Shire Development LLC et al v. Cadila Healthcare Limited et al

Plaintiff: Shire Development Inc., Shire Pharmaceutical Development Inc., Cosmo Technologies Limited and Giuliani International Limited
Defendant: Cadila Healthcare Limited and Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00581
Filed: July 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 7/28/15. (ntl)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM ORDER - that the communications at issue, being between Mr. NSV Raju and his employer, are not subject to attorney-client privilege, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall confer with the Special Master to determine whether any additional argument or evidence is needed before he reconsiders his Report and Recommendation in light of this decision. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 10/19/12. (rwc)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 209 OPINION re privileged communication. Signed by Justice B.N. Srikrishna on 6/27/12. (ntl)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 206 {SEALED} OPINION and Order Regarding Defendants' Assertion of Attorney-Client Privilege. Signed by Special Master Joshua W. Martin III on 6/15/12. (ntl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shire Development LLC et al v. Cadila Healthcare Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shire Development Inc.
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shire Pharmaceutical Development Inc.
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cosmo Technologies Limited
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giuliani International Limited
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadila Healthcare Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?