St. Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc. v. Acer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: St. Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.
Defendant: Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Dell Inc., Gateway Inc., Lenovo Group Limited, Lenovo (United States) Inc. and Gateway Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00354
Filed: May 15, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 MEMORANDUM OPINION re pending motions. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 4/13/16. (ntl)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 990 motion for attorney fees. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 11/23/15. (ntl)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 992 motion for new trial. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 10/2/15. (ntl)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 940 MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 2/25/15. (ntl)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 919 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 631 MOTION for Summary Judgment is DENIED; 641 MOTION for Spoliation Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/27/14. (ntl)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 891 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 875 (in 09cv354) and 514 (in 10cv282) MEMORANDUM ORDER re (637 in 1:09-cv-00354-LPS)(352 in 1:10-cv-00282-LPS) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Laches is GRANTED; (647 in 1:09-cv-00354-LPS)(296 in 1:10-cv-00282-LP S) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Defendants' Affirmative Defenses And Counterclaims for Inequitable Conduct is DENIED with respect to the sole inventorship issue and GRANTED in all other respects. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/2/2013. (rpg)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 877 MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding the status of the remaining pending motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/29/13. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00354-LPS, 1:10-cv-00282-LPS(ntl)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 747 MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/7/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00354-LPS, 1:10-cv-00282-LPS(ntl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc. v. Acer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo Group Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?