ING Bank fsb v. Palmer et al
Plaintiff: ING Bank fsb
Defendant: Dana Palmer, Team One Appraisals and American Reporting Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00897
Filed: November 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 141 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Reference to the State of Washington Department of Licensing, Business and Professions Division Default Order Against Dana Palmer, granting 142 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant From Re-Introducing a Contributory Negligence Defense. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/7/2012. (nmfn)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 113 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by American Reporting Company LLC, 89 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Recovering Damages in Excess of $750.00 filed by Amer ican Reporting Company LLC, 76 Cross-Motion to exclude filed by ING Bank fsb, 72 MOTION to Preclude Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Gary Walker filed by American Reporting Company LLC, 99 MOTION to Preclude Motio n in Limine to Preclude Reference at Trial to the April 24, 2009 Email from Francois Madath to Dana Palmer filed by American Reporting Company LLC, MOTION to Preclude filed by ING Bank fsb, 114 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by ING Bank fsb, 100 MOTION in Limine filed by ING Bank fsb. SEE MEMORANDUM ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/8/2012. (fms)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/16/2012. (nmf)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 8 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) filed by Dana Palmer, Team One Appraisals. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/29/2010. (nmf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ING Bank fsb v. Palmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ING Bank fsb
Represented By: Robert D. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team One Appraisals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Reporting Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?