, #10 DI#85, #11 DI#86, #12 DI#87, #13 DI#88, #14 DI#89, #15 DI#90, #16 DI#91, #17 DI#92, #18 DI#93, #19 DI#94, #20 DI#95, #21 DI#96, #22 DI#97, #23 DI#98, #24 DI#99, #25 DI#100, #26 DI#101, #27 DI#102, #28 DI#103, #29 DI#104, #30 DI#105, #31 DI#106, #32 DI#107, #33 DI#108, #34 DI#109, #35 DI#110, #36 DI#111, #37 DI#112, #38 DI#113, #39 DI#114, #40 DI#115, #41 DI#116, #42 DI#117, #43 DI#118, #44 DI#119, #45 DI#120) (rwc)
March 8, 2011 Filing 124 Record of Remand Case transferred in from District of ED/PA; Case Number in Other District: 09-cv-62581. (DI#'s 51 - 77attached). (Note: DI# 88 is a sealed document)Attachments: #1 DI#52, #2 DI#53, #3 DI#54, #4 DI#55, #5 DI#56, #6 DI#57, #7 DI#58, #8 DI#59, #9 DI#60, #10 DI#61, #11 DI#62, #12 DI#63, #13 DI#64, #14 DI#65, #15 DI#66, #16 DI#67, #17 DI#68, #18 DI#69, #19 DI#70, #20 DI#71, #21 DI#72, #22 DI#73, #23 DI#74, #24 DI#75, #25 DI#76, #26 DI#77) (rwc)
March 8, 2011 Filing 123 Record of Remand Case ( with Jury Demand) transferred in from District of ED/PA; Case Number in Other District: 09-cv-62581. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file with Document Items numbered (DI#'s 1-50 attached - NOTE: TURN OFF PDF HEADERS TO VIEW DOCUMENTS). (Also Note: DI# 8 is a Sealed Document.)(Attachments: #1, #2, #3, #4, #5, #6, #7, #8, #9, #10, #11, #12, #13, #14, #15, #16, #17, #18, #19, #20, #21, #22, #23, #24, #25, #26, #27, #28, #29, #30, #31, #32, #33, #34, #35, #36, #37, #38, #39, #40, #41, #42, #43, #44, #45, #46, #47, #48, #49)(rwc) Modified on 3/8/2011 (rwc).
March 8, 2011 Filing 122 Remand Order - Remanding matter to U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware, signed by Clerk of Panel, Multidistrict Litigation on 3/4/11 in U.S.D.C., ED/PA - (DI # in other district: 161). (rwc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2011: #1 Cover Letter) (rwc).
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Order Remanding matter to U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware, signed by Clerk of Panel, Multidistrict Litigation on 3/4/11 in U.S.D.C., ED/PA - (DI # in other district: 161). (rwc)
October 6, 2009 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #121 . (nmf)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 325 - Signed by Judge Eduardo C. Robreno on 2/9/2009. (nmf)
September 16, 2009 Case reassigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 SO ORDERED, re #119 Stipulation of Dismissal as to defendant Owens-Illinois Inc. Attorney Paul A. Bradley terminated.. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 8/7/09. (rwc)
August 7, 2009 Filing 119 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc. by and between Plaintiff and Owens-Illinois, Inc. by Owens-Illinois Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bradley, Paul)
June 23, 2009 Filing 118 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation: Entry of appearance of attorney Donald Robert Kinsley. Attorney Megan T. Mantzavinos, Esquire terminated. (Kinsley, Donald)
May 13, 2009 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary F. Higgins on behalf of Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Higgins, Mary)
May 13, 2009 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary F. Higgins on behalf of Leslie Controls Inc. (Higgins, Mary)
April 24, 2009 Filing 115 AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiff Herbert Pease's Praecipe For Entry of Appearance filed by Herbert Pease. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Crumplar, Thomas)
April 14, 2009 Filing 114 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Georgia Pacific Corporation: Entry of appearance of attorney Amaryah K. Bocchino. Attorney Donald E. Reid terminated. (Bocchino, Amaryah)
April 14, 2009 Filing 113 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re A.W. Chesterton Company: Entry of appearance of attorney Amaryah K. Bocchino. Attorney Donald E. Reid terminated. (Bocchino, Amaryah)
January 27, 2009 Filing 112 Letter to Clerk, USDC/DE, from Clerk, US Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation dated 1/27/09 regarding Conditional Transfer Order attached. (Attachments: #1 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-318))(rwc)
January 20, 2009 Filing 111 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Herbert Pease on January 22, 2009 by Armstrong International Inc..(Adams, William)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #97 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Vasquez, Esquire filed by Hill Brothers Chemical Company. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/14/09. (ntl)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #106 Motion for John C. Bridges to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/14/09. (ntl)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #95 Motion for Jennifer Holt to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/14/09. (ntl)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Kurt Putnam to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/14/09. (ntl)
January 13, 2009 Filing 106 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John C. Bridges, Esq. - filed by AGCO Corporation. (Della Porta, Armand)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Melissa Rose Badgett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/13/09. (rwc)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Sunny S. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/13/09. (rwc)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #72 Motion for David A. Pereda to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/13/09. (rwc)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Gregory M. Stokes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/13/09. (rwc)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Gary F. Lundry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/13/08. (rwc)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #97 Motion for Michael Vasquez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/13/08. (rwc)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #89 Motion for Henry G. Holmberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/13/09. (rwc)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #92 Motion for G. Jeff Coons to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/13/09. (rwc)
January 13, 2009 Filing 97 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Vasquez, Esquire - filed by Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance by Counsel, Michael Vasquez, Esquire to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, #2 Notice of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Vasquez, Esquire, #3 Text of Proposed Order Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Vasquez, Esquire)(Higgins, Mary)
January 13, 2009 Filing 96 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney KURT PUTNAM, ESQ. - filed by RPM International, Inc., Republic Powered Metals Inc.(Individually and as Successor to R.P.M. Inc.), Bondex International Inc.. (Della Porta, Armand)
January 13, 2009 Filing 95 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Holt, Esq. - filed by American Standard Inc.. (Della Porta, Armand)
January 13, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of counsel, Clerk's Office help desk corrected the docket text of D.I. 92 (Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney G. Jeff Coons, Esquire ) to reflect that it was filed by Leslie Controls Inc. Also, D.I. 95 (MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Vasquez, Esquire) filed on 1/12/2009 has been deleted from the docket and will be re-filed by counsel. (fms)
January 12, 2009 Filing 94 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary F. Lundry, Esquire - filed by Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Kaplan, Gary)
January 12, 2009 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary H. Kaplan on behalf of Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC (Kaplan, Gary)
January 9, 2009 Filing 92 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney G. Jeff Coons, Esquire - filed by Leslie Controls Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, #2 Notice of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of G. Jeff Coons, Esquire)(Higgins, Mary) Modified on 1/13/2009 (fms).
January 9, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Docket Clerk terminated pending Motions DI#'s 88 & 90 as they were duplicate Pro Hac Motions for the same person. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 ***Motions terminated as duplicate Motions #88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney filed by Crane Company, #90 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory M. Stokes filed by Peerless Industries Inc.. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Filing 91 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Herbert Pease on January 14, 2009 by Armstrong International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(Adams, William)
January 9, 2009 Filing 90 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory M. Stokes - filed by Peerless Industries Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion Notice of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Gregory M. Stokes, #2 Certificate of Compliance Certification of Gregory M. Stokes, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Gregory Stokes, Esquire)(Skiles, Nicholas)
January 9, 2009 Filing 89 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Henry G. Holmberg - filed by Georgia Pacific Corporation(Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Bestwall Gypsum Company). (Attachments: #1 Certification by Henry G. Holmberg to be admitted pro hac vice)(Bocchino, Amaryah)
January 9, 2009 Filing 88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney - filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion Notice of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Gregory M. Stokes, #2 Certificate of Compliance Certification of Gregory M. Stokes, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Pro Hac Vice Admission to Gregory M. Stokes)(Skiles, Nicholas)
January 9, 2009 Filing 87 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory M. Stokes - filed by Cleaver Brooks Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion Notice of Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission of Gregory M. Stokes, Esquire, #2 Certificate of Compliance Certification of Gregory M. Stokes, Esquire, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Pro Hac Vice Admission to Gregory M. Stokes, Esquire)(Skiles, Nicholas)
January 9, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected text entry for DI#52 which had been improperly filed as a Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER - granting #42 , #47 Motions for Joseph B. Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/9/09. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER - granting #48 Motion for Robert E. Scott Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/9/09. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Marisa A. Trasatti to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/9/09. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Jeff Coons to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/9/09. (rwc) Modified on 1/9/2009 (rwc, ).
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Yakov P. Wiegmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/9/09. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Walter C. Rundin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/9/09. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #58 Motion for Gregory Mreonek to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/9/09. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #59 Motion for John F. Grannis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/9/09. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Drew A. Burford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/9/09. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Randall Bernard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/9/09. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Deborah Cote to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/9/09. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Derek Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/9/09. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - granting #69 Motion for Stephen T. Grimsrud to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/9/09. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER - permitting Defendants to take brief discovery deposition. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/9/09. (rwc)
January 9, 2009 Filing 72 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Pereda - filed by Ford Motor Company, General Motors Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Singewald, Christian)
January 9, 2009 Filing 71 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Melissa Rose Badgett - filed by A.W. Chesterton Company. (Reid, Donald)
January 9, 2009 Filing 70 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sunny S. Shapiro - filed by Caterpillar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Certification, #2 Pro Hac Proposed Order)(Reese, C.)
January 8, 2009 Filing 69 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen T. Grimsrud, Esquire - filed by DaimlerChrysler Motors Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Stephen T. Grimsrud, Esq. for pro hac Motion)(Kron, James)
January 8, 2009 Filing 68 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Derek Johnson, Esquire - filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spivak, Josette)
January 8, 2009 Filing 67 Emergency Letter to The Honorable John J. Hughes from Josette F. Spivak, Esquire regarding Requesting emergency teleconference with Court re: deposition of Plaintiff. (Spivak, Josette)
January 8, 2009 Filing 66 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deborah Cote, Esquire - filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Skiles, Nicholas)
January 8, 2009 Filing 65 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Randall Bernard, Esquire - filed by Dana Corporation. (Skiles, Nicholas)
January 8, 2009 Filing 64 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Drew A. Burford, Esquire - filed by CBS Corporation. (Skiles, Nicholas)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER - granting #39 Motion for Michael T. Wharton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/8/09. (rwc)
January 8, 2009 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas E. Skiles on behalf of CBS Corporation (Skiles, Nicholas)
January 8, 2009 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas E. Skiles on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Skiles, Nicholas)
January 8, 2009 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas E. Skiles on behalf of Dana Corporation (Skiles, Nicholas)
January 8, 2009 Filing 59 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John F. Grannis - filed by Gardner Denver Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Order)(Donelson, Matthew)
January 8, 2009 Filing 58 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory Meronek - filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Order)(Donelson, Matthew)
January 8, 2009 Filing 57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Walter C. Rundin - filed by Borg Warner Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Order)(Donelson, Matthew)
January 7, 2009 Filing 56 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yakov P. Wiegmann - filed by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification By Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guerke, Kevin)
January 7, 2009 Filing 55 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney G. Jeff Coons - filed by Goulds Pumps Inc.. (Goldman, Robert)
January 7, 2009 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Donelson on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Donelson, Matthew)
January 7, 2009 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Donelson on behalf of Gardner Denver Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Donelson, Matthew)
January 7, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: the main document in D.I. 48 was replaced with the correct attachment per request of counsel. (ntl)
January 7, 2009 Filing 52 Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Herbert Pease - (Goldman, Robert) Modified on 1/9/2009 (rwc).
January 7, 2009 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Donelson on behalf of Borg Warner Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Donelson, Matthew)
January 5, 2009 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against all defendants by Peerless Industries Inc..(Skiles, Nicholas)
January 2, 2009 Filing 49 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marisa A. Trasatti - filed by Soco-West Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel to be Admitted PRO HAC VICE)(Stewart, William)
January 2, 2009 Filing 48 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert E. Scott, Jr. - filed by Soco-West Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted PRO HAC VICE)(Stewart, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2009: #2 Main Document) (ntl).
January 2, 2009 Filing 47 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph B. Adams, Esq - filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Joseph B. Adams, Esq, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice to Joseph B. Adams, Esq)(Nolte, R.)
December 31, 2008 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Stokes Nolte on behalf of Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Nolte, R.)
December 31, 2008 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against all defendants by Hopeman Brothers Inc..(Nolte, R.)
December 31, 2008 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by William Robert Stewart, III on behalf of A.W. Chesterton Company (Stewart, William)
December 31, 2008 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by A.W. Chesterton Company.(Stewart, William)
December 23, 2008 Filing 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph B. Adams - filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cosgrove, Noriss)
December 23, 2008 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Noriss Ennis Cosgrove on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cosgrove, Noriss)
December 23, 2008 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Uniroyal, Inc. by Uniroyal Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Kaplan, Matthew)
December 22, 2008 Filing 39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael T. Wharton - filed by Navistar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guerke, Kevin)
December 18, 2008 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against all plaintiffs by A.W. Chesterton Company.(Bocchino, Amaryah)
December 18, 2008 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff Herbert Pease by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc..(Ahern, Andrew)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - denying #4 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 12/1/08. (rwc)
November 26, 2008 Filing 35 REPLY BRIEF To Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Remand filed by Herbert Pease. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Crumplar, Thomas)
November 24, 2008 Filing 34 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #27 Reply Brief, #4 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court And Memorandum Of Law : Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Oppositon to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/8/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12 part 1, #13 Exhibit 12 part 2, #14 Exhibit 13)(Mantzavinos, Megan)
November 19, 2008 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Disclosure Statement of Defendant, Armstrong International, Inc. by Armstrong International Inc. re #32 Amended Document (Adams, William)
November 19, 2008 Filing 32 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Armstrong International Inc.. Amendment to #30 Disclosure Statement of Defendant Armstrong International, Inc.. (Adams, William)
November 19, 2008 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Armstrong International, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint and Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Armstrong International Inc. re #29 Answer to Complaint, #30 Disclosure Statement (Adams, William)
November 19, 2008 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Armstrong International Inc.. (Adams, William)
November 19, 2008 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Armstrong International Inc..(Adams, William)
November 19, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joel A. Pisano - Appearances: G. Sean Jez, Esq., for pltf; Josette F. Spirak, Esq., for dft, GE Co.; Michael Keating, Esq., for deft, GE Co.; Megan Mantzavinos, Esq., for deft, Foster Wheeler, LLC.Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2008 re #4 Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court - Decision Reserved. The Court will submit the appropriate order. Matter adjourned. (Court Reporter J. Caruso.) (dsnj)
November 18, 2008 Filing 28 Letter to The Honorable Judge Joel A. Pisano from Megan T. Mantzvinos, Esquire regarding Letter Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to remand - re #27 Reply Brief,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Letter Brief, #2 Exhibit B to Letter Brief, #3 Exhibit C to Letter Brief, #4 Exhibit D to Letter Brief, #5 Exhibit E to Letter Brief, #6 Affidavit of Admiral Ben J. Lehman, U.S. Navy, Retired, #7 Affidavit of J.Thomas Schroppe)(Mantzavinos, Megan)
November 17, 2008 Filing 27 REPLY BRIEF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION'S JOINDER IN NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1442 OF DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY filed by Herbert Pease. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Crumplar, Thomas)
November 14, 2008 Filing 26 Letter to The Honorable Joseph A. Pisano from Paul A. Bradley regarding Attendance at November 19, 2008 hearing - re Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (Bradley, Paul)
November 14, 2008 Filing 25 Letter to Honorable Joe A. Pisano from Megan T. Mantzavinos (ID No. 3802) regarding Motion Hearing on November 19, 2008 at 10:30 a.m.. (Mantzavinos, Megan)
November 14, 2008 Filing 24 Letter to The Honorable Joel A. Pisano from Somers S. Price, Jr., Esquire regarding November 19, 2008 hearing on Motion to Remand. (Price, Somers)
November 14, 2008 Filing 23 Letter to The Honorable Joseph A. Pisano from Donald E. Reid regarding requesting to be excused from November 19, 2008 motion hearing. (Reid, Donald)
November 14, 2008 Filing 22 Letter to Judge Pisano from C. Scott Reese, Esq. regarding attendance at November 19, 2008 Motion Hearing. (Reese, C.)
November 14, 2008 Filing 21 Letter to Judge Josph A. Pisano from Noriss E. Cosgrove, Esq. regarding Response regarding Attendance at November 19th Hearing. (Cosgrove, Noriss)
November 13, 2008 Filing 20 Letter to Hon. Joel Pisano from Josette F. Spivak, Esq. regarding Confirming attendance of counsel for General Electric at Motion Hearing on November 19, 2008 - re Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (Spivak, Josette)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - denying as moot #5 Emergency Motion to Expedite Hearing. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 11/13/08. (rwc)
November 13, 2008 Filing 18 Letter to Judge Joseph A. Pisano from G. Sean Jez, Esquire regarding Confirmation of Attendance at the November 19th Hearing. (Crumplar, Thomas)
November 12, 2008 COUNSEL FOR PARTIES MUST BE PRESENT: Set Deadlines as to #4 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court And Memorandum Of Law. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2008 10:30 AM before Judge Joel A. Pisano in Trenton, New Jersey - Courtroom #1. Parties to confirm by letter (e-file)no later than 11/14/08. (dsnj)
November 12, 2008 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF To General Electric Company's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Remand filed by Herbert Pease. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Crumplar, Thomas)
November 6, 2008 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Deere & Company. (Guerke, Kevin)
November 6, 2008 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Deere & Company.(Guerke, Kevin)
November 3, 2008 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing On Plaintiff's Motion To Remand. Related to Document No. 4. filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Cerificate of Service)(Spivak, Josette)
November 3, 2008 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answering Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by General Electric Company re #12 Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (Spivak, Josette)
November 3, 2008 Filing 12 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #4 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court And Memorandum Of Law filed by General Electric Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/17/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C part 1A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C part 1B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C part 2A, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C part 2B, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C part 3, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C part 4A, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C part 4B, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C part 5, #11 Exhibit Exhibit C part 6, #12 Exhibit Exhibit C part 7, #13 Exhibit Exhibit C part 8, #14 Exhibit Exhibit C part 9, #15 Exhibit Exhibit C part 10, #16 Exhibit Exhibit C part 11, #17 Exhibit Exhibit C part 12, #18 Exhibit Exhibit C part 13, #19 Exhibit Exhibit D, #20 Exhibit Exhibit E, #21 Exhibit Exhibit F, #22 Exhibit Exhibit G, #23 Exhibit Exhibit H, #24 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Spivak, Josette)
October 31, 2008 Filing 11 Letter to Hon. Joel A. Pisano, U.S.D.J. from Josette F. Spivak, Esq. regarding Counsel's Agreement to Briefing Schedule for pending motions. (Spivak, Josette)
October 27, 2008 Remark: Modified Attorney Beth E. Valocchi address information per D.I. #10 , and re-mailed the document that was returned. (nms)
October 27, 2008 Filing 10 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Beth E. Valocchi. (nms)
October 27, 2008 Filing 9 NOTICE of Notice of Tag Along Action by General Electric Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Spivak, Josette)
October 23, 2008 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by General Electric Company. (Spivak, Josette)
October 22, 2008 Case reassigned to Judge Joel A. Pisano of the District of New Jersey (in lieu of Vacant Judgeship). Please include the initials of the Judge (JAP) after the case number on all documents filed. (Courtesy copies of filings should be sent to the chambers of the assigned Judge). (rjb)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Stewart Dalzell recused. The case shall be reassigned to another District Court Judge. Signed by Judge Stewart Dalzell on 10/20/08. (rwc)
October 20, 2008 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company: Entry of appearance of attorney Megan Trocki Mantzavinos. Attorney Jeffrey S. Marlin, Esquire terminated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mantzavinos, Megan)
October 17, 2008 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing On Plaintiff's Motion To Remand. Related to Document No. 4. - filed by Herbert Pease. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion For Expedited Hearing, #3 Affidavit Certificate of Electronic and Hand Delivery Service)(Jacobs, Robert)
October 17, 2008 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court And Memorandum Of Law - filed by Herbert Pease. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion To Remand, #3 Affidavit Certificate of Electronic Service)(Jacobs, Robert)
October 17, 2008 Filing 3 JOINDER by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, joining in #1 Notice of Removal, re: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION'S JOINDER IN NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1442 OF DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Rule 7.1 Statement, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Certificate of Service to Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Joinder in Notice of Removal)(Mantzavinos, Megan)
October 1, 2008 Case assigned to Judge Stewart Dalzell of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (in lieu of Vacant Judgeship). Please include the initials of the Judge (SD) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 25, 2008 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of a U.S. Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction (ead)
September 25, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of the State of Delaware in and for New Castle County, Case Number 08C-08-017 (Filing fee $350, receipt number 153651)- filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate of Service)(ead) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2008: #7 Acknowledgement of Consent Form) (ead).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pease v. Crane Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-West Inc.
Represented By: William Robert Stewart, III.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Wharton
Represented By: Kevin A. Guerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DaimlerChrysler Motors Corporation
Represented By: Somers S. Price, Jr.
Represented By: James M. Kron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Corporation
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarway Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Donald E. Reid
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Controls Inc.
Represented By: Mary Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G. Ahern, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPM International, Inc.
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Standard Inc.
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGCO Corporation
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: Donald E. Reid
Represented By: William Robert Stewart, III.
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: C. Scott Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Inc.
Represented By: William R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Kevin A. Guerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg Warner Corporation
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Inc.
Represented By: Robert S. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag West Inc.
Represented By: William Robert Stewart, III.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Noriss Cosgrove Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imo Industries Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Marlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bondex International Inc.
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROM International Inc.
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Corporation
Represented By: Somers S. Price, Jr.
Represented By: James M. Kron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc.
Represented By: R. Stokes Nolte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Industries Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC
Represented By: Gary H. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-Lynch Corporation
Represented By: William Robert Stewart, III.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quintec Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Truck & Engine Corporation
Represented By: Michael T. Wharton
Represented By: Kevin A. Guerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Marlin
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sally J. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Marlin
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.H. Agriculture & Nutrition LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Josette Ferrazza Spivak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garlock Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Chemicals and Plastic Company Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Allen Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Pease
Represented By: Robert Jacobs
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Pease
Represented By: Robert Jacobs
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Pease
Represented By: Robert Jacobs
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: SPECIAL MASTER Vincent J. Poppiti, -SM-
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?