Picsel (Research) Ltd. et al v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Picsel (Research) Ltd. and Picsel Technologies Ltd.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00100
Filed: February 13, 2009
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2009 12 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,009,626 B2; (nmf)
July 20, 2009 CASE CLOSED per D.I. 11 . (nmf)
July 16, 2009 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Picsel (Research) Ltd., Picsel Technologies Ltd. as to Apple, Inc. (Heaney, Julia)
June 29, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED- re 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 8/7/2009. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/29/2009. (lid)
June 26, 2009 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to August 7, 2009 - filed by Picsel (Research) Ltd., Picsel Technologies Ltd., Apple Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas)
June 16, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED- re 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard D. Rochford and Russell J. Genet. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/16/2009. (lid)
June 4, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED- re 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 7/8/2009. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/3/209. (lid)
June 3, 2009 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard D. Rochford and Russell J. Genet - filed by Picsel (Research) Ltd., Picsel Technologies Ltd.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 2, 2009 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to July 8, 2009 - filed by Picsel (Research) Ltd., Picsel Technologies Ltd., Apple Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas)
June 1, 2009 7 NOTICE of Change of Address for the Law Firm of Nixon Peabody LLP by Picsel (Research) Ltd., Picsel Technologies Ltd. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 6, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED- re 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME.Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 6/8/2009. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/6/2009. (lid)
May 4, 2009 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to June 8, 2009 - filed by Picsel (Research) Ltd., Picsel Technologies Ltd., Apple Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas)
March 10, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED- re 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 5/8/2009. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/10/2009. (lid)
March 6, 2009 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to May 8, 2009 - filed by Picsel (Research) Ltd., Picsel Technologies Ltd., Apple Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas)
February 18, 2009 Case assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 13, 2009 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,009,626 B2; (els)
February 13, 2009 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Picsel (Research) Ltd., Picsel Technologies Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Picsel (Group) Ltd. for ; Other Affiliate Picsel (Group) Ltd. for. (els)
February 13, 2009 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. on 2/13/2009. (els)
February 13, 2009 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els)
February 13, 2009 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. - ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311000000000550911.) - filed by Picsel (Research) Ltd., Picsel Technologies Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(els)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picsel (Research) Ltd. et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Picsel (Research) Ltd.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Picsel Technologies Ltd.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?