Progressive Casualty Insurance Co. et al v. Drive Trademark Holdings LP et al
Plaintiff: Progressive Casualty Insurance Co. and Progressive DLP Corp.
Defendant: Drive Trademark Holdings LP and Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00902
Filed: November 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 71 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive DLP Corp. (Granted in part, Denied in part); and Adopting 94 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/26/11. (ntl)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 71 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment[Partial Summary Judgment]filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive DLP Corp. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b )(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/6/2011. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/20/2010. (cak)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS D.I. 68 . Therefore, Defendant's Motion To Dismiss (D.I. 11 ) is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/10/2010. (dlk)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 SEALED DOCUMENT -- REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts III and IV of the Complaint. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objec tions (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 8/9/2010. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/21/2010. (cak)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Motion For Leave to Deposit Disputed Funds In The Registry OF The Court D.I. 16 .. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 1/29/2010. (dlk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Casualty Insurance Co. et al v. Drive Trademark Holdings LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Thomas C. Grimm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive DLP Corp.
Represented By: Thomas C. Grimm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drive Trademark Holdings LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?