Nokia Corporation v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Nokia Corporation
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01002
Filed: December 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying (47) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:09-cv-00791-GMS; denying (17) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:09-cv-01002-GMS; denying (19) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:10-cv-00167-GMS; denying (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:10-cv-00166-GMS. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/6/2010. (asw)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew D. Richardson filed by Nokia Inc., Nokia Corporation. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/2/2010. (asw)
September 1, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew D. Richardson - filed by Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc.. (Smith, Rodger)
July 1, 2010 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF re 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-791; 09-1002; 10-166; and 10-167 filed by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 21, 2010 Filing 24 DECLARATION re (23 in 1:09-cv-01002-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (61 in 1:09-cv-00791-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Consolidation -- Declaration of Jack B. Blumenfeld by Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 21, 2010 Filing 23 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-791; 09-1002; 10-166; and 10-167 filed by Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2010. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 21, 2010 Filing 22 DECLARATION re 21 Answering Brief in Opposition, - Declaration of Karen L. Pascale - by Exedea Inc., HTC (BVI) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Pascale, Karen)
June 21, 2010 Filing 21 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-791; 09-1002; 10-166; and 10-167 filed by High Tech Computer Corp., HTC America Inc., HTC (BVI) Corp., Exedea Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2010. (Pascale, Karen)
June 3, 2010 Set Briefing Schedule: re 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-791; 09-1002; 10-166; and 10-167. Answering Brief due 6/21/2010. (asw)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (20 in 1:09-cv-01002-GMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-00791-GMS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Nokia parties to respond to Apple's Motion for Consolidation to June 21, 2010 filed by Nokia Inc., Nokia Corporation, Apple Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/3/2010. (asw)
June 3, 2010 Filing 20 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Nokia parties to respond to Apple's Motion for Consolidation to June 21, 2010 - filed by Apple Inc., Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 24, 2010 Filing 19 DECLARATION re 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-791; 09-1002; 10-166; and 10-167 by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 24, 2010 Filing 18 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-791; 09-1002; 10-166; and 10-167 filed by Apple Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/10/2010. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 24, 2010 Filing 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-791; 09-1002; 10-166; and 10-167 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
May 24, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard K. Herrmann on behalf of Apple Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter Kontio filed by Nokia Inc., Nokia Corporation. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/8/2010. (asw)
April 8, 2010 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter Kontio - filed by Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan W. Koppelman and Adam J. Biegel filed by Nokia Corporation. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/6/2010. (asw)
April 1, 2010 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan W. Koppelman and Adam J. Biegel - filed by Nokia Corporation. (Smith, Rodger)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SO ORDERED, re 11 Stipulation to Stay Litigation filed by Nokia Corporation, Apple Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/3/2010. (asw)
February 24, 2010 Filing 12 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D-E, # 4 Exhibit F-G, # 5 Exhibit H-I)(Moore, David)
February 12, 2010 Filing 11 STIPULATION stay litigation by Apple Inc., Nokia Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick J. Flinn, John D. Haynes, Keith E. Broyles, Mark A. McCarty and Alan L. Whitehurst filed by Nokia Corporation. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/4/2010. (asw)
February 2, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick J. Flinn, John D. Haynes, Keith E. Broyles, Mark A. McCarty and Alan L. Whitehurst - filed by Nokia Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Lee and Mark D. Selwyn of WilmerHale filed by Apple Inc., 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth H. Bridges and Michael T. Pieja of Wong, Cabello, Lutsch, Rutherford & Brucculeri, LLP filed by Apple Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/26/2010. (asw)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT TO 2/24/2010 filed by Apple Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 2/24/2010. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/26/2010. (asw)
January 22, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Lee and Mark D. Selwyn of WilmerHale - filed by Apple Inc.. (Moore, David)
January 22, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth H. Bridges and Michael T. Pieja of Wong, Cabello, Lutsch, Rutherford & Brucculeri, LLP - filed by Apple Inc.. (Moore, David)
January 20, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Horwitz on behalf of Apple Inc. (Horwitz, Richard)
January 20, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT TO 2/24/2010 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Moore, David)
January 6, 2010 Case assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 4, 2010 Filing 5 DECLARATION OF MAILING (as to service on Defendant Apple Inc.) by Nokia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 30, 2009 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,714,091 B2; 6,834,181 B2; 6,895,256 B2; 6,518,957 B1; 6,073,036; 6,262,735 B1; 6,924,789 B2 (dmp, )
December 29, 2009 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Nokia Corporation. (dmp, )
December 29, 2009 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. on 12/29/2009. (dmp, )
December 29, 2009 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dmp, )
December 29, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-673993.) - filed by Nokia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nokia Corporation v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nokia Corporation
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?