Personalized User Model LLP v. Google Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Personalized User Model LLP
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00525
Filed: July 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2014 Filing 740 Redaction of 736 Transcript. Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on September 11, 2014 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 739 Unopposed Motion to Redact Portions of the September 11, 2014 Hearing Transcript filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/3/14. (ntl)
October 28, 2014 Filing 739 [SEALED] MOTION to Redact 736 Transcript,, Unopposed Motion to Redact Portions of the September 11, 2014 Hearing Transcript - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moore, David)
October 14, 2014 Filing 738 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by David Ellis Moore re 736 Transcript,, (Moore, David)
October 8, 2014 Filing 737 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 735 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Konig Yochai, Personalized User Model LLP. USCA Case Number 15-1022. (ntl)
October 7, 2014 Filing 736 [SEALED] Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on September 11, 2014 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg) Modified on 11/3/2014 (ntl).
October 3, 2014 Notification regarding 735 Notice of Cross Appeal sent to Reporter Gaffigan (els)
October 3, 2014 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 735 Notice of Cross Appeal. (els)
October 2, 2014 Filing 735 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 724 Order . Cross Appeal filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 2, 2014 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re 735 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Konig Yochai, Personalized User Model LLP. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-1600631.) (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 26, 2014 Filing 734 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Google Inc. TRANSCRIPT NOT NEEDED - ALREADY ON FILE (Moore, David)
September 25, 2014 Filing 733 Redaction of Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume H held on March 19, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. (bpg)
September 25, 2014 Filing 732 Redaction of Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume G held on March 18, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER.. (bpg)
September 25, 2014 Filing 731 Redaction of Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume E held on March 14, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. (bpg)
September 25, 2014 Filing 730 Redaction of Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume D held on March 13, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. (bpg)
September 25, 2014 Filing 729 Redaction of Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume C held on March 12, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. (bpg)
September 25, 2014 Filing 728 Redaction Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume B held on March 11, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. (bpg)
September 19, 2014 Filing 727 NOTICE of Compliance by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Palapura, Bindu)
September 18, 2014 Filing 726 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 725 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Google Inc. USCA Case Number 14-1841. (ntl)
September 18, 2014 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 725 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (els)
September 18, 2014 Notification regarding 725 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Gaffigan (els)
September 17, 2014 Filing 725 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 724 Order . Appeal filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 724 ORDER re 712 MOTION to Redact is GRANTED in part; 704 MOTION for New Trial is DENIED; 702 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/17/14. (ntl)
September 17, 2014 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re 725 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Google Inc.. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-1590474.) (Moore, David)
September 11, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 9/11/2014. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Oral Argument scheduled for 8/14/14 is CANCELLED and is hereby rescheduled for 9/11/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/7/14. (ntl)
August 6, 2014 Filing 722 Letter to Chief Judge Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding PUM respectfully requests to reschedule the oral argument on post-trial motions set for August 14, 2014; Google does not oppose. (Jacobs, Karen)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument on the pending motions on Thursday, August 14, 2014 beginning at 2:00 p.m. Each side will be allocated one hour. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/30/14. (ntl)
July 25, 2014 Filing 720 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Erich W. Struble, formerly of Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
July 14, 2014 Filing 719 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Google Inc. re 704 MOTION for New Trial , 702 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Google's Breach of Contract Counterclaim. (Horwitz, Richard)
July 10, 2014 Filing 718 REPLY BRIEF re 702 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Google's Breach of Contract Counterclaim filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Murphy, Regina)
July 10, 2014 Filing 717 REPLY BRIEF re 704 MOTION for New Trial filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Murphy, Regina)
June 27, 2014 Filing 716 REDACTED VERSION of 713 Answering Brief in Opposition re 704 MOTION for New Trial by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 715 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for PUM to submit reply briefs to July 10, 2014 filed by Konig Yochai, Personalized User Model LLP. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/27/14. (ntl)
June 24, 2014 Filing 715 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for PUM to submit reply briefs to July 10, 2014 - filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Murphy, Regina)
June 18, 2014 Filing 714 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 702 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Google's Breach of Contract Counterclaim filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2014. (Moore, David)
June 18, 2014 Filing 713 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 704 MOTION for New Trial filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2014. (Moore, David)
June 4, 2014 Filing 712 [SEALED] MOTION to Redact 697 Transcript,, 692 Transcript,, 694 Transcript,, 698 Transcript,, 695 Transcript,, 693 Transcript,, Unopposed Motion to Redact Portions of the Electronic Trial Transcript - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Exhibit C-D, # 3 Exhibit E-F, # 4 Exhibit G-I, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit K-L)(Struble, Erich)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 711 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file its Redaction Requests for the trial transcripts for the jury trial held on March 10, 2014 - March 20, 2014 to June 4, 2014 filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/4/14. (ntl)
May 30, 2014 Filing 711 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file its Redaction Requests for the trial transcripts for the jury trial held on March 10, 2014 - March 20, 2014 to June 4, 2014 - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
May 21, 2014 Filing 710 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding redactions to Febuary 26, 2014 Pretrial Conference transcript - re 707 Order,,,. (Moore, David)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 706 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Google to file its answering briefs in opposition to PUM's post-judgment motions to June 18, 2014 filed by Google Inc.; 709 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Google to file its Redaction Requests for the trial transcripts for the jury trial held on March 10, 2014 through March 20, 2014 to May 30, 2014 filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/21/14. (ntl)
May 19, 2014 Filing 709 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Google to file its Redaction Requests for the trial transcripts for the jury trial held on March 10, 2014 through March 20, 2014 to May 30, 2014 - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
May 16, 2014 Filing 708 REDACTED VERSION of 701 Exhibit List by Personalized User Model LLP. (Murphy, Regina)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed Defendant Google Inc.'s ("Google") Unopposed Motion to Seal Hearing Transcript (D.I. 675), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The transcript of the February 26, 2014 Pretrial Conference (D.I. 619) is (1) placed under seal and thereafter will only be made available to persons authorized to receive highly confidential information under the protective order in this case (D.I. 35), and (2) the electronic version of the transcript shall be amended ONLY to redact references to the Portrait (D.I. 675 Ex. A at 58, 69-74, App. 13) and Merlin (id. at 70, 71, 74, App. 10) products. Google shall file a version of the transcript reflecting this Order no later than May 21, 2014. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/16/14. (ntl)
May 16, 2014 Filing 706 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Google to file its answering briefs in opposition to PUM's post-judgment motions to June 18, 2014 - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
May 14, 2014 Filing 705 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 704 MOTION for New Trial filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/2/2014. (Jacobs, Karen)
May 14, 2014 Filing 704 MOTION for New Trial - filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Jacobs, Karen)
May 14, 2014 Filing 703 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 702 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Google's Breach of Contract Counterclaim filed by Personalized User Model LLP.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/2/2014. (Jacobs, Karen)
May 14, 2014 Filing 702 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Google's Breach of Contract Counterclaim - filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Jacobs, Karen)
May 9, 2014 Filing 701 [SEALED] Exhibit List -- Parties' Joint List of Exhibits Admitted into Evidence at Trial -- by Personalized User Model LLP. (Murphy, Regina)
May 6, 2014 Filing 700 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by David Ellis Moore re 697 Transcript,, 696 Transcript,, 698 Transcript,, 692 Transcript,, 699 Transcript,, 695 Transcript,, 691 Transcript,, 693 Transcript,, 694 Transcript,, (Moore, David)
April 29, 2014 Filing 699 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume I held on March 20, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014. (bpg)
April 29, 2014 Filing 698 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume H held on March 19, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014. (bpg)
April 29, 2014 Filing 697 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume G held on March 18, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014. (bpg)
April 29, 2014 Filing 696 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume F held on March 17, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014. (bpg)
April 29, 2014 Filing 695 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume E held on March 14, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014. (bpg)
April 29, 2014 Filing 694 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume D held on March 13, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014. (bpg)
April 29, 2014 Filing 693 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume C held on March 12, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014. (bpg)
April 29, 2014 Filing 692 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume B held on March 11, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014. (bpg)
April 29, 2014 Filing 691 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume A held on March 10, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014. (bpg)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 690 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letter (D.I. 682) regarding their positions as to how this case should proceed in light of the Court's Letter Opinion (D.I. 677), the Court has entered final judgment on all issues presented to the jury (see D.I. 666). All motions filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) are DENIED AS MOOT. Entry of judgment today starts the clock for the filing of post-trial motions. Should any such motions be filed, the parties should incorporate into their briefing their reasons as to why the Court should or should not adhere to the inclinations it set out in its Letter Opinion. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/17/2014. (ntl)
April 17, 2014 Filing 689 JUDGMENT in favor of Google Inc. and against Personalized User Model LLP (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/17/14. (ntl)
April 16, 2014 Filing 688 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Post Trial Briefing. (Jacobs, Karen)
April 16, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected document added to D.I. 681 per request of counsel. (ntl)
April 15, 2014 Filing 687 REDACTED VERSION of 679 Answering Brief in Opposition,, re 669 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [Personalized User Model, L.L.P. and Yochai Konig's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Infringement and Validity of the Patents-in-Suit an d on Google's Breach of Contract Counterclaim] (GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO PUM'S RULE 50(A) MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED Exhibit 1)(Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 4/15/2014 (rpg).
April 15, 2014 Filing 686 REDACTED VERSION of 632 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Parties proposals for proposed jury instructions - re 627 Memorandum and Order by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 15, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibit 1 attached to d.i. 687 placed under seal per counsel's request on 4/15/2014. (rpg)
April 14, 2014 Filing 685 REDACTED VERSION of 653 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding parties' designated deposition testimony by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 14, 2014 Filing 684 REDACTED VERSION of 633 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding parties' submission of designated deposition testimony by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 14, 2014 Filing 683 REDACTED VERSION of 631 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding the parties' identification of final accused products/services and asserted claims - re 630 Order by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 9, 2014 Filing 682 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding parties' proposals for how case should proceed - re 677 Opinion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B)(Jacobs, Karen)
April 8, 2014 Filing 681 REDACTED VERSION of 670 Opening Brief in Support, of Personalized User Model, L.L.P. and Yochai Konig's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Infringement and Validity of the Patents-in-Suit and on Google's Breach of Contract Counterclaim by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Murphy, Regina) (Main Document 681 replaced on 4/16/2014) (ntl).
April 8, 2014 Filing 680 REDACTED VERSION of 665 Response to Motion, [PUM's Response in Opposition to Google's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non- Infringement] by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Murphy, Regina)
April 7, 2014 Filing 679 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 669 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [Personalized User Model, L.L.P. and Yochai Konig's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Infringement and Validity of the Patents-in-Suit and on Google's Breach of Contract Counterclaim] (GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO PUM'S RULE 50(A) MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW) filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Horwitz, Richard)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's letter of April 7, 2014, regarding the pending JMOL motions (D.I. 656, 669), the parties shall provide the Court their specific proposal(s) for how this case should proceed no later than Wednesday, April 9. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/7/2014. (ntl)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 677 LETTER OPINION re post-trial issues. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/7/14. (ntl)
March 26, 2014 Filing 676 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Proposed Form of Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(Jacobs, Karen)
March 25, 2014 Filing 675 [SEALED] MOTION to Redact 619 Transcript,, [GOOGLE'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEAL HEARING TRANSCRIPT] - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Moore, David)
March 25, 2014 Filing 674 [SEALED] MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Personalized User Model LLP in the form of a CD. Filing related to 672 Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (ntl)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 673 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties' submissions pursuant to the Court's March 20 request to March 26, 2014 filed by Konig Yochai, Personalized User Model LLP. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/25/14. (ntl)
March 24, 2014 Filing 673 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties' submissions pursuant to the Court's March 20 request to March 26, 2014 - filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Murphy, Regina)
March 24, 2014 Filing 672 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: PUM's CONFIDENTIAL demonstrative exhibits used at trial. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Regina S.E. Murphy on behalf of Personalized User Model LLP (Murphy, Regina)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 671 ORDER directing that jurors be provided lunch (cc: Finance). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/24/14. (ntl) (ntl).
March 21, 2014 Filing 670 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 669 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [Personalized User Model, L.L.P. and Yochai Konig's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Infringement and Validity of the Patents-in-Suit and on Google's Breach of Contract Counterclaim] filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/7/2014. (Jacobs, Karen)
March 21, 2014 Filing 669 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [Personalized User Model, L.L.P. and Yochai Konig's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Infringement and Validity of the Patents-in-Suit and on Google's Breach of Contract Counterclaim] - filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Jacobs, Karen)
March 20, 2014 Filing 668 [SEALED] Jury Notes. (rpg)
March 20, 2014 Filing 667 REDACTED VERSION of 666 Jury Verdict. (rpg) (rpg).
March 20, 2014 Filing 666 [SEALED] JURY VERDICT. (rpg)
March 20, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected document added to D.I. 665 per request of counsel. (ntl)
March 20, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial completed on 3/20/2014. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (rpg)
March 19, 2014 Filing 665 [SEALED] RESPONSE to Motion re 656 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement -- PUM's Response in Opposition to Google's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non- Infringement -- filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Murphy, Regina) (Main Document 665 replaced on 3/20/2014) (ntl).
March 19, 2014 Filing 664 VERDICT FORM. (ntl)
March 19, 2014 Filing 663 Final Jury Instructions. (ntl)
March 19, 2014 Filing 662 STATEMENT Google's Objections to the Court's Final Jury Instructions by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
March 19, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 3/19/2014. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
March 18, 2014 Filing 661 VERDICT SHEET by Personalized User Model LLP [Revised Proposed Verdict Form]. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 18, 2014 Filing 660 VERDICT SHEET by Google Inc. (GOOGLE INC.'S REVISED PROPOSED VERDICT FORM). (Horwitz, Richard)
March 18, 2014 Filing 659 [SEALED] Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from RICHARD L. HORWITZ regarding term "conceived". (Horwitz, Richard)
March 18, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 3/18/2014. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (rpg)
March 17, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Hearing held on 3/17/2014. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
March 17, 2014 Filing 658 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Meaning of Conception. (Jacobs, Karen)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 645 Stipulation Regarding Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/14/14. (ntl)
March 16, 2014 Filing 657 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 656 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Horwitz, Richard)
March 16, 2014 Filing 656 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement - filed by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
March 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' submissions relating to objections to deposition testimony designated to be played at trial tomorrow, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, for reasons that will be explained on the record during trial: (1) with the exception noted below, all objections to testimony designated from witnesses Sonmez, Stolcke, Aspitz, and Black are OVERRULED; and (2) with respect to PUM's objection to the testimony of witness Bercow, the Court will hear argument in relation to whether evidence regarding the "Fastus project" was timely disclosed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/16/14. (ntl)
March 16, 2014 Filing 654 VERDICT SHEET by Personalized User Model LLP [Personalized User Model's Second Corrected Proposed Verdict Form]. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 15, 2014 Filing 653 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding parties' designated deposition testimony. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 2)(Jacobs, Karen)
March 14, 2014 Filing 652 VERDICT SHEET by Personalized User Model LLP --Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Corrected Proposed Verdict Form --. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 14, 2014 Filing 651 Proposed Jury Instructions by Personalized User Model LLP [REVISED JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS]. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 14, 2014 Filing 650 VERDICT SHEET by Personalized User Model LLP . (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 14, 2014 Filing 649 VERDICT SHEET by Google Inc. (DEFENDANT GOOGLE'S PROPOSED VERDICT FORM). (Horwitz, Richard)
March 14, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 3/14/2014. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (rpg)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters and associated materials filed this evening, the Court adheres to its motion in limine ruling (D.I. 606 at 8) and IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PUM may NOT use the pre-suit licensing letters to cross-examine Jonathan Alferness. The parties' pre-suit contacts and lack thereof are not relevant to any issue in this portion of the case. Allowing such evidence to be presented to this jury would unfairly prejudice Google, confuse the jury, and potentially invite the jury to rule against Google solely because of Google's apparent failure to respond to the pre-suit letters, rendering the FRE 403 balance substantially in favor of exclusion. Mr. Alferness' trial testimony was consistent with what Google represented it would be at the pretrial conference and the Court granted Google's motion in limine #1 after hearing Google's representation. The Court sees no basis to sanction PUM and DENIES Google's request that it do so. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/13/14. (ntl)
March 13, 2014 Filing 647 [SEALED] STATEMENT [BRIEF ON GOOGLE'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENTS ON COPYING OR PRESUIT KNOWLEDGE] by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Horwitz, Richard)
March 13, 2014 Filing 646 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Licensing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhs. A-D)(Jacobs, Karen)
March 13, 2014 Filing 645 STIPULATION Regarding Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
March 13, 2014 Filing 644 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding reply to Google's March 11 letter - re 643 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Karen)
March 13, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 3/13/2014. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (rpg)
March 12, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 3/12/2014. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (rpg)
March 11, 2014 Filing 643 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding response to PUM letter dated March 11, 2014 - re 640 Letter,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Horwitz, Richard)
March 11, 2014 Filing 642 REDACTED VERSION of 626 Reply Brief, in Support of Motion Regarding the Statute of Limitations Applicable to Google's Breach of Contract Defense and Related Counterclaims by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Murphy, Regina)
March 11, 2014 Filing 641 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding deposition designations. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 12/3/2010 Twersky Designation, # 3 3/17/2011 Montes Designations, # 4 5/5/2011 Twersky Designations, # 5 1/26/2012 Twersky Designation)(Horwitz, Richard)
March 11, 2014 Filing 640 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding PUM submits Google's final list of anticipatory references and obviousness combinations that Google provided on March 5, 2014 - re 630 Order, 631 Letter. (Jacobs, Karen)
March 11, 2014 Filing 639 STATEMENT GOOGLE'S OBJECTION TO DR. PAZZANI'S DEMONSTRATIVES AND TESTIMONY COMPARING THE ACCUSED PRODUCTS TO THE FIGURE 2 EMBODIMENT FROM THE ASSERTED PATENTS' SPECIFICATION by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
March 11, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial held on 3/11/2014. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (rpg)
March 10, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Jury Trial (Day 1) held on 3/10/2014. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
March 10, 2014 Filing 638 REDACTED VERSION of 612 Declaration, of Jennifer D. Bennett and Exhibits 1 through 8 by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 10, 2014 Filing 637 REDACTED VERSION of 611 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE GOOGLE FROM REFERRING TO RECENT CHANGES IN THE ACCUSED TECHNOLOGY by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 10, 2014 Filing 636 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding PUMs deposition designations. (Horwitz, Richard)
March 10, 2014 Filing 635 Preliminary Jury Instructions. (ntl)
March 9, 2014 Filing 634 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Google's letter regarding PUM's deposition designations. (Jacobs, Karen)
March 9, 2014 Filing 633 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding parties' submission of designated deposition testimony. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobs, Karen)
March 8, 2014 Filing 632 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Parties proposals for proposed jury instructions - re 627 Memorandum and Order,. (Jacobs, Karen)
March 8, 2014 Filing 631 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding the parties' identification of final accused products/services and asserted claims - re 630 Order,. (Jacobs, Karen)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint letter, no later than 12:00 noon on Saturday, March 8, providing the Court with a final list of all accused products/services and all asserted patent claims. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/7/14. (ntl)
March 7, 2014 Filing 629 Voir Dire Questions. (ntl)
March 6, 2014 Filing 628 REDACTED VERSION of 610 MOTION [PUM'S MOTION REGARDING THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS APPLICABLE TO GOOGLE'S BREACH OF CONTRACT DEFENSE AND RELATED COUNTERCLAIM] re 606 Memorandum and Order,, by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Murphy, Regina)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 627 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 610 PUM'S MOTION REGARDING THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS APPLICABLE TO GOOGLE'S BREACH OF CONTRACT DEFENSE AND RELATED COUNTERCLAIM is DENIED; 611 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE GOOGLE FROM REFERRING TO RECENT CHANGES IN THE ACCUSED TECHNOLOGY filed by Personalized User Model LLP is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/6/14. (ntl)
March 6, 2014 Filing 626 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 610 MOTION [PUM'S MOTION REGARDING THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS APPLICABLE TO GOOGLE'S BREACH OF CONTRACT DEFENSE AND RELATED COUNTERCLAIM] re 606 Memorandum and Order,, filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Murphy, Regina)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER regarding PUM's motion in limine on ownership issues. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/5/14. (ntl)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER re motion to exclude certain opinions of Dr. Michael Pazzani. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/4/14. (ntl)
March 5, 2014 Filing 623 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding parties' competing proposals for the order of proofs at trial - re 606 Memorandum and Order,,. (Jacobs, Karen)
March 5, 2014 Filing 622 REPLY BRIEF re 611 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE GOOGLE FROM REFERRING TO RECENT CHANGES IN THE ACCUSED TECHNOLOGY filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Jacobs, Karen)
March 5, 2014 Filing 621 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 620 Answering Brief in Opposition, (DECLARATION OF JOSHUA L. SOHN IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION BRIEF TO PUM'S MOTION REGARDING THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moore, David)
March 5, 2014 Filing 620 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 610 MOTION [PUM'S MOTION REGARDING THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS APPLICABLE TO GOOGLE'S BREACH OF CONTRACT DEFENSE AND RELATED COUNTERCLAIM] re 606 Memorandum and Order,, filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/17/2014. (Moore, David)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 614 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a proposed Order regarding PUM's Motion in Limine No. 1 on ownership issues to March 4, 2014 filed by Konig Yochai, Personalized User Model LLP. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/4/14. (ntl)
March 4, 2014 Filing 619 Official Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on February 26, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2014. (bpg)
March 4, 2014 Filing 618 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 617 Answering Brief in Opposition, (DECLARATION OF MARGARET P. KAMMERUD IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO PUM'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE GOOGLE FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OF DISCONTINUED PRODUCTS) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5, # 2 Exhibit 6-9)(Moore, David)
March 4, 2014 Filing 617 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 611 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE GOOGLE FROM REFERRING TO RECENT CHANGES IN THE ACCUSED TECHNOLOGY (OPPOSITION TO PUM'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE GOOGLE FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OF DISCONTINUED PRODUCTS) filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/14/2014. (Moore, David)
March 4, 2014 Filing 616 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding parties' competing proposals for an Order - re 606 Memorandum and Order,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Jacobs, Karen)
March 3, 2014 Filing 615 Proposed Voir Dire by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 3, 2014 Filing 614 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a proposed Order regarding PUM's Motion in Limine No. 1 on ownership issues to March 4, 2014 - filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Murphy, Regina)
March 3, 2014 Filing 613 PROPOSED ORDER re 606 Memorandum and Order,, regarding portions of Dr. Pazzani's report that are striken by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark)(Jacobs, Karen)
March 2, 2014 Filing 612 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 611 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE GOOGLE FROM REFERRING TO RECENT CHANGES IN THE ACCUSED TECHNOLOGY [Jennifer D. Bennett Declaration] by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBITS 1-8)(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 2, 2014 Filing 611 [SEALED] MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE GOOGLE FROM REFERRING TO RECENT CHANGES IN THE ACCUSED TECHNOLOGY - filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 2, 2014 Filing 610 [SEALED] MOTION [PUM'S MOTION REGARDING THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS APPLICABLE TO GOOGLE'S BREACH OF CONTRACT DEFENSE AND RELATED COUNTERCLAIM] re 606 Memorandum and Order,, - filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Murphy, Regina)
February 28, 2014 Filing 609 REDACTED VERSION of 601 Exhibit to a Document re 588 Proposed Pretrial Order [REVISED EXHIBIT 8 TO THE [PROPOSED] PRETRIAL ORDER - - PUM'S DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS] by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 28, 2014 Filing 608 REDACTED VERSION of 585 Reply Brief, re 555 MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DR. EDWARD FOX'S NON-INFRINGEMENT REPORT FOR FAILURE TO APPLY THE COURT'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 28, 2014 Filing 607 REDACTED VERSION of 594 Objections, [Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Objections to Google's Trial Exhibit List (Revised Pretrial Order Exhibit No. 11)] by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 606 MEMORANDUM ORDER re rulings on the motions in limine; 552 Defendant Google, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Michael Pazzani is Granted in part and Denied in part; 555 MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DR. EDWARD FOX'S NON-INFRINGEMENT REPORT FOR FAILURE TO APPLY THE COURT'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Personalized User Model LLP is Granted in part and Denied in part; each side is allocated 17 hours for their trial presentations. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/27/14. (ntl)
February 27, 2014 Filing 605 REDACTED VERSION of 591 Exhibit to a Document Revised Exhibit 10 to Pretrial Order (PUM's Trial Exhibit List with Google's Objections) by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 27, 2014 Filing 604 REDACTED VERSION of 587 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in support of Google's Daubert Reply Brief to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Michael Pazzani by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moore, David)
February 27, 2014 Filing 603 REDACTED VERSION of 586 Reply Brief in Support of Google's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Michael Pazzani by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 27, 2014 Filing 602 REDACTED VERSION of 588 Proposed Pretrial Order, by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-20)(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 26, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Pretrial Conference held on 2/26/2014. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
February 26, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected document added to D.I. 597 per request of counsel. (ntl)
February 26, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected exhibits 1-12 added to D.I. 588 per request of counsel. (ntl)
February 25, 2014 Filing 601 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re 588 Proposed Pretrial Order [REVISED EXHIBIT 8 TO THE [PROPOSED] PRETRIAL ORDER - - PUM'S DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS] by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 25, 2014 Filing 600 EXHIBIT re 588 Proposed Pretrial Order -- Revised Exhibit 9 to the [Proposed] Pretrial Order -- by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Murphy, Regina)
February 24, 2014 Filing 599 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO GOOGLE (NOS. 2-4, 6-7, 12-14) [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL OUTSIDE COUNSEL ONLY]; and DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO GOOGLE (NOS. 19-29, 31, 33-36) [RESTRICTED CONFIDENTIAL-SOURCE CODE] filed by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
February 24, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 591 placed under seal per request of counsel. (ntl)
February 21, 2014 Filing 598 Proposed Jury Instructions by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai [Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Proposed Final Jury Instructions]. (Murphy, Regina)
February 21, 2014 Filing 597 Proposed Jury Instructions by Google Inc. . (Moore, David) (Main Document 597 replaced on 2/26/2014) (ntl).
February 21, 2014 Filing 596 Proposed Jury Instructions by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai [Joint Proposed Final Jury Instructions]. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 21, 2014 Filing 595 Proposed Jury Instructions by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai [Joint Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions]. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 21, 2014 Filing 594 [SEALED] OBJECTIONS by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai to 588 Proposed Pretrial Order [Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Objections to Google's Trial Exhibit List (Revised Pretrial Order Exhibit No. 11)]. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 21, 2014 Filing 593 VERDICT SHEET by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai . (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 21, 2014 Filing 592 Proposed Voir Dire by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 21, 2014 Filing 591 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re 588 Proposed Pretrial Order (REVISED EXHIBIT 10 - PUM'S TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST WITH GOOGLE'S OBJECTIONS) by Google Inc. (Moore, David) Modified on 2/24/2014 (ntl).
February 21, 2014 Filing 590 VERDICT SHEET by Google Inc. . (Moore, David)
February 21, 2014 Filing 589 Proposed Voir Dire by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 19, 2014 Filing 588 [SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 12, # 2 Exhibits 13 through 14, # 3 Exhibits 15 through 20)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/26/2014) (ntl).
February 19, 2014 Filing 587 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 586 Reply Brief Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Google's Daubert Reply Brief to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Michael Pazzani by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moore, David)
February 19, 2014 Filing 586 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 552 MOTION to Preclude Defendant Google, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Michael Pazzani filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 19, 2014 Filing 585 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 555 MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DR. EDWARD FOX'S NON-INFRINGEMENT REPORT FOR FAILURE TO APPLY THE COURT'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Murphy, Regina)
February 18, 2014 Filing 584 REDACTED VERSION of 578 Declaration,, of Antonio Sistos in Support of Google's Opposition to PUM's Motion to Exclude Portions of Dr. Edward Fox's Non-Infringement Report [Volume II of II] (Exhibits 2-8) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2-4, # 2 Exhibit 5-6, # 3 Exhibit 7 part 1, # 4 Exhibit 7 part 2, # 5 Exhibit 7 part 3, # 6 Exhibit 7 part 4, # 7 Exhibit 7 part 5, # 8 Exhibit 7 part 6, # 9 Exhibit 8 part 1, # 10 Exhibit 8 part 2, # 11 Exhibit 8 part 3, # 12 Exhibit 8 part 4)(Moore, David)
February 18, 2014 Filing 583 REDACTED VERSION of 577 Declaration, of Antonio Sistos in Support of Google's Opposition to PUM's Motion to Exclude Portions of Dr. Edward Fox's Non-Infringement Report [Volume I of II] (Exhibit 1) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Moore, David)
February 18, 2014 Filing 582 REDACTED VERSION of 576 Answering Brief in Opposition to PUM's Motion to Exclude Portions of Dr. Edward Fox's Non-Infringement Report by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 14, 2014 Filing 581 REDACTED VERSION of 574 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding response to PUM's February 7, 2014 letter - re 573 Letter by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' most recent letters relating to various disputes between the parties (D.I. 573, 574), the Court concludes that only issue three raised by PUM warrants judicial attention at this time, and in that regard IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Google may present its alternate Rule 30(b)(6) witness(es) to testify regarding the accused Portrait functionality, provided that: (i) the witness(es)' testimony is within the scope of the Rule 30(b)(6) topics noticed by PUM and (ii) the witness(es) is(are) made available for a short deposition prior to the Pretrial Conference, or at another time agreeable to all parties. To the extent any of the other issues addressed in the parties' letters are not otherwise resolved, the parties may present them in the proposed Pretrial Order as motions in limine (subject to the limit of three per side) or as miscellaneous issues. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/11/14. (ntl)
February 10, 2014 Filing 579 RESPONSE to Motion re 552 MOTION to Preclude Defendant Google, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Michael Pazzani filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Murphy, Regina)
February 10, 2014 Filing 578 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 576 Answering Brief in Opposition (DECLARATION OF ANTONIO SISTOS IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO PUM'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DR. EDWARD FOX'S NON-INFRINGEMENT REPORT) (VOLUME II of II) (Exhibits 2-8) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2-6, # 2 Exhibit 7 (part 1), # 3 Exhibit 7 (part 2), # 4 Exhibit 7 (part 3), # 5 Exhibit 7 (part 4), # 6 Exhibit 7 (part 5), # 7 Exhibit 7 (part 6), # 8 Exhibit 8 (part 1), # 9 Exhibit 8 (part 2), # 10 Exhibit 8 (part 3), # 11 Exhibit 8 (part 4))(Moore, David)
February 10, 2014 Filing 577 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 576 Answering Brief in Opposition (DECLARATION OF ANTONIO SISTOS IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO PUM'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DR. EDWARD FOX'S NON-INFRINGEMENT REPORT)(VOLUME I of II) (Exhibit 1) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1), # 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2), # 3 Exhibit 1 (part 3), # 4 Exhibit 1 (part 4))(Moore, David)
February 10, 2014 Filing 576 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 555 MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DR. EDWARD FOX'S NON-INFRINGEMENT REPORT FOR FAILURE TO APPLY THE COURT'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 10, 2014 Filing 575 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 282 filed by Google Inc..(Horwitz, Richard)
February 7, 2014 Filing 574 [SEALED] Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding response to PUM's February 7, 2014 letter - re 573 Letter,. (Horwitz, Richard)
February 7, 2014 Filing 573 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding to request a conference with the Court at its earliest convenience to resolve disputes that have arisen between the parties as a result of Google's submission of its sections of the Pretrial Order on January 31, 2014. (Jacobs, Karen)
February 7, 2014 Filing 572 NOTICE OF SERVICE of SIXTH SUPPLEMENTAL INITIAL DISCLOSURES OF GOOGLE INC. PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P 26(a)(1) filed by Google Inc..(Palapura, Bindu)
February 7, 2014 Filing 571 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on January 27, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2014. (bpg)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 570 Stipulation Regarding Daubert Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/7/14. (ntl)
February 6, 2014 Filing 570 STIPULATION regarding Daubert Briefing Schedule by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 569 Order on Schedule of Pretrial Exchanges filed by Personalized User Model LLP. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/3/14. (ntl)
January 31, 2014 Filing 569 PROPOSED ORDER on Schedule of Pretrial Exchanges re 567 Order,, by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark)(Jacobs, Karen)
January 30, 2014 Filing 568 REDACTED VERSION of 559 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding D.I. 550 Oral Order by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Horwitz, Richard)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' competing proposals for pretrial order exchanges (D.I. 566 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Proposed Pretrial Order Schedule is ADOPTED with two modifications: (1) Google shall provide deposition designations and its trial exhibit list by Wednesday, February 5 instead of Monday, February 3; and (2) Google shall provide counter-designations and objections to PUM's deposition designations by Friday, February 7 instead of Wednesday, February 5. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed Order, consistent with today's Oral Order, by tomorrow, January 31 at 12:00 PM. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/30/2014. (ntl)
January 29, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected attachment added to D.I. 566 per request of counsel. (ntl)
January 28, 2014 Filing 566 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding parties' competing proposals for schedule of pretrial order exchanges. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pretrial Order Schedules)(Jacobs, Karen) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/29/2014) (ntl).
January 28, 2014 Filing 565 REDACTED VERSION of 554 Declaration, re 553 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Google's Opening Brief in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Michael Pazzani by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5)(Moore, David)
January 28, 2014 Filing 564 REDACTED VERSION of 553 Opening Brief in Support, re 552 MOTION to Preclude Defendant Google, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Michael Pazzani by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
January 28, 2014 Filing 563 REDACTED VERSION of 557 Declaration, OF JENNIFER D. BENNETT IN SUPPORT OF PUM'S OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DR. EDWARD FOX'S NON-INFRINGEMENT REPORT FOR FAI LURE TO APPLY THE COURT'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 28, 2014 Filing 562 REDACTED VERSION of 556 Opening Brief in Support, of MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DR. EDWARD FOX'S NON-INFRINGEMENT REPORT FOR FAILURE TO APPLY THE COURT'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 27, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 1/27/2014. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORAL ORDER Re-Setting Teleconference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Telephone Conference scheduled for 1/27/2014 at 1:30 PM will hereby begin at 4:45 PM. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/27/14. (ntl)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Status Telephone Conference is set for 1/27/2014 at 1:30 PM. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call to (302) 573-4573. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/24/14. (ntl)
January 23, 2014 Filing 559 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding D.I. 550 Oral Order - re 550 Order,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Horwitz, Richard)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 551 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew M. Grodin of Dentons US LLP filed by Konig Yochai, Personalized User Model LLP. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/23/14. (ntl)
January 22, 2014 Filing 558 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Google's prior art contentions and pretrial preparation disputes - re 550 Order,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Jacobs, Karen)
January 21, 2014 Filing 557 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 556 Opening Brief in Support, [DECLARATION OF JENNIFER D. BENNETT IN SUPPORT OF PUM'S OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DR. EDWARD FOX'S NON-INFRINGEMENT REPORT FOR FAILURE TO APPLY THE COURT'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION] by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 21, 2014 Filing 556 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 555 MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DR. EDWARD FOX'S NON-INFRINGEMENT REPORT FOR FAILURE TO APPLY THE COURT'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Personalized User Model LLP.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/7/2014. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 21, 2014 Filing 555 MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF DR. EDWARD FOX'S NON-INFRINGEMENT REPORT FOR FAILURE TO APPLY THE COURT'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION - filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 7.1.1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 21, 2014 Filing 554 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 553 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Google's Opening Brief in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Michael Pazzani by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Exhibit 3-5)(Moore, David)
January 21, 2014 Filing 553 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 552 MOTION to Preclude Defendant Google, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Michael Pazzani filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/7/2014. (Moore, David)
January 21, 2014 Filing 552 MOTION to Preclude Defendant Google, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Michael Pazzani - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
January 21, 2014 Filing 551 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew M. Grodin of Dentons US LLP - filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters (D.I. 548, 549), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff shall submit a three (3) page letter, no later than 5:00 p.m. on January 22, 2014; and (2) Defendant shall submit a three (3) page letter, no later than 5:00 p.m. on January 23, 2014. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/21/14. (ntl)
January 17, 2014 Filing 549 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding request for dispute conference. (Horwitz, Richard)
January 17, 2014 Filing 548 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding to request a discovery dispute conference. (Jacobs, Karen)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Karen Jacobs, Esquire to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/20/2013 at 10:00 AM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/18/13. (cak)
December 12, 2013 Filing 546 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Fifth Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Google Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
December 9, 2013 Filing 545 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on November 20, 2013 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2014. (bpg)
November 27, 2013 Filing 544 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding trial date - re 543 Order,,,,,. (Horwitz, Richard)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' most recent letter relating to the scheduling of trial, and mindful of the events preceding that letter -- including other submissions, the Court's previous rulings, the recent teleconference discussion, and the efforts defense counsel have (and have not) undertaken to avoid or alleviate the conflicting trial dates set by this Court and other Courts -- and recognizing that Defendant and/or members of the defense team will most likely have some degree of conflict whenever trial in this matter is held, but also considering that this case was filed more than four years ago and requires a trial, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will proceed with EITHER (a) a liability only trial beginning on March 10, 2014, as currently scheduled, OR (b) a combined liability and damages trial beginning on August 4, 2014, at Defendant's election. Defendant will be prejudiced to some extent in either event, although under the totality of circumstances the Court is not persuaded that such prejudice outweighs the prejudice to Plaintiff and the Court from any of the other options Defendant has proposed. Defendant shall advise the Court no later than 1:00 p.m. on Wednesday, November 27, 2013 of its election as between the two trial options listed above. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/25/13. (ntl)
November 22, 2013 Filing 542 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding the parties positions concerning trial. (Jacobs, Karen)
November 20, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 11/20/2013. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (rpg)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the teleconference scheduled for 11/18/13 at 4:30 PM is CANCELLED and is hereby rescheduled for 11/20/2013 at 3:00 PM. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/18/13. (ntl)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' latest submissions relating to the scheduling of trial (D.I. 538, 539), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hold a status teleconference on Monday, November 18, 2013 at 4:30 p.m. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/13/13. (ntl)
November 12, 2013 Filing 539 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Response to Google's November 7, 2013 letter concerning the March 10, 2014 trial date [D.I. 538] - re 538 Letter. (Jacobs, Karen)
November 7, 2013 Filing 538 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Trial Date - re 537 Memorandum and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Horwitz, Richard)
October 31, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles K. Verhoeven for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 537 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 523 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Google Inc. is DENIED; 531 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by Google Inc. is DENIED; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/19/2014; A Jury Trial is set for 3/10/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B; A Pretrial Conference is set for 2/26/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/28/13. (ntl)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 536 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard D. Salgado and Steven M. Geiszler of DENTONS US LLP filed by Konig Yochai, Personalized User Model LLP. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/23/13. (ntl)
October 22, 2013 Filing 536 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard D. Salgado and Steven M. Geiszler of DENTONS US LLP - filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Murphy, Regina)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 1/23/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/18/13. (cak)
October 15, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark C. Nelson for Personalized User Model LLP added for electronic noticing. (els)
October 10, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Marc S. Friedman for Personalized User Model LLP added for electronic noticing. (els)
October 9, 2013 Filing 534 DECLARATION re 533 Reply Brief (DECLARATION OF JOSHUA L. SOHN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Moore, David)
October 9, 2013 Filing 533 REPLY BRIEF re 531 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Google's Motion for Reconsideration, with Exhibit 1 and Certificate of Service filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 532 RESPONSE to Motion re 531 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Google's Motion for Reconsideration, with Exhibit 1 and Certificate of Service filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Murphy, Regina)
October 2, 2013 Filing 531 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Google's Motion for Reconsideration, with Exhibit 1 and Certificate of Service - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Moore, David)
September 30, 2013 Filing 530 RESPONSE to Motion re 523 MOTION for Reconsideration re 521 Memorandum Opinion (GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER ON GOOGLE'S BREACH OF CONTRACT COUNTERCLAIM) filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Murphy, Regina)
September 30, 2013 Filing 529 Joint STATUS REPORT by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP. (Jacobs, Karen)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 528 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 30, 2013 filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/27/13. (ntl)
September 26, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket description amended for D.I. 528 . (ntl)
September 25, 2013 Filing 528 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit joint status report to September 30, 2013 - filed by Google Inc. (Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 9/26/2013 (ntl).
September 20, 2013 Filing 527 PUBLIC VERSION of 521 Memorandum Opinion. (ntl)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 526 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their joint status report per the Court's Order (D.I. 522) to September 25, 2013 filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/20/13. (ntl)
September 19, 2013 Filing 526 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their joint status report per the Court's Order (D.I. 522) to September 25, 2013 - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Personalized User Model to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 10/3/2013 at 02:30 PM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss the status of the case and interest in mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/18/13. (cak)
September 16, 2013 Filing 524 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding redacted version of the Court's September 9, 2013 Memorandum Opinion - re 521 Memorandum Opinion. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Memorandum Opinion)(Horwitz, Richard)
September 12, 2013 Filing 523 MOTION for Reconsideration re 521 Memorandum Opinion (GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER ON GOOGLE'S BREACH OF CONTRACT COUNTERCLAIM) - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
September 11, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Margaret P. Kammerud,Antonio R. Sistos for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER re 521 Memorandum Opinion -- Granting in part, Denying in part 422 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Denying 444 MOTION For Leave To Cross-Move For Summary Judgment; Denying 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Denying 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Denying 415 MOTION to Strike. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/9/13. (ntl)
September 9, 2013 Filing 521 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM OPINION re pending motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/9/13. (ntl)
July 31, 2013 Filing 520 Redaction of Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on May 8, 2013 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed Defendant's letter (D.I. 518 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court ADOPTS Defendant's proposed redactions of the May 8, 2013 Oral Argument transcript. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/26/13. (ntl)
June 18, 2013 Filing 518 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding Google, Inc.'s, proposed redactions to the May 8, 2013 Oral Argument transcript - re 516 Notice of Intent to Request Transcript Redaction. (Moore, David)
June 11, 2013 Filing 517 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Christian E. Samay as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with Dentons US LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 4, 2013 Filing 516 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by David Ellis Moore re 515 Transcript, (Moore, David)
May 28, 2013 Filing 515 Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on May 8, 2013 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2013. (bpg)
May 16, 2013 Filing 514 REDACTED VERSION of 513 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Issues Raised at May 8, 2013 Hearing by Personalized User Model LLP. (Louden, Karen)
May 10, 2013 Filing 513 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Issues Raised at May 8, 2013 Hearing - re 512 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Rebuttal Chart)(Louden, Karen)
May 9, 2013 Filing 512 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Issues raised at May 8, 2013 Hearing - re Oral Argument. (Attachments: # 1 Chart - Attachment to letter)(Horwitz, Richard)
May 8, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 5/8/2013. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
May 7, 2013 Filing 511 OBJECTIONS by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai to 510 Notice (Other) Google's So-Called "Errata" to its Declaration in Support of Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. (Louden, Karen)
May 1, 2013 Filing 510 NOTICE of Errata by Google Inc. re 419 Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Errata to Defendant Google Inc.'s Summary Judgment Papers)(Moore, David)
April 25, 2013 Filing 509 STATEMENT re 508 Notice (Other) -- PUMs Response to Google's Notice of Supplemental Authority for Summary Judgment Briefing -- by Personalized User Model LLP. (Louden, Karen)
April 23, 2013 Filing 508 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority For Defendant Google Inc.'s Summary Judgment Briefs Pursuant to Rule 7.1.2(b) by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Moore, David)
April 1, 2013 Filing 507 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearances of Jimmy M. Shin and Yar R. Chaikovsky by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 1, 2013 Filing 506 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 22, 2013 Filing 505 OBJECTIONS by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai to 503 Notice (Other) Response to Google's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Louden, Karen)
February 22, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joshua L. Sohn for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 19, 2013 Filing 504 REDACTED VERSION of 496 Declaration re 495 Reply Brief [Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Reply Brief to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity] by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Moore, David)
February 19, 2013 Filing 503 NOTICE of Local Rule 7.1.2(b) Notice of Supplemental Authority for Defendant Google Inc.'s Summary Judgment Briefs by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Moore, David)
February 19, 2013 Filing 502 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Regina S.E. Murphy regarding Amended Exhibit L to Declaration of Jennifer D. Bennett (D.I. 454) - re 454 Declaration,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L)(Murphy, Regina)
February 18, 2013 Filing 501 REDACTED VERSION of 492 Reply Brief, in Support of Proposed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Google's Declaratory Judgment Claims and Standing Defense Regarding SRI by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 15, 2013 Filing 500 REDACTED VERSION of 494 Reply Brief in Support of Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 15, 2013 Filing 499 REDACTED VERSION of 493 Reply Brief in Support of Google's Motion for Summary Judgment on its Breach of Contract Counterclaim, its Declaration of Ownership Courterclaim, and its Affirmative Defense of Lack of Standing by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 8, 2013 Filing 498 DECLARATION re 497 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike Dr. Jordan's Late Disclosed Opinions (Declaration of Jaime G. Carbonell) by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 8, 2013 Filing 497 REPLY BRIEF re 415 MOTION to Strike Dr. Jordans Late-Disclosed Opinions filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 8, 2013 Filing 496 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 495 Reply Brief [Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Reply Brief to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity] by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Moore, David)
February 8, 2013 Filing 495 REPLY BRIEF re 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 8, 2013 Filing 494 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 422 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 8, 2013 Filing 493 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Its Breach Of Contract Counterclaim, Its Declaration Of Ownership Counterclaim, And Its Affirmative Defense Of Lack Of Standing filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 4, 2013 Filing 492 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 444 MOTION P.U.M.'s Motion For Leave To Cross-Move For Summary Judgment In Response To Googles Motion For Summary Judgment On Its Breach Of Contract And Declaration Of Ownership Counterclaims, And Affirmative Defense Of Lack Of Standing re 412 filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Murphy, Regina)
February 1, 2013 Filing 491 REDACTED VERSION of 487 Declaration, of Joshua L. Sohn by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moore, David)
February 1, 2013 Filing 490 REDACTED VERSION of 486 Answering Brief in Opposition,, by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 1, 2013 Filing 489 REDACTED VERSION of 451 Declaration, of Andrea Pallios with Exhibits B-C by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C)(Moore, David)
February 1, 2013 Filing 488 REDACTED VERSION of 450 Declaration, of Andrea Pallios Roberts with Exhibit A by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moore, David)
January 25, 2013 Filing 487 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 486 Answering Brief in Opposition,, (DECLARATION OF JOSHUA L. SOHN IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE'S ANSWERING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PUM'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moore, David)
January 25, 2013 Filing 486 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 444 MOTION P.U.M.'s Motion For Leave To Cross-Move For Summary Judgment In Response To Googles Motion For Summary Judgment On Its Breach Of Contract And Declaration Of Ownership Counterclaims, And Affirmative Defense Of Lack Of Standing re 412 (also in opposition to DI 452 - PUM's Answering Brief in Support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (filed without leave of the Court)) filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/4/2013. (Moore, David)
January 23, 2013 Filing 485 REDACTED VERSION of 468 Declaration, re Answering Brief in Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Jennifer D. Bennett) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-K)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 484 REDACTED VERSION of 467 Declaration, re Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declarati on of Michael J. Pazzani) (Volume 7 of 7) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 483 REDACTED VERSION of 466 Declaration, re Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani) (Volume 6 of 7) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 482 REDACTED VERSION of 465 Declaration, re Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani) (Volume 5 of 7 ) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 481 REDACTED VERSION of 464 Declaration, re Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani) (Volume 4 of 7) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 480 REDACTED VERSION of 463 Declaration, re Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani) (Volume 3 of 7) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 479 REDACTED VERSION of 462 Declaration re Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani) (Volume 2 of 7) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 478 REDACTED VERSION of 461 Declaration, re Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 477 REDACTED VERSION of 460 Answering Brief in Opposition re Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 476 REDACTED VERSION of 459 Declaration, re Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Declaration of Jaime G. Carbonell) (Volume 3 of 3) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 475 REDACTED VERSION of 458 Declaration, re Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Declaration of Jaime G. Carbonell) (Volume 2 of 3) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 474 REDACTED VERSION of 457 Declaration re Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Declaration of Jaime G. Carbonell) (Volume 1 of 3) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 473 REDACTED VERSION of 456 Declaration re Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Declaration of Jennifer D. Bennett) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 472 REDACTED VERSION of 455 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 471 REDACTED VERSION of 454 Declaration, re Answering Brief in Opposition, to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding SRI and in Support of PUM's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Jennifer D. Bennett) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-N)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 470 REDACTED VERSION of 453 Declaration, re Answering Brief in Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding SRI and in Support of PUM's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 469 REDACTED VERSION of 452 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding SRI and in Support of PUM's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 468 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 460 Answering Brief in Opposition to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Jennifer D. Bennett) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-K (Part 1), # 2 Part 2, # 3 Part 3, # 4 Part 4, # 5 Part 5, # 6 Part 6, # 7 Part 7)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 467 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 466 Declaration, 464 Declaration, 461 Declaration, 465 Declaration, 463 Declaration, 462 Declaration, 460 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Michael J. Paz zani) (Volume 7 of 7 ) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 466 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 464 Declaration, 461 Declaration, 465 Declaration, 463 Declaration, 462 Declaration, 460 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani) (Volume 6 of 7 ) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 465 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 464 Declaration, 461 Declaration, 463 Declaration, 462 Declaration, 460 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani) (Volume 5 of 7) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 464 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 461 Declaration, 463 Declaration, 462 Declaration, 460 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani) (Volume 4 of 7) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 463 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 461 Declaration, 462 Declaration, 460 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani) (Volume 3 of 7 by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 462 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 461 Declaration, 460 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani) (Volume 2 of 7) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 461 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 460 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani) (Volume 1 of 7) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 460 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 422 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement filed by Personalized User Model LLP.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/25/2013. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 459 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 458 Declaration, 457 Declaration, 455 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Declaration of Jaime G. Carbonell) (Volume 3 of 3) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 458 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 457 Declaration, 455 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Declaration of Jaime G. Carbonell) (Volume 2 of 3) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 457 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 455 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Declaration of Jaime G. Carbonell) (Volume 1 of 3) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 456 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 455 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Declaration of Jennifer D. Bennett) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 455 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Personalized User Model LLP.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/25/2013. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 454 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 452 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding SRI and in Support of PUM's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Jennifer D. Bennett) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-N)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 453 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 452 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding SRI and in Support of PUM's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 452 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Its Breach Of Contract Counterclaim, Its Declaration Of Ownership Counterclaim, And Its Affirmative Defense Of Lack Of Standing (and in Support of PUM's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Personalized User Model LLP.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/25/2013. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 451 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 449 Answering Brief in Opposition (DECLARATION OF ANDREA PALLIOS ROBERTS IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO PUM'S MOTION TO STRIKE DR. JORDAN'S LATE-DISCLOSED OPINIONS) (VOLUME II of II) (Exs B-C) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B-C)(Moore, David)
January 14, 2013 Filing 450 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 449 Answering Brief in Opposition (DECLARATION OF ANDREA PALLIOS ROBERTS IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE'S OPPOSITION TO PUM'S MOTION TO STRIKE DR. JORDAN'S LATE-DISCLOSED OPINIONS) (VOLUME I of II) (Ex A) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moore, David)
January 14, 2013 Filing 449 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 415 MOTION to Strike Dr. Jordans Late-Disclosed Opinions filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/25/2013. (Moore, David)
January 14, 2013 Filing 448 REDACTED VERSION of 421 Declaration, of Karen Jacobs Louden (with Exhibits 1-2) by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 14, 2013 Filing 447 REDACTED VERSION of 416 Opening Brief in Support, of Motion to Strike Dr. Jordan's Late-Disclosed Opinions by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 9, 2013 Filing 446 REPLY BRIEF re 444 MOTION P.U.M.'s Motion For Leave To Cross-Move For Summary Judgment In Response To Googles Motion For Summary Judgment On Its Breach Of Contract And Declaration Of Ownership Counterclaims, And Affirmative Defense Of Lack Of Standing re 412 filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 7, 2013 Filing 445 RESPONSE to Motion re 444 MOTION P.U.M.'s Motion For Leave To Cross-Move For Summary Judgment In Response To Googles Motion For Summary Judgment On Its Breach Of Contract And Declaration Of Ownership Counterclaims, And Affirmative Defense Of Lack Of Standing re 412 Google's Opposition to PUM's Motion For Leave to Cross-Move For Summary Judgment, with Certificate of Service filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
January 2, 2013 Filing 444 MOTION P.U.M.'s Motion For Leave To Cross-Move For Summary Judgment In Response To Googles Motion For Summary Judgment On Its Breach Of Contract And Declaration Of Ownership Counterclaims, And Affirmative Defense Of Lack Of Standing re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Its Breach Of Contract Counterclaim, Its Declaration Of Ownership Counterclaim, And Its Affirmative Defense Of Lack Of Standing - filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 443 Stipulation filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Google Inc., Re-set Briefing Schedule:. (re 415 MOTION to Strike Dr. Jordans Late-Disclosed Opinions Answering Brief due 1/14/2013 and Reply Brief due 2/8/2013. Oppositions to dispositive motions due by 1/14/2013. Replies to case dispositive motions due by 2/8/2013 ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/28/2012. (rpg)
December 26, 2012 Filing 443 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Motions Schedule by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP. (Louden, Karen)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear argument on the pending motions on May 8, 2013 beginning at 9:00 a.m. Each side will be allocated up to 90 minutes to present its argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/19/12. (ntl)
December 13, 2012 Filing 441 REDACTED VERSION of 429 Declaration of Max Ventilla by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 13, 2012 Filing 440 REDACTED VERSION of 428 Declaration of Andre Rohe by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 13, 2012 Filing 439 REDACTED VERSION of 427 Declaration of Karthik Gopalratnam by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 13, 2012 Filing 438 REDACTED VERSION of 426 Declaration of Bryan Horling by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 13, 2012 Filing 437 REDACTED VERSION of 425 Declaration of Shankar Ponnekanti by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 13, 2012 Filing 436 REDACTED VERSION of 424 Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C-I)(Moore, David)
December 13, 2012 Filing 435 REDACTED VERSION of 423 Opening Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 13, 2012 Filing 434 REDACTED VERSION of 420 Declaration of Michael I. Jordan by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A, Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A, Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A, Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A, Part 6, # 7 Exhibit A, Part 7, # 8 Exhibit A, Part 8)(Moore, David)
December 13, 2012 Filing 433 REDACTED VERSION of 419 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A-F, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H-K)(Moore, David)
December 13, 2012 Filing 432 REDACTED VERSION of 418 Opening Brief in Support by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 13, 2012 Filing 431 REDACTED VERSION of 414 Declaration, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-O)(Moore, David)
December 13, 2012 Filing 430 REDACTED VERSION of 413 Opening Brief in Support, by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 429 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 422 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Max Ventilla) by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 428 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 422 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Andre Rohe) by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 427 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 422 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Karthik Gopalratnam) by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 426 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 422 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Bryan Horling) by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 425 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 422 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Shankar Ponnekanti) by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 424 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 422 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement (Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I)(Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 423 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 422 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/26/2012. (Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 422 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 421 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 415 MOTION to Strike Dr. Jordans Late-Disclosed Opinions (Declaration of Karen Jacobs Louden) by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Louden, Karen)
December 6, 2012 Filing 420 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Declaration of Michael I. Jordan) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 419 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-K)(Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 418 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/26/2012. (Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 416 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 415 MOTION to Strike Dr. Jordans Late-Disclosed Opinions filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/26/2012. (Louden, Karen)
December 6, 2012 Filing 415 MOTION to Strike Dr. Jordans Late-Disclosed Opinions - filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 6, 2012 Filing 414 [SEALED] DECLARATION re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Its Breach Of Contract Counterclaim, Its Declaration Of Ownership Counterclaim, And Its Affirmative Defense Of Lack Of Standing [DECLARATION OF ANDREA PALLIOS ROBERTS] by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D part 1, # 3 Exhibit D part 2, # 4 Exhibit E part 1, # 5 Exhibit E part 2, # 6 Exhibit F-O)(Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 413 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Its Breach Of Contract Counterclaim, Its Declaration Of Ownership Counterclaim, And Its Affirmative Defense Of Lack Of Standing filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/26/2012. (Moore, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 412 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Its Breach Of Contract Counterclaim, Its Declaration Of Ownership Counterclaim, And Its Affirmative Defense Of Lack Of Standing - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 411 Stipulation Regarding Dispositive Motions Schedule filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/30/12. (ntl)
November 29, 2012 Filing 411 Joint STIPULATION REGARDING DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SCHEDULE re 32 Scheduling Order, by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
November 7, 2012 Filing 410 REDACTED VERSION of 398 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Stay of the Proceedings by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 7, 2012 Filing 409 REDACTED VERSION of 376 Letter, 377 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding response to Google Inc.'s August 17, 2012 letter by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 6, 2012 Filing 408 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael I. Jordan on November 7, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 385 MOTION for Stay of the Proceedings filed by Google Inc. is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/31/12. (ntl)
October 15, 2012 Filing 406 REDACTED VERSION of 404 Declaration, of Andrea Pallios Roberts by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
October 15, 2012 Filing 405 REDACTED VERSION of 403 Reply Brief by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 402 Stipulation and Order to Seal Hearing Transcript of 8/31/12 (D.I. 399 ) filed by Google Inc; the proposed redacted transcript shall be submitted by 10/12/12. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/2/12. (ntl)
October 2, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: the transcript at D.I. 399 was placed under seal per the Stipulation and Order at D.I. 402 . (ntl)
October 1, 2012 Filing 404 SEALED DECLARATION re 403 Reply Brief (Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts in Support of Google Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for a Stay of the Proceedings with Exhibits 1-5) by Google Inc.. (Moore, David) Modified on 10/2/2012 (ntl).
October 1, 2012 Filing 403 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 385 MOTION to Stay of the Proceedings filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
October 1, 2012 Filing 402 STIPULATION and Order to Seal Hearing Transcript by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
September 28, 2012 Filing 401 RESPONSE to Motion re 400 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Louden, Karen)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 400 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/28/12. (ntl)
September 27, 2012 Filing 400 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports - filed by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
September 24, 2012 Filing 399 {SEALED} TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on August 31, 2012 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter: Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg) Modified on 10/2/2012 (ntl).
September 21, 2012 Filing 398 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 385 MOTION to Stay of the Proceedings filed by Personalized User Model LLP.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/1/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-15)(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORAL ORDER: Regarding the filing of case dispositive motions, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each party is permitted to file as many case dispositive motions as desired; provided, however, that each party will be limited to a combined total of 40 pages for all opening briefs, a combined total of 40 pages for all answering briefs, and a combined total of 20 pages for all reply briefs regardless of the number of case dispositive motions that are filed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/20/12. (ntl)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 396 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 301 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Google Inc. is DENIED; 309 Cross MOTION for Leave to Substitute Levino Ltd. as Plaintiff filed by Personalized User Model LLP is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/13/12. (ntl)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 395 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which PUM shall file a response to Google's Motion to Stay to September 21, 2012 filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Google Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/13/12. (ntl)
September 12, 2012 Filing 395 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which PUM shall file a response to Google's Motion to Stay to September 21, 2012 - filed by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 6, 2012 Filing 394 REDACTED VERSION of 382 Letter, to The Honorable Leonard R. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding response to Court's August 21, 2012 Oral Order setting the August 31, 2012 conference by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 6, 2012 Filing 393 REDACTED VERSION of 383 Letter to The Honorable Leonard R. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding response to Google's August 29, 2012 Letter by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 8)(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 6, 2012 Filing 392 REDACTED VERSION of 387 Declaration, re 386 Opening Brief in Support, 385 MOTION to Stay of the Proceedings [DECLARATION OF ANDREA PALLIOS ROBERTS IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE'S MOTION TO STAY THE PROCEEDINGS] by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-21)(Moore, David)
September 6, 2012 Filing 391 REDACTED VERSION of 386 Opening Brief in Support re 385 MOTION to Stay of the Proceedings by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 part 2)(Moore, David)
September 6, 2012 Filing 390 REDACTED VERSION of 384 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding responsive discovery dispute letter - re 382 Letter by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Horwitz, Richard)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 389 Stipulation Regarding Expert Discovery Schedule -- Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/6/12. (ntl)
September 5, 2012 Filing 389 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Expert Discovery Schedule re 32 Scheduling Order, by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 5, 2012 Filing 388 REDACTED VERSION of 381 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Horwitz, Richard)
August 31, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 8/31/2012. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
August 30, 2012 Filing 387 SEALED DECLARATION re 386 Opening Brief in Support, 385 MOTION to Stay of the Proceedings [DECLARATION OF ANDREA PALLIOS ROBERTS IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE'S MOTION TO STAY THE PROCEEDINGS (Exs. 1-22)] by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
August 30, 2012 Filing 386 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re 385 MOTION to Stay of the Proceedings (Exs. 1-2) filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/17/2012. (Moore, David)
August 30, 2012 Filing 385 MOTION to Stay of the Proceedings - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, David)
August 30, 2012 Filing 384 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding responsive discovery dispute letter - re 382 Letter,. (Horwitz, Richard)
August 30, 2012 Filing 383 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard R. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding response to Google's August 29, 2012 Letter (D.I.381) - re 381 Letter. (Louden, Karen)
August 29, 2012 Filing 382 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding to address the matters set forth in the Court's August 21, 2012 Oral Order setting the August 31, 2012 conference - re 379 Order Setting Teleconference,,,. (Louden, Karen)
August 29, 2012 Filing 381 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding issues to be discussed at the upcoming August 31, 2012 teleconference - re 379 Order Setting Teleconference,,,. (Horwitz, Richard)
August 24, 2012 Filing 380 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Third Supplemental Responses To Defendant Google, Inc.'s Second Set Of Interrogatories (No. 28) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' recent letters (D.I. 369, 371, 372, 374, 376, 378), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hold a teleconference on August 31, 2012, beginning at 2:30 p.m., to address Google's request to strike PUM's supplemental expert report, whether to extend the date for Google's rebuttal expert report, page limitations for summary judgment briefing, whether to set a trial date, and other matters relating to the status of this case. In preparation for the teleconference, each party may file a letter of up to 3 pages on August 29 and a responsive letter of up to 2 pages on August 30 addressing the issues that will be the subject of the teleconference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/21/12. (ntl)
August 21, 2012 Filing 378 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding Plaintiff's request for a trial date and case status - re 371 Letter, 369 Letter. (Moore, David)
August 21, 2012 Filing 377 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding response to Google Inc.'s August 17, 2012 Letter - re 374 Letter. (Louden, Karen)
August 21, 2012 Filing 376 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding response to Google Inc.'s August 17, 2012 letter - re 374 Letter. (Louden, Karen) (rpg). Modified on 8/21/2012 (rpg).
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Google's letter of August 17, 2012 (D.I. 374 ) no later than 12:00 noon tomorrow, August 21, 2012. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/20/12. (ntl)
August 17, 2012 Filing 374 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore regarding request for alternate discovery dispute hearing date. (Moore, David)
August 10, 2012 Filing 373 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Expert Witness Report of Michael J. Pazzani by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 2, 2012 Filing 372 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Response to Google's July 31, 2012 letter opposing P.U.M's request that a pretrial conference and trial date be set - re 371 Letter. (Louden, Karen)
July 31, 2012 Filing 371 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore regarding response to PUM's request for a trial date - re 369 Letter. (Moore, David)
July 31, 2012 Filing 370 NOTICE OF SERVICE of GOOGLE'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF P.U.M.'S JULY 17, 2012 NOTICE OF RULE 30(B)(6) DEPOSITION OF GOOGLE INC. by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
July 27, 2012 Filing 369 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding requesting trial date. (Louden, Karen)
July 17, 2012 Filing 368 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Google. Inc. by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 367 Stipulation Regarding Discovery Schedule -- Dispositive Motions due by 11/7/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/16/12. (ntl)
July 13, 2012 Filing 367 Joint STIPULATION Discovery Schedule [Stipulation Regarding Discovery Schedule] by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP. (Louden, Karen)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 366 Stipulation Regarding Expert Discovery Schedule: Dispositive Motions due by 9/17/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/15/12. (ntl)
June 12, 2012 Filing 366 STIPULATION REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY SCHEDULE re 359 SO ORDERED, Set Deadlines, 104 SO ORDERED, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,, 353 Stipulation, 32 Scheduling Order, by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
April 12, 2012 Filing 365 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Witness Report of Michael J. Pazzani by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 364 SO ORDERED, re 363 Stipulation Regarding Expert Discovery Schedule filed by Google Inc. -- Dispositive Motions due by 9/12/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/9/12. (ntl)
April 6, 2012 Filing 363 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Expert Discovery Deadline re 359 SO ORDERED, Set Deadlines, 104 SO ORDERED, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,, 353 Stipulation, 32 Scheduling Order, by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
April 5, 2012 Filing 362 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nineteenth Supplemental Response to Defendant Google Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 11) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 3, 2012 Filing 361 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO GOOGLE (NOS. 12, 19-22, 36) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
March 30, 2012 Filing 360 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Brian Howard formerly of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Moore, David)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 359 SO ORDERED, re 358 Amended Stipulation Regarding Expert Discovery Schedule filed by Google Inc. -- Dispositive Motions due by 9/7/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/28/12. (ntl)
March 26, 2012 Filing 358 Amended STIPULATION Regarding Expert Discovery Schedule re 104 SO ORDERED, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,, 353 Stipulation, 32 Scheduling Order, by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
March 22, 2012 Filing 357 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order Re Expert Discovery STIPULATION REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY SCHEDULE by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 28, 2012 Filing 356 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google's Third Supplemental Objections and Responses to Fourth Set of Interrogatories (No. 24) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
February 27, 2012 Filing 355 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on February 1, 2012 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2012. (bpg)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER As a result of separate discussions with counsel for the parties, the mediation scheduled for 2/15/2012 at 10:30 AM with Judge Thynge is cancelled. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/10/2012. (cak)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 353 Stipulation Regarding Expert Discovery Schedule filed by Google Inc. -- Dispositive Motions due by 8/20/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/1/12. (ntl)
February 1, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 2/1/2012. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
February 1, 2012 Filing 353 STIPULATION Regarding Expert Discovery Schedule by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Status Teleconference scheduled for 2/1/12 at 4:30 PM shall hereby begin at 4:45 PM on 2/1/12. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/27/12. (ntl)
January 26, 2012 Remark: Opinion (D.I. 347 ) unsealed on 1/26/12. (ntl)
January 25, 2012 Filing 351 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Court's Oral Order - re 349 Order,, 347 Opinion. (Louden, Karen)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status teleconference has been scheduled for February 1, 2012 at 4:30 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4573. No further submissions are needed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/25/12. (ntl)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: Because the Opinion released on January 25, 2012 (D.I. 347) may contain confidential information, it has been released under seal, pending review by the parties to allow them to submit a single jointly proposed redacted version of the Opinion. Such redacted version shall be submitted no later than February 1, 2012 for review by the Court. The Court will subsequently file a publicly-available version of its Opinion. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/25/12. (ntl)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER re 347 Opinion re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/25/12. (ntl)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 347 OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/25/12. (ntl) (Main Document 347 unsealed and replaced on 1/26/2012) (ntl). Modified on 1/26/2012 (ntl).
January 24, 2012 Filing 346 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Roy Twersky on January 26, 2012 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
January 24, 2012 Filing 345 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yochai Konig on January 26, 2012 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
January 23, 2012 Filing 344 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Fourth Set of Interrogatories (No. 24) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
January 18, 2012 Filing 343 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Sixth Set of Interrogatories to Google (No. 38) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER Setting Teleconference (Karen Jacobs-Louden, Esquire to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 1/12/2012 at 04:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss the mediation scheduled for 2/22/2012 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/9/2012. (cak)
December 23, 2011 Filing 341 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Second Supplemental Responses to Google Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 14-19, 22-27) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Louden, Karen)
December 23, 2011 Filing 340 REDACTED VERSION of 336 Answer to Amended Complaint, (GOOGLE INC.'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGE MENT AND GOOGLE INC.'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS AGAINST PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP AND YOCHAI KONIG) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-L)(Moore, David)
December 23, 2011 Filing 339 REDACTED VERSION of 335 Exhibit to a Document, (GOOGLE INC.'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGE MENT AND GOOGLE INC.'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS AGAINST PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP AND YOCHAI KONIG) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-L)(Moore, David)
December 22, 2011 Filing 338 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Sixth Supplemental Responses To Defendant Google, Inc.'s Second Set Of Interrogatories (Nos. 17-24) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 16, 2011 Filing 337 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Sixth Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Google, Inc. (No. 38) by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 16, 2011 Filing 336 SEALED ANSWER re: 335 to Amended Complaint ANSWER to 39 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand (GOOGLE INC.'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND GOOGLE INC.'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS AGAINST PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP AND YOCHAI KONIG) by Google Inc..(Moore, David) Modified on 12/23/2011 (rbe).
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 334 (STIPULATION FOR LEAVE FOR GOOGLE INC. TO FILE SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS.) Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/16/2011. (rpg)
December 15, 2011 Filing 335 SEALED EXHIBIT re 334 Stipulation for Leave for Google Inc. to File Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims (GOOGLE INC.'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND GOOGLE INC.'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS AGAINST PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP AND YOCHAI KONIG) by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 15, 2011 Filing 334 STIPULATION (STIPULATION FOR LEAVE FOR GOOGLE INC. TO FILE SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS) by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 5, 2011 Filing 333 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.s Eighteenth Supplemental Responses To Defendant Google, Inc.s First Set Of Interrogatories (Nos. 9-11) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 1, 2011 Filing 332 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Objections and Responses to PUM's October 18, 2011 Amended Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Google Inc. (Highly Confidential - Outside Counsel Only) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: The mediation has been rescheduled to 2/22/2012 at 10:30 AM with Judge Thynge. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/26/2011. (cak)
October 18, 2011 Filing 330 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Google, Inc. on November 3, 2011 by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 18, 2011 Filing 329 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff P.U.M.'s January 20, 2011 Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Google, Inc. (Topic 5) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
October 12, 2011 Filing 328 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Counter-Defendants Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s and Yochai Konig's Second Supplemental Responses to Counter-Claimant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1, 3), and (2) Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Fifth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 33) by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 21, 2011 Filing 327 REDACTED VERSION of 325 Reply Brief REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, L.L.P.'S ALTERNATIVE CROSS-MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE LEVINO LTD. AS PLAINTIFF by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 [redacted])(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 19, 2011 Filing 326 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Supplemental Objections and Responses to PUM's First Set of Interrogatories by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
September 19, 2011 NOTICE: Per Judge Stark's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and one (1) copy of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office one (1) copy of D.I. # 325. (ntl)
September 16, 2011 Filing 325 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 309 Cross MOTION -- Alternative Cross-Motion for Leave to Substitute Levino Ltd. as Plaintiff filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Louden, Karen)
September 14, 2011 Filing 324 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 29 and 32); and 2) Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Seventeenth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 3) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 323 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Personalized User Model, L.L.P. to File a Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Leave to Substitute Levino Ltd. as Plaintiff to September 16, 2011 filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Google Inc., Set Briefing Schedule: re 309 -- Alternative Cross-Motion for Leave to Substitute Levino Ltd. as Plaintiff (Reply Brief due 9/16/2011). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/9/11. (ntl)
September 8, 2011 Filing 323 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Personalized User Model, L.L.P. to File a Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Leave to Substitute Levino Ltd. as Plaintiff to September 16, 2011 - filed by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 6, 2011 Filing 322 REDACTED VERSION of 320 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply), Brief (Combined Answering and Reply), Brief (Combined Answering and Reply), Brief (Combined Answering and Reply) (GOOGLE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND OPPOSITION TO PUM'S CROSS-MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBSTITUTE LEVINO AS PLAINTIFF) re 309 Cross MOTION -- Alternative Cross-Motion for Leave to Substitute Levino Ltd. as Plaintiff, 301 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter [GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S PATENT IN FRINGEMENT CLAIMS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION] by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-11)(Moore, David)
August 30, 2011 Filing 321 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Second Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 25-28) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 29, 2011 Filing 320 BRIEF (Combined Answering and Reply) (GOOGLE'S SEALED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND OPPOSITION TO PUM'S CROSS-MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBSTITUTE LEVINO AS PLAINTIFF) re 309 Cross MOTION -- Alternative Cross-Motion for Leave to Substitute Levino Ltd. as Plaintiff, 301 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter [GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S PATENT INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter [GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S PATENT INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION] filed by Google Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/9/2011. (Moore, David)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 319 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Unopposed) filed by Personalized User Model LLP. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/29/11. (ntl)
August 26, 2011 Filing 319 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Unopposed) - filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
August 23, 2011 Filing 318 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff PUM's January 20, 2011 Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Google, Inc. by Google Inc..(Horwitz, Richard)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 317 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Google to file a reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss PUM's Patent Infringement Claims for Lack of Subject Matter to August 29, 2011 -- Set Briefing Schedule: re 301 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter (Reply Brief due 8/29/2011). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/23/11. (ntl)
August 22, 2011 Filing 317 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Google to file a reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss PUM's Patent Infringement Claims for Lack of Subject Matter to August 29, 2011 - filed by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
August 19, 2011 Filing 316 Official Transcript of Telephone Confererence held on July 27, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/9/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2011. (bpg)
August 19, 2011 NOTICE: Per Judge Stark's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and one (1) copy of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. # 310. (ntl)
August 18, 2011 Filing 315 REDACTED VERSION of 311 Declaration, of Guy Yonay by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Tigan, Jeremy)
August 18, 2011 Filing 314 REDACTED VERSION of 312 Declaration, of Robert Needham by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Tigan, Jeremy)
August 18, 2011 Filing 313 REDACTED VERSION of 310 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), Brief (Combined Opening and Answering) by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Tigan, Jeremy)
August 12, 2011 Filing 312 SEALED DECLARATION re 310 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), Brief (Combined Opening and Answering) -- Declaration of Robert Needham -- by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Louden, Karen)
August 12, 2011 Filing 311 SEALED DECLARATION re 310 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), Brief (Combined Opening and Answering) -- Declaration of Guy Yonay -- by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Louden, Karen)
August 12, 2011 Filing 310 BRIEF (Combined Opening and Answering) (SEALED) re 309 Cross MOTION -- Alternative Cross-Motion for Leave to Substitute Levino Ltd. as Plaintiff, 301 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter [GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S PATENT INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter [GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S PATENT INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION] filed by Personalized User Model LLP.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/29/2011. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/22/2011. (Louden, Karen)
August 12, 2011 Filing 309 Cross MOTION -- Alternative Cross-Motion for Leave to Substitute Levino Ltd. as Plaintiff - filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Louden, Karen)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark: Having reviewed in camera the letter submitted by Plaintiff (D.I. 307 ) pursuant to the Court's Order of July 29, 2011 (D.I. 305 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's request for production of Privileged Document 15 (PRIV 993) is DENIED. Plaintiff has met its burden to prove that the document is privileged and need not be produced due to waiver. (rpg)
August 2, 2011 Filing 308 REDACTED VERSION of 302 Opening Brief in Support,, re 301 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter [GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S PATENT INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION] by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Moore, David)
August 1, 2011 Filing 307 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding enclosing a [confidential] letter explaining the basis for Privileged Document 15 (PRIV 993) to remain privileged - re 305 Order. (Louden, Karen)
August 1, 2011 Filing 306 REDACTED VERSION of 298 Letter from Jeremy A. Tigan to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark re discovery dispute by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER re 303 in camera review of documents. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/29/11. (ntl)
July 28, 2011 Filing 304 REDACTED VERSION of 296 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark regarding discovery dispute by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Horwitz, Richard)
July 28, 2011 Filing 303 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding submission of documents for in camera review per the Court's direction - re Discovery Conference. (Louden, Karen)
July 27, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 7/27/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
July 26, 2011 Filing 302 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re 301 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter [GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S PATENT INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter [GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S PATENT INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION] with Exhibits A-D filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/12/2011. (Moore, David)
July 26, 2011 Filing 301 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter [GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S PATENT INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION] - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, David)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 300 Stipulation Regarding Documentary Evidence. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/26/11. (ntl)
July 25, 2011 Filing 300 STIPULATION Regarding Documentary Evidence by Personalized User Model LLP. (Louden, Karen)
July 25, 2011 Filing 299 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena upon Kemal Sonmez by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
July 22, 2011 Filing 298 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding discovery dispute - re 290 Order on Motion for Leave to File,. (Tigan, Jeremy)
July 21, 2011 Filing 297 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 24-26, 28-29) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
July 21, 2011 Filing 296 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding discovery dispute. (Horwitz, Richard)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER Setting Teleconference : A Discovery Teleconference is set for 7/27/2011 at 03:15 PM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/15/11. (ntl)
July 8, 2011 Filing 294 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on June 29, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2011. (bpg)
July 8, 2011 Filing 293 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Konig on July 8, 2011 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
July 1, 2011 Filing 292 REDACTED VERSION of 289 Letter to Hon. Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Discovery Teleconference by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H)(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 30, 2011 Filing 291 REDACTED VERSION of 288 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding discovery dispute by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I)(Moore, David)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORAL ORDER: For the reasons set forth by the Court during the teleconference today, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Google's 196 Motion for Leave to File an early summary judgment motion is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/29/11. (ntl)
June 29, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 6/29/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
June 24, 2011 Filing 289 SEALED Letter to Hon. Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Discovery Teleconference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H)(Louden, Karen) Modified on 6/24/2011 (nms).
June 24, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. 289 was amended to reflect the filing is under seal. (nms)
June 23, 2011 Filing 288 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding discovery dispute. (Moore, David)
June 23, 2011 Filing 287 Letter to Hon. Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Discovery Teleconference. (Louden, Karen)
June 17, 2011 Filing 286 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Google (No. 15) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
June 16, 2011 Filing 285 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena upon Andreas Stolcke by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Discovery Teleconference is set for 6/29/2011 at 03:15 PM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/13/11. (ntl)
June 10, 2011 Filing 283 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Google (No. 13) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
June 6, 2011 Filing 282 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Admission (No. 11), Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Google (Nos. 7, 11, 13, 15), Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories to Google (Nos. 16) and Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Google (No. 32) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
June 6, 2011 Filing 281 STATEMENT re 276 Statement, Personalized User Model LLP's Response To Local Rule 7.1.2 (B) Notice Of Supplemental Intrinsic Evidence For Defendant Google Inc.'s Claim Construction Briefs by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Louden, Karen)
June 6, 2011 Filing 280 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jack Banks on June 7, 2011 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
June 3, 2011 Filing 279 NOTICE of Issuance of Amended Subpoena upon Technology, Patents & Licensing, Inc. by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
June 3, 2011 Filing 278 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Objections and Responses to PUM's Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Google, Inc. by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
June 3, 2011 Filing 277 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas on Arti Goswamy and Technology, Patents & Licensing, Inc. by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Moore, David)
June 1, 2011 Filing 276 STATEMENT re 116 Claim Construction Opening Brief, 131 Claim Construction Answering Brief [LOCAL RULE 7.1.2(b) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTRINSIC EVIDENCE FOR DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFS] by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Moore, David)
May 31, 2011 Filing 275 REDACTED VERSION of 256 Transcript of Telephone Conference held on April 6, 2011 before Judge Stark. by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
May 26, 2011 Filing 274 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena on Utopy Inc. by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 273 Stipulation and Order to Seal Hearing Transcript 256 . Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/20/11. (ntl)
May 20, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: Transcript at D.I. 256 placed under seal per Stipulation and Order at D.I. [273}. (ntl)
May 20, 2011 Remark: Regarding the sealed transcript at D.I. 256, a redacted version shall be submitted within 7 days, in accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means. (ntl)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 273 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SEAL HEARING TRANSCRIPT re 256 Transcript, by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 272 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to complete all fact discovery to June 10, 2011 (Discovery due by 6/10/2011). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/16/11. (ntl)
May 13, 2011 Filing 272 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to complete all fact discovery to June 10, 2011 - filed by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
May 13, 2011 Filing 271 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Fourth Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Google (No. 13) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
May 13, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christian E. Samay for Personalized User Model LLP added for electronic noticing. (els)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: Mediation Conference rescheduled for 10/25/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/12/2011. (cak) (Main Document 270 replaced on 5/12/2011) (cak).
May 12, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: Replaced DI 270 with correct version of the Order. (cak)
May 9, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Telephone Conference held on 5/9/2011. (Court Reporter from Deposition.) (rpg)
May 4, 2011 Filing 269 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas on Intellectual Ventures Management LLC by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Moore, David)
May 4, 2011 Filing 268 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mr. Philip Black on May 6, 2011 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
May 4, 2011 Filing 267 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Fourth Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
May 3, 2011 Filing 266 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena upon Philip D. Black by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
May 2, 2011 Filing 265 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sixteenth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 14) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 2, 2011 Filing 264 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Supplemental Responses and Objections to PUM's Third Set of Interrogatories (No. 18) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
May 2, 2011 Filing 263 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Google (No. 32-33) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
May 2, 2011 Filing 262 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Roy Twersky on May 5, 2011 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
May 2, 2011 Filing 261 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Yochai Konig on May 4, 2011 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
April 29, 2011 Filing 260 NOTICE OF SERVICE of ) Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Fifth Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26; 2) Counter-Defendants Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s and Yochai Konig's First Supplemental Responses to Counter-Claimant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1, 3) and 3) Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Second Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 33-34) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 29, 2011 Filing 259 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas upon Doron Aspitz and Kemal Sonmez by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
April 28, 2011 Filing 258 REDACTED VERSION of 257 Notice (Other) of Subpoenas by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 28, 2011 Filing 257 SEALED NOTICE of Subpoenas by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 and 2)(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 28, 2011 Filing 256 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on April 6, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2011. (bpg)
April 28, 2011 Filing 255 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Fifth Set of Interrogatories to Google (No. 37) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
April 26, 2011 Filing 254 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Google Inc. (Adwords/YouTube) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 25, 2011 Filing 253 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Fifteenth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 9-11); (2) Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s First Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 17-29, 32); and (3) Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Supplemental Responses to Google, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-33) by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 25, 2011 Filing 252 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Response to PUM's Second Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 6-29, 36-38) and Google's Objections and Responses to PUM's Fourth Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 19-31, 34-36) by Google Inc..(Horwitz, Richard)
April 25, 2011 Filing 251 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Rodger D. Smith regarding Response to Google's April 20, 2011 Letter - re 250 Letter. (Smith, Rodger)
April 20, 2011 Filing 250 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding Case Status. (Horwitz, Richard)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 249 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for fact discovery cut-off to May 13, 2011 (Discovery due by 5/13/2011). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/19/11. (ntl)
April 18, 2011 Filing 249 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for fact discovery cut-off to May 13, 2011 - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 244 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christian E. Samay filed by Konig Yochai, Personalized User Model LLP, 246 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew P. Larson filed by Konig Yochai, Personalized User Model LLP. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/13/11. (ntl)
April 12, 2011 Filing 248 REDACTED VERSION of 232 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding response to Google's letter of March 31, 2011 by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 12, 2011 Filing 247 REDACTED VERSION of 228 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding discovery dispute by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-11)(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 12, 2011 Filing 246 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew P. Larson - filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 12, 2011 Filing 245 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 30-35) and Defendant Google Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Google (Nos. 32-33) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
April 12, 2011 Filing 244 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christian E. Samay - filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Louden, Karen)
April 11, 2011 Filing 243 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Counter-Defendant Yochai Konig's Responses to Counter-Claimant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission; and 2) Counter-Defendants Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s and Yochai Konig's Responses to Counter-Claimant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5) by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 8, 2011 Filing 242 REDACTED VERSION of 233 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding responsive discovery dispute letter by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H)(Horwitz, Richard)
April 7, 2011 Filing 241 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Craig Sosin on April 22, 2011 by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 7, 2011 Filing 240 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yair Kurzion on April 20, 2011 by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 7, 2011 Filing 239 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Google, Inc. by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 7, 2011 Filing 238 REDACTED VERSION of 229 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding discovery dispute by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-J)(Horwitz, Richard)
April 6, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 4/6/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
April 5, 2011 Filing 237 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena upon Kemal Sonmez by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
April 5, 2011 Filing 236 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding discovery dispute for April 6 teleconference - re 232 Letter, 229 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Horwitz, Richard)
April 4, 2011 Filing 235 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Google (No. 12) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
April 1, 2011 Filing 234 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Fourteenth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 3-4, 14) by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 1, 2011 Filing 233 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding responsive discovery dispute letter - re 228 Letter. (Horwitz, Richard)
April 1, 2011 Filing 232 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding response to Google's letter of March 31, 2011 - re 229 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 31, 2011 Filing 231 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Fourth Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 31, 2011 Filing 230 SEALED DECLARATION re 228 Letter Declaration Of Michael J. Pazzani by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 31, 2011 Filing 229 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding discovery dispute. (Horwitz, Richard)
March 31, 2011 Filing 228 SEALED Letter to Hon. Leonard P. Stark from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-11)(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 28, 2011 Filing 227 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Fifth Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Google, Inc. (No. 37) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 24, 2011 Filing 226 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission (No. 1-5) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
March 21, 2011 Filing 225 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for fact discovery cut-off to April 29, 2011 - filed by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 225 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for fact discovery cut-off to April 29, 2011 (Discovery due by 4/29/2011). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/21/11. (ntl)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 219 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Margaret Pirnie Kammerud of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Sullivan, LLP filed by Google Inc., 221 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert Needham filed by Konig Yochai, Personalized User Model LLP. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/17/11. (ntl)
March 16, 2011 Filing 224 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s and Yochai Konig's Objections and Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6); and 2) Responses and Objections of Third Party Utopy, Inc. to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 16, 2011 Filing 223 REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re DI 196 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File [DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ITS BREACH OF CONTRACT COUNTERCLAIM, ITS DECLARATION OF OWNERSHIP COUNTERCLAIM, AND ITS AFFIRMATIVE DEFEN SE OF LACK OF STANDING (Exs. A-C)] filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)(Moore, David)
March 16, 2011 Filing 222 REDACTED VERSION of 215 Response to Motion Personalized User Model L.L.P.'s Opposition to Google, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 16, 2011 Filing 221 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert Needham - filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai. (Louden, Karen)
March 16, 2011 Filing 220 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Objections and Responses to P.U.M.'s January 20, 2011 and January 21, 2011 Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Google, Inc. by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
March 15, 2011 Filing 219 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Margaret Pirnie Kammerud of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Sullivan, LLP - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
March 15, 2011 Filing 218 REDACTED VERSION of 217 Answer to Counterclaim, Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s and Counter-Defendants' Reply to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Amended Counterclaims by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 216 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua Lee Sohn of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Sullivan, LLP filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/14/11. (ntl)
March 11, 2011 Filing 217 SEALED ANSWER to 180 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s And Counter-Defendants Reply To Defendant Google, Inc.'s Amended Counterclaims by Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai.(Louden, Karen)
March 11, 2011 Filing 216 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua Lee Sohn of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Sullivan, LLP - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
March 10, 2011 Filing 215 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion -- Personalized User Model LLP's Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment -- filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6)(Louden, Karen)
March 9, 2011 Filing 214 NOTICE of Subpoena of SRI International by Personalized User Model LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 8, 2011 Filing 213 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Cedric DuPont on March 18, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 8, 2011 Filing 212 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jonathan Alferness on March 24, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 7, 2011 Filing 211 Order Setting Teleconference: Discovery Teleconference set for 4/6/2011 02:45 PM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/7/11. (ntl)
March 7, 2011 Filing 210 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on February 22, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2011. (bpg)
March 3, 2011 Filing 209 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 17-35); and 2) Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-35) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 3, 2011 Filing 208 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Response to Third Set of Requests for Production (No. 65) and Google's Response to Fourth Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 66-69) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
March 1, 2011 Filing 207 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Amended Second Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Google, Inc. (Nos. 6-38) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 1, 2011 Filing 206 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Eugene Novikov of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with firm. (Moore, David)
February 28, 2011 Filing 205 REDACTED VERSION [DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ITS BREACH OF CONTRACT COUNTERCLAIM, ITS DECLARATION OF OWNERSHIP COUNTERCLAIM, AND ITS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF LACK OF STANDING (Exs. A-C)] by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, Tab 1-24, # 3 Exhibit B, Tab 25, # 4 Exhibit B, Tab 26, # 5 Exhibit B, Tab 27, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, David)
February 28, 2011 Filing 204 REDACTED VERSION of 195 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding responsive discovery dispute letter by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Moore, David)
February 28, 2011 Filing 203 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Counter-Claimant Google Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Counter-Defendants Personalized User Model LLP and Yochai Konig; Counter-Claimant Google Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission to Counter-Defendant Yochai Konig; and Defendant Google Inc.'s Third Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Personalized User Model LLP by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
February 25, 2011 Filing 202 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Second Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Google, Inc. (Nos. 6-95) and Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Google, Inc. (Nos. 19-36) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 24, 2011 Filing 201 REDACTED VERSION of 193 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding opening dispute letter by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8)(Horwitz, Richard)
February 24, 2011 Filing 200 REDACTED VERSION of 194 Letter by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 24, 2011 Filing 199 REDACTED VERSION of 192 Declaration, by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 24, 2011 Filing 198 REDACTED VERSION of 191 Letter by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9)(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 23, 2011 Filing 197 NOTICE of Subpoena (Taher Haveliwala) by Personalized User Model LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 22, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 2/22/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
February 21, 2011 Filing 196 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File [DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ITS BREACH OF CONTRACT COUNTERCLAIM, ITS DECLARATION OF OWNERSHIP COUNTERCLAIM, AND ITS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF LACK OF STANDING (Exs. A-C)] - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 21, 2011 Filing 195 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding responsive discovery dispute letter - re 191 Letter. (Horwitz, Richard)
February 21, 2011 Filing 194 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Plaintiff's opposition to Google's 2-18-11 discovery dispute letter - re 193 Letter. (Louden, Karen)
February 18, 2011 Filing 193 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding opening dispute letter (Exs. 1-8). (Horwitz, Richard)
February 18, 2011 Filing 192 SEALED DECLARATION re 191 Letter -- Declaration of Michael J. Pazzani in Support of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Letter Regarding Request for Inspection of Google, Inc.'s Source Code Repository -- by Personalized User Model LLP. (Louden, Karen)
February 18, 2011 Filing 191 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding discovery disputes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9)(Louden, Karen)
February 16, 2011 Filing 190 Order Setting Discovery Teleconference: Discovery Telephone Conference set for 2/22/2011 10:00 AM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. ( Please see Order for details regarding letter submissions ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/16/2011. (rpg)
February 14, 2011 Filing 189 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Google Inc.. Konig Yochai served on 2/7/2011, answer due 2/28/2011. (Moore, David)
February 11, 2011 Filing 188 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Personalized User Model LLP Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) on TBD by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
February 11, 2011 Filing 187 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena upon Utopy Inc. by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
February 10, 2011 Filing 186 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Google Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
February 10, 2011 Filing 185 REDACTED VERSION of 180 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, 178 Exhibit to a Document, [GOOGLE INC.'S AMENDED ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PERSONLAIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND GOOGLE INC.'S AMENDED CO UNTERCLAIMS AGAINST PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP AND YOCHAI KONIG] by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-L)(Moore, David)
February 9, 2011 Filing 184 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Thirteenth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 8, 2011 Filing 183 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Amended Objections and Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 7, 2011 Filing 182 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections of Third Party Doron Aspitz to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Amended Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 7, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model LLP's Objections and Responses to Defendant Google Inc.'s Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 7, 2011 Summons Issued as to Konig Yochai on 2/7/2011. (els)
February 4, 2011 Filing 180 SEALED AMENDED ANSWER to 48 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM [GOOGLE INC.'S AMENDED ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PERSONLAIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND GOOGLE INC.'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS AGAINST PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP AND YOCHAI KONIG] against Personalized User Model LLP, Konig Yochai by Google Inc.. (Moore, David) Modified on 2/11/2011 (rwc).
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 179 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order re discovery; 177 Stipulation for leave for Google Inc. to file amended answer and counterclaims. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/4/11. (ntl)
February 3, 2011 Filing 179 STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER re 32 Scheduling Order, by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 3, 2011 Filing 178 SEALED EXHIBIT re 177 Stipulation for Google Inc. to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims [GOOGLE INC.'S AMENDED ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND GOOGLE INC.'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS AGAINST PERSONALIZED USER MODEL, LLP AND YOCHAI KONIG (Exs. A-L)] by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 3, 2011 Filing 177 STIPULATION [STIPULATION FOR LEAVE FOR GOOGLE INC. TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS] by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 2, 2011 Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Google, Inc. by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 2, 2011 Filing 175 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas upon Onn Brandman by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
January 31, 2011 Filing 174 NOTICE of Subpoena of Glen M. Jeh by Personalized User Model LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 171 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for fact discovery cut-off to March 31, 2011 -- Discovery due by 3/31/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/31/11. (ntl)
January 27, 2011 Filing 173 NOTICE of SUBPOENA TO ONN BRANDMAN, SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 17, 2011, WITH SUBPOENA AND EXHIBIT A ATTACHED by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
January 26, 2011 Filing 172 REDACTED VERSION of 161 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Claim Construction by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit [REDACTED] A-D)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 26, 2011 Filing 171 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for fact discovery cut-off to March 31, 2011 - filed by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
January 24, 2011 Filing 170 Official Transcript of Claim Construction Hearing held on January 11, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/24/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2011. (bpg)
January 21, 2011 Filing 169 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Google, Inc. (Nos. 1-5), and 2) Fourth Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Google, Inc. (Nos. 66-69) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 21, 2011 Filing 168 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Google, Inc. on February 25, 2011 by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 21, 2011 Filing 167 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rebecca Illowsky on February 8, 2011 by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 21, 2011 Filing 166 NOTICE of Subpoena of SRI International by Personalized User Model LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 21, 2011 Filing 165 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's First Set of Requests for Admission, Google's Second Set of Requests for Admission, Google's Second Set of Interrogatories, and Google's Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
January 21, 2011 Filing 164 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena on Doron Aspitz by Google Inc. (Horwitz, Richard)
January 21, 2011 Filing 163 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding PUM 1/19/2011 letter to the Court - re 161 Letter. (Horwitz, Richard)
January 20, 2011 Filing 162 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Google, Inc. and (2) Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Third Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Google, Inc. (No. 65) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 19, 2011 Filing 161 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding claim construction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(Louden, Karen)
January 19, 2011 Filing 160 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore regarding claim construction - re 156 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Moore, David)
January 18, 2011 Filing 159 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO GOOGLE (NO. 13) re 102 Notice of Service by Google Inc.. Related document: 102 Notice of Service filed by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: Mediation Conference set for 5/10/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/14/11. (cak)
January 13, 2011 Filing 157 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Objections to Plaintiff P.U.M's First Request for Inspection by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORAL ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the joint request to extend time to file the post Markman hearing submissions to January 19, 2011 is GRANTED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/13/11. (ntl)
January 11, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Markman Hearing held on 1/11/2011. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (rpg)
January 10, 2011 Filing 155 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections of Third Party Cooley LLP. To Defendant Google, Inc.'s Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 10, 2011 Filing 154 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO GOOGLE (NO. 18) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
January 7, 2011 Filing 153 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding technical tutorial in DVD format. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 6, 2011 Filing 152 PROPOSED ORDER requesting permission to bring electronic devices to January 11, 2011 hearing by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 J. Tigan Letter to M. Looby)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 6, 2011 Filing 151 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Personalized User Model LLP by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
January 5, 2011 Filing 150 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Upcoming Markman Hearing. (Louden, Karen)
January 5, 2011 Filing 149 STATEMENT re 141 Notice (Other) P.U.M.'S Response To Google's Notice Of Supplemental Authority Relating To Claim Construction Briefs by Personalized User Model LLP. (Louden, Karen)
December 27, 2010 Filing 148 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Google, Inc. by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 23, 2010 Filing 147 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Aitan Weinberg on February 2, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 23, 2010 Filing 146 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Greg Friedman on January 31, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 23, 2010 Filing 145 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Oren Zamir on January 27, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 23, 2010 Filing 144 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Uygar Oztekin on January 25, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 23, 2010 Filing 143 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Glen Jeh on January 21, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 23, 2010 Filing 142 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Berthold on January 23, 2010 by Google Inc..(Horwitz, Richard)
December 23, 2010 Filing 141 NOTICE of (LOCAL RULE 7.1.2(b) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY FOR DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFS) by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Horwitz, Richard)
December 22, 2010 Filing 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Third Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26; and 2) Responses and Objections of Third Party Ari Gal to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 21, 2010 Filing 139 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas on Cooley Godward Kronish LLP and SRI International by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
December 21, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of counsel, the REDACTED VERSION of 131 Claim Construction Answering Brief by Google Inc (D.I. 138) has been deleted and replaced with a color version. (fms)
December 20, 2010 Filing 138 REDACTED VERSION of 131 Claim Construction Answering Brief by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Compliance G-H)(Moore, David) (Main Document 138 replaced on 12/21/2010) (fms).
December 20, 2010 Filing 137 REDACTED VERSION of 133 Declaration of Jennifer D. Bennett in Support of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-12)(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 20, 2010 Filing 136 REDACTED VERSION of 132 Claim Construction Answering Brief by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 17, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: a complete copy of D.I. 135 added to the entry per request of counsel. (ntl)
December 16, 2010 Filing 135 NOTICE of Issuance of Amended Subpoena upon Doron Aspitz by Google Inc. (Moore, David) (ntl).
December 15, 2010 Filing 134 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas upon Doron Aspitz and Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
December 13, 2010 Filing 133 SEALED DECLARATION re 132 Claim Construction Answering Brief -- Declaration of Jennifer D. Bennett -- by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-12)(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 13, 2010 Filing 132 SEALED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re 116 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 13, 2010 Filing 131 SEALED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re 119 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER a meeting with counsel will occur on 1/11/11 with Judge Thynge, after completion of the Markman hearing, to discuss the extent and type of discovery regarding damages, if necessary, and scheduling mediation in the future after the Markman opinion. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/13/2010. (cak)
December 10, 2010 Filing 129 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Twelfth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 11) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 126 MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive claim construction briefs to 12/13/10. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/10/10. (ntl)
December 10, 2010 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrea P. Roberts for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. (nms)
December 9, 2010 Filing 128 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Request for Inspection by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 9, 2010 Filing 127 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andre Rohe on December 16, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 8, 2010 Filing 126 MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive claim construction briefs (UNOPPOSED MOTION) - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
December 8, 2010 Filing 125 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas on Ari Gal by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Moore, David)
December 7, 2010 Filing 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Google, Inc. (No. 18) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 1, 2010 Filing 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Eleventh Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1, 11) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 30, 2010 Filing 122 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Roy Twersky on December 3, 2010 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
November 30, 2010 Filing 121 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yochai Konig on December 2, 2010 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
November 22, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: the PDF documents to D.I. 116 were replaced per request of counsel (more legible color copies). (ntl)
November 17, 2010 Filing 120 DECLARATION re 119 Claim Construction Opening Brief -- Declaration of Jennifer D. Bennett -- by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-14)(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 17, 2010 Filing 119 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 17, 2010 Filing 118 APPENDIX re 116 Claim Construction Opening Brief [Appendix of Exhibits (Vol. II of II)] by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C part 1, # 2 Exhibit C part 2, # 3 Exhibit C part 3, # 4 Exhibit C part 4, # 5 Exhibit C part 5, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Moore, David)
November 17, 2010 Filing 117 APPENDIX re 116 Claim Construction Opening Brief [Appendix of Exhibits (Vol. I of II)] by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Moore, David)
November 17, 2010 Filing 116 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-D)(Moore, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2010: # 1 Appendix A-D) (ntl).
November 17, 2010 Filing 115 CLAIM Construction Chart by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION COMPARISON)(Moore, David)
November 17, 2010 Filing 114 Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 12/13/2010 at 3:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/16/2010. (cak)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 112 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrea Pallios Roberts of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/12/2010. (rpg)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 113 Stipulation to extend claim construction brief deadline and enlarge page limits filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Google Inc.: ( Opening Claim Construction Brief now due 11/17/2010. Page limit extension request granted ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/12/2010. (rpg)
November 10, 2010 Filing 113 STIPULATION Unopposed Motion, and Order Regarding Claim Construction Deadlines and Page Limit Extension re 104 SO ORDERED, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,, by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP. (Moore, David)
November 2, 2010 Filing 112 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrea Pallios Roberts of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
October 29, 2010 Filing 111 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Tenth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 3, 4, 7, 8, 14, 15) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 15, 2010 Filing 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Ninth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 11) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 11, 2010 Filing 109 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Eighth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 9) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 8, 2010 Filing 108 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Seventh Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 7, 2010 Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections of Third Party Utopy, Inc. to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 5, 2010 Filing 106 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections of Third Party Marek Alboszta to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 30, 2010 Filing 105 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Personalized User Model LLP (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 SO ORDERED, re 94 Proposed Amended Scheduling Order filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Google Inc. Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ( Claims Construction Opening Brief due by 11/12/2010. Answering Brief due 12/10/2010. Discovery due by 9/29/2010. Markman Hearing set for 1/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial set for TBD ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/30/2010. (rpg)
September 30, 2010 Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
September 30, 2010 Filing 102 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Third Supplemental Objections and Responses to PUM's First Set of Interrogatories (No. 13) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
September 27, 2010 Filing 101 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Square 1 Bank's Responses and Objections to Subpoena Issued By Google Inc. by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 23, 2010 Filing 100 NOTICE of Issuance of Amended Subpoenas upon Autonomy, Inc. and Utopy Inc. by Google Inc. re 98 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Moore, David)
September 23, 2010 Filing 98 NOTICE of of Issuance of Subpoenas on Utopy, Inc. and Autonomy, Inc. by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1), # 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2), # 3 Exhibit 1 (part 3), # 4 Exhibit 2 (part 1), # 5 Exhibit 2 (part 2), # 6 Exhibit 2 (part 3))(Moore, David)
September 21, 2010 Filing 99 CASE REFERRED to Judge Thynge for Mediation. (cak)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Case referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for purposes of exploring ADR ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/21/2010. (rpg)
September 21, 2010 Filing 96 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas upon Marek Alboszta and Katharina Schuster by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
September 20, 2010 Remark: all mediation proceedings, if any, before Judge Leonard P. Stark have been removed from the Court's calendar. (rpg)
September 15, 2010 Filing 95 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Sixth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 3, 7 and 9) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 15, 2010 Filing 94 PROPOSED ORDER Amended Scheduling Order re 32 Scheduling Order, Stipulated Amended Scheduling Order by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 13, 2010 Filing 93 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories to Google (Nos. 16-17) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
September 13, 2010 Filing 92 NOTICE of Issuance of Amended Subpoena upon Square 1 Bank, c/o Leah Webb by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
September 10, 2010 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 9, 2010 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Fifth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 9, 2010 Filing 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Google (No. 13) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
September 9, 2010 Filing 88 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on Wednesday, September 8, 2010 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/30/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2010. (bpg)
September 8, 2010 Filing 87 REDACTED VERSION of 82 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding response to Google's September 1, 2010 letter by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8)(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 8, 2010 Filing 86 REDACTED VERSION of 78 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Invalidity Contentions by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 7)(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 8, 2010 Filing 85 REDACTED VERSION of 77 Exhibit to a Document re 76 Letter (Volume II of II) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F part 2 - K)(Horwitz, Richard)
September 8, 2010 Filing 84 REDACTED VERSION of 76 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Discovery Dispute (Volume I of II) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F part 1)(Horwitz, Richard)
September 8, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 9/8/2010. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
September 3, 2010 Filing 83 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding responsive discovery dispute - re 78 Letter. (Horwitz, Richard)
September 3, 2010 Filing 82 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding response to Google's September 1, 2010 letter - re 76 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8)(Louden, Karen)
September 3, 2010 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s List Of Proposed Terms That It Contends Require Construction And Preliminary Proposed Constructions by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 75 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Nelson filed by Personalized User Model LLP. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/3/10. (ntl)
September 2, 2010 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s List of Proposed Terms That It Contends Require Construction And Preliminary Proposed Constructions by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 2, 2010 Filing 79 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas upon Blacksmith Capital I, LLC, Blacksmith Ventures I-A, L.P., Square 1 Bank, c/o Geoff Butner, and Pearl Cohen Zedek & Latzer LLP, c/o Zeev Pearl by Google Inc. (Moore, David)
September 1, 2010 Filing 78 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Invalidity Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 7)(Louden, Karen)
September 1, 2010 Filing 77 SEALED EXHIBIT re 76 Letter (Volume II of II, Exhibits F, Part 2, thru K) by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
September 1, 2010 Filing 76 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark (Volume 1 of II, Exhibits A-F, Part 1) from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Discovery Dispute. (Horwitz, Richard)
August 31, 2010 Filing 75 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Nelson - filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Louden, Karen)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/27/10: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a discovery teleconference is scheduled for September 8, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4573. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than September 2, 2010 at 3:00 p.m., any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than September 3, 2010 at 3:00 p.m., any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. A copy of the document(s) must be provided to the Judge within one (1) hour of e-filing the document(s). (ntl)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 74 Stipulation and Order to Amend Scheduling Order: Claims Construction Answering Brief due by 10/29/2010, Claims Construction Opening Brief due by 10/1/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/23/10. (ntl)
August 20, 2010 Filing 74 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order re 32 Scheduling Order, by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ron Jacobs on August 25, 2010 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yochai Konig on August 27, 2010 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Roy Twersky on August 31, 2010 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Salter on September 10, 2010 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rena Kaminsky on August 27, 2010 by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (ntl)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bryan Horling on September 20, 2010 by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Karthik Gopalratnam on September 10, 2010 by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Shankar Ponnekanti on October 8, 2010 by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Google, Inc. on September 10, 2010 by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Fourth Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 9-10) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Google, Inc. (Nos. 16-17) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to PUM's First Set of Interrogatories (No. 13) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Third Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 11) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 60 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian C. Howard of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Sullivan, LLP filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/9/2010. (nms)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian C. Howard of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Sullivan, LLP - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 9) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's Identification of Fact Witnesses by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Identification of Fact Witnesses by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 55 Stipulation and Order To Amend Scheduling Order, filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Google Inc., (Reset Deadlines: Claims Construction Answering Brief due by 10/22/2010, Claims Construction Opening Brief due by 9/17/2010)(see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/11/2010. (nms)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Google, Inc. on June 25, 2010 by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and Order to Amend Scheduling Order re 32 Scheduling Order, by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Personalized User Model, LLP's Second Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Google Inc. (Nos. 62-64) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents (No. 57) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ANSWER to 48 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-4, 6, 11) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: Mediation Conference set for 1/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/13/2010. (rpg)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Setting Mediation Telephone Conference: Mediation Telephone Conference set for 11/17/2010 11:00 AM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/13/2010. (rpg)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER to 39 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Personalized User Model LLP, by Google Inc..(Moore, David) Modified on 5/11/2010 (nms).
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Responses and Objections of Third Party Lumen Patent Firm, Inc., to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises; and 2) Responses and Objections of Third Party Schwegman, Lundberg & Woessner, P.A., to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Letter to The Honorable Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. from David E. Moore regarding response to PUM's letter of May 5, 2010 - re 43 Letter. (Moore, David)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'S Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Personalized User Model LLP by Google Inc..(Moore, David) Modified on 5/6/2010 (nms).
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Letter to Hon. Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding bifurcation - re 41 Letter. (Louden, Karen)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Second Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Google, Inc. (Nos. 62-64) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Letter to The Honorable Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Plaintiff's letter of April 22, 2010 - re 37 Letter. (Horwitz, Richard)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s First Supplemental Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Interrogatory Nos. 10 & 11 by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 39 has been removed from the docket, as it was docketed in error. (nms)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc.- filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(nms)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 33 Stipulation and Order requesting Leave to File an Amended Complaint, filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/22/2010. (nms)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 35 Stipulated Proposed Protective Order, filed by Personalized User Model LLP, Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/22/2010. (nms)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Letter to Hon. Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding bifurcation. (Louden, Karen)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of of Issuance of Subpoena on Lumen Patent Firm, Inc. and Schwegman, Lundberg & Woessner, P.A. by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Moore, David)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The PDF for D.I. 35 has been removed and replaced with an amended version per counsel's request. The new version corrects sub paragraph numbering on pages 11 and 14. (nms)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy) (nms).
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Setting Mediation Telephone Conference: Mediation Telephone Conference set for 5/12/2010 11:15 AM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/13/2010. (rpg)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Mediation. ( Notice is for Court Administrative Purposes only ). (rpg)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and Order Granting Leave to File Amended Complaint re 1 Complaint, by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (First Amended Complaint), # 2 Attachment A, # 3 Attachment B, # 4 Attachment C, # 5 Exhibit B (blackline version of complaint))(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent none for Google Inc... (Moore, David)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge Stark for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 4/15/2010. Amended Pleadings due by 7/16/2010. Fact Discovery due by 2/25/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 5/20/2011 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/12/2010. (nms)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Google Inc. Notice of Change of Firm Name for Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP to Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP (Moore, David)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-16); and 2) Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Responses to Defendant Google, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-56) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Google Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); Defendant Google Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's FIrst Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-15); and Google Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production to Defendant (Nos. 1-61) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Google Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P. and 2) First Set of Requests for Productionof Documents to Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P. by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Google, Inc. (Nos. 1-15); and (2) Plaintiff Personalized User Model, L.L.P.'s First Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Google, Inc. (Nos. 1-61) by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Yar R. Chaikovsky as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with Sonnenschein Nath & Rosenthal LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Scheduling re 20 Order, Set Deadlines,, by Google Inc., Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Judge Farnan)(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER directing the parties to confer and submit a Joint Proposed Rule 16 Scheduling Order by December 14, 2009 (Set Deadlines: Notice of Compliance deadline set for 12/14/2009). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/23/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Form of Order)(nms)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 10/27/2009. (nms)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 10/27/2009. (nms)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Remark: The Notice of Motion regarding Motion to Transfer D.I. 9 is STRICKEN. The motion is dispositive and does not require noticing. The motion will be decided on the papers submitted. (dlk)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF re 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Personalized User Model LLP.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian C. Cannon, Charles K. Verhoeven, David A. Perlson, Antonio R. Sistos and Eugene Novik filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 9/30/2009. (nms)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECLARATION of re Jennifer Bennett re 13 Answering Brief Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2, # 2 Exhibits 3-5)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 9/28/2009 (nms).
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of Roy Twersky re 13 Answering Brief in Opposition by Personalized User Model LLP. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 9/28/2009 (nms).
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Personalized User Model LLP.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/5/2009. (Tigan, Jeremy)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian C. Cannon, Charles K. Verhoeven, David A. Perlson, Antonio R. Sistos and Eugene Novik - filed by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION of John Labrre re 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California by Google Inc.. (Moore, David) Modified on 9/9/2009 (nms).
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of Antonio Sistos re 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9)(Moore, David) Modified on 9/9/2009 (nms).
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, David)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Personalized User Model LLP by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc S. Friedman, Jimmy M. Shin, Yar R. Chaikovsky, Jennifer D. Bennett filed by Personalized User Model LLP. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 8/11/2009. (nms)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc S. Friedman, Jimmy M. Shin, Yar R. Chaikovsky, Jennifer D. Bennett - filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Louden, Karen)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 8, 2009 filed by Google Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Google Inc. answer due 9/8/2009.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/28/2009. (nms)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 8, 2009 - filed by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. Please include the initials of the Judge (JJF) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Personalized User Model LLP. Google Inc. served on 7/17/2009, answer due 8/6/2009. (Louden, Karen)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,981,040 B1; 7,320,031 B2; (dzs, )
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Google Inc. on 7/17/2009. (dzs, )
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (dzs, )
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzs, )
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Google Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 03110000000000609568.) - filed by Personalized User Model LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Personalized User Model LLP v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Personalized User Model LLP
Represented By: Karen Jacobs Louden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?