In Re Wilmington Trust Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Mohammed Elzagha, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pipefitters Local 537 Annuity Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, Timothy Rooney and St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System
Defendant: Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, Thomas DuPont, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr., J.P. Morgan Securities, KPMG LLP, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc., Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, William North, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr., Susan D. Whiting and Wilmington Trust Corporation
Case Number: 1:2010cv00990
Filed: November 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Sue L Robinson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2015 Filing 380 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Ted T. Cecala: Entry of appearance of attorney Jody Barillare. Attorney Thomas J. Allingham, II, Robert S. Saunders, Lori W. Will, Matthew P. Majarian and Christina L. Golden terminated. (Barillare, Jody)
March 31, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Henry E. Klingeman,Helen A. Nau for Kevyn N. Rakowski added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
March 27, 2015 Filing 379 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Underwiter Defendants on April 17, 2015 and April 24, 2015 filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
March 25, 2015 Filing 378 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Helen A Nau - filed by Kevyn N. Rakowski. (Dalton, Andrew)
March 25, 2015 Filing 377 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Henry E Klingeman - filed by Kevyn N. Rakowski. (Dalton, Andrew)
March 25, 2015 Filing 376 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Kevyn N. Rakowski: Entry of appearance of attorney Andrew Caulfield Dalton. Attorney Robert S Saunders terminated. (Dalton, Andrew)
March 25, 2015 Filing 375 NOTICE of Appearance by Colm F. Connolly on behalf of Ted T. Cecala (Connolly, Colm)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 378 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Helen A Nau filed by Kevyn N. Rakowski, # 377 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Henry E Klingeman filed by Kevyn N. Rakowski. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/25/2015. (fms)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall conduct a telephone conference on 4/7/2015 at 11:30 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to address the issues raised in the parties' 'E-mail Request for Emergency Relief' which Judge Sue L. Robinson has referred to Magistrate Judge Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557.Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/19/2015. (lih)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 374 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James L. Shea filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation, # 371 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edmund M. O'Toole filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation, # 373 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James E. Dunbar filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation, # 372 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel P. Moylan filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/2/2015. (fms)
February 27, 2015 Filing 374 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James L. Shea - filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Edmonson, Jamie)
February 27, 2015 Filing 373 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James E. Dunbar - filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Edmonson, Jamie)
February 27, 2015 Filing 372 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel P. Moylan - filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Edmonson, Jamie) Modified on 2/27/2015 (fms).
February 27, 2015 Filing 371 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edmund M. O'Toole - filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Edmonson, Jamie)
February 27, 2015 Filing 370 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Lynne Edmonson on behalf of Wilmington Trust Corporation (Edmonson, Jamie)
February 20, 2015 Filing 369 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 366 MOTION to Strike # 360 Reply Brief filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Allingham, Thomas) Modified on 2/23/2015 (lih).
February 13, 2015 Filing 368 RESPONSE to Motion re # 366 MOTION to Strike # 360 Reply Brief, The Wilmington Trust Defendants' Motion To Strike filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Belger, Vera)
February 4, 2015 Filing 367 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Stephen D. Dargitz as co-counsel. Reason for request: Mr. Dargitz is no longer employed at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP. (Dargitz, Stephen)
January 30, 2015 Filing 366 MOTION to Strike # 360 Reply Brief - filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Allingham, Thomas) Modified on 2/2/2015 (lih).
January 30, 2015 Filing 365 REDACTED VERSION of # 361 Declaration, by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B-D)(Belger, Vera)
January 30, 2015 Filing 364 REDACTED VERSION of # 360 Reply Brief, by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Belger, Vera)
January 30, 2015 Filing 363 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System re # 259 MOTION to Certify Class . (Belger, Vera)
January 23, 2015 Filing 362 EXHIBITS Aand E re # 361 Declaration by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Belger, Vera) Modified on 1/26/2015 (lih).
January 23, 2015 Filing 361 [SEALED] DECLARATION re # 360 Reply Brief, by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B-D, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Belger, Vera)
January 23, 2015 Filing 360 [SEALED] SEALED REPLY BRIEF re # 259 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Belger, Vera)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 359 Stipulation Regarding Lead Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion For Class Certification. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/23/2015. (nmfn)
January 21, 2015 Filing 359 Joint STIPULATION to extend page limits by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Belger, Vera) Modified on 1/21/2015 (lih).
January 5, 2015 Filing 358 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant KPMG LLPs Objections and Responses to Lead Plaintiffs Third Request for Production of Documents filed by KPMG LLP.(Gibson, Virginia)
December 10, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexandra C Pitney for J.P. Morgan Securities added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mas)
December 9, 2014 Filing 357 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation re # 271 Notice to Take Deposition (Allingham, Thomas)
December 9, 2014 Filing 356 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Thomas J. Allingham II re # 282 Letter regarding Plaintiffs' request that the Court grant a protective order quashing the Wilmington Trust Defendants' Notice of Deposition of BLBG. (Allingham, Thomas) Modified on 12/10/2014 (lih).
December 4, 2014 Filing 355 REDACTED VERSION of # 347 Answering Brief in Opposition by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Allingham, Thomas) Modified on 12/8/2014 (lih).
December 1, 2014 Filing 354 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs' Third Request for Production of Documents to Defendant KPMG filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
November 25, 2014 Remark - SEALED Exhibits 4-6 (formerly D.I. 354) and SEALED Exhibits 7-9 (formerly D.I. 355) have been removed from the docket as separate docket entries and have been attached to D.I. 351 along with a cover page for D.I. 351. (fms)
November 25, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. # 352 has been corrected to reflect that it is a Joinder and has been linked to D.I. Nos. # 347 and # 259 . (fms)
November 24, 2014 Filing 353 JOINDER by KPMG LLP, joining in # 347 Answering Brief in Opposition, . (Gibson, Virginia)
November 24, 2014 Filing 352 JOINDER joining in # 347 Answering Brief in Opposition filed by William North. (Moultrie, Samuel) Modified on 11/25/2014 (fms). Modified on 11/25/2014 (fms). Modified on 12/1/2014 (lih).
November 24, 2014 Filing 351 [SEALED] EXHIBITS 1-9 re # 348 Declaration by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Allingham, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2014: # 2 Exhibits 4-6, # 3 Exhibits 7-9) (fms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2014: # 5 Cover page) (fms). Modified on 11/25/2014 (fms). Modified on 12/1/2014 (lih).
November 24, 2014 Filing 350 JOINDER by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc., joining in # 347 Answering Brief in Opposition, # 259 Motion to Certify Class, . (Sensing, John)
November 24, 2014 Filing 349 INDEPENDENT DIRECTORS' JOINDER by Carolyn S. Burger, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Michele M. Rollins, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, joining in # 347 Answering Brief in Opposition, # 259 Motion to Certify Class.(Chuff, Christopher) Modified on 12/1/2014 (lih).
November 24, 2014 Filing 348 DECLARATION of Lori W. Will re # 347 Answering Brief in Opposition by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Allingham, Thomas) Modified on 12/1/2014 (lih).
November 24, 2014 Filing 347 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 259 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/4/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Allingham, Thomas)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 346 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to # 259 MOTION to Certify Class filed by David R. Gibson, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr., Wilmington Trust Corporation, Ted T. Cecala, Set Briefing Schedule: re # 259 MOTION to Certify Class . (Answering Brief due 11/24/2014., Reply Brief due 1/23/2015.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/17/2014. (fms)
November 14, 2014 Filing 346 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to # 259 MOTION to Certify Class - filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allingham, Thomas)
November 10, 2014 Filing 345 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathryn W. Weidner for Lead Plaintiffs - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Belger, Vera)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 345 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathryn W. Weidner for Lead Plaintiffs filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/10/2014. (fms)
November 10, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kathryn W. Weidner for Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
November 7, 2014 Filing 344 REDACTED VERSION of # 338 Exhibit to a Document, by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C-Z)(Belger, Vera)
November 7, 2014 Filing 343 REDACTED VERSION of # 337 Declaration, by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Belger, Vera)
November 7, 2014 Filing 342 REDACTED VERSION of # 336 Reply Brief, by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Belger, Vera)
November 6, 2014 Filing 341 Letter REPLY to Response to # 297 MOTION to Intervene and Motion for a Limited Stay of Discovery filed by United States Attorney for the District of Delaware. (Kravetz, Robert) Modified on 11/7/2014 (lih).
November 4, 2014 Filing 340 NOTICE of Subpoena to Buckhead Capital Management, LLC for the Production of Documents on November 14, 2014 by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Levy, Jaclyn)
November 4, 2014 Filing 339 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Louise Golden on behalf of Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation (Golden, Christina)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- GRANTING # 310 MOTION to Intervene, GRANTING # 293 MOTION to Intervene, GRANTING # 297 MOTION to Intervene only. The court reserves judgment re # 297 Motion for a Limited Stay of Discovery. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/4/2014. (lih)
November 4, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, the NOTICE of Subpoena by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. (formerly D.I. 340) has been removed from the docket and will be re-filed shortly. (fms)
November 4, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Oral Argument held on 11/4/2014 re # 233 MOTION to Compel. (Court Reporter J. Kiechel ( Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
November 3, 2014 Filing 338 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re # 337 Declaration by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C-Z, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Belger, Vera) Modified on 11/4/2014 (lih).
November 3, 2014 Filing 337 [SEALED] DECLARATION re # 336 Reply Brief by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Belger, Vera) Modified on 11/4/2014 (lih).
November 3, 2014 Filing 336 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re # 233 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Defendants Based on The Bank Examination Privilege filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Belger, Vera) Modified on 11/4/2014 (lih).
November 3, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, D.I. numbers 336-338 have been removed from the docket due to an incorrect citation. Counsel will re-file the documents at a later time. (lih)
October 31, 2014 Filing 335 Letter to Magistrate Judge Sherry Fallon from Virginia A. Gibson regarding Request to be Excused from Conference. (Gibson, Virginia)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 334 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to # 259 MOTION to Certify Class , Lead Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for an Extension to the Class Certification Briefing Schedule filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Set Briefing Schedule: re # 259 MOTION to Certify Class . (Answering Brief due 11/17/2014., Reply Brief due 12/17/2014.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/31/2014. (fms)
October 30, 2014 Filing 334 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to # 259 MOTION to Certify Class - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Belger, Vera) Modified on 10/31/2014 (lih).
October 29, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Richard D. Gluck for Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (els)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re # 332 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/28/2014. (lih)
October 29, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Maxim M.L. Nowak for KPMG LLP added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (els)
October 28, 2014 Filing 333 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard Gluck for Lead Plaintiffs - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Belger, Vera)
October 28, 2014 Filing 332 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages- filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Belger, Vera) Modified on 10/28/2014 (lih).
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 333 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard Gluck for Lead Plaintiffs filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/28/2014. (fms)
October 28, 2014 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office one copy of D.I. # 324 , # 326 , # 327 , and two copies of D.I. # 325 , # 329 . (lih)
October 27, 2014 Filing 331 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 297 MOTION to Intervene filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B )(Belger, Vera) Modified on 10/28/2014 (lih).
October 27, 2014 Filing 330 DECLARATION re # 327 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pennsylvania Department of BAnking and Securities. (Noel, Jennifer)
October 27, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the declaration attached to D.I. # 327 due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document separately using the DECLARATION event code. (lih)
October 24, 2014 Filing 329 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 233 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Defendants Based on The Bank Examination Privilege filed by Office of the Comptroller of the Currency.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit OCC Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit OCC Exhibit 2)(Sterbenz, Christopher) Modified on 10/27/2014 (lih).
October 24, 2014 Filing 328 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Romina McMahon, Dennis Dougherty, John Depman, James P. Liddy, Julie A. Morris on 11/17/14, 11/20/14, 12/3/14, 12/12/14, 12/16/14, respectively filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
October 24, 2014 Filing 327 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 233 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Defendants Based on The Bank Examination Privilege filed by Pennsylvania Department of BAnking and Securities.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Linda Carroll)(Noel, Jennifer) Modified on 10/27/2014 (lih).
October 24, 2014 Filing 326 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re # 233 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Defendants Based on The Bank Examination Privilege filed by Delaware Office of the State Bank Commissioner.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/3/2014. (Noel, Jennifer) Modified on 10/27/2014 (lih).
October 24, 2014 Filing 325 Supplemental DECLARATION re # 324 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (Mizusawa, Yvonne)
October 24, 2014 Filing 324 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 233 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Defendants Based on The Bank Examination Privilege filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Mizusawa, Yvonne) Modified on 10/24/2014 (lih).
October 24, 2014 Motions terminated as MOOT per L.R. 83.5(f)(1). Attorney Yvonne F. Mizusawa has applied for and received cm/ecf electronic filing rights as a government attorney: # 316 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yvonne F. Mizusawa, Esq. filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (fms)
October 24, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the affidavit attached to D.I. # 324 due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document separately using the AFFIDAVIT event code. (lih)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 319 Lead Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for an Extension to the Class Certification Briefing Schedule filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Set Briefing Schedule: re # 259 MOTION to Certify Class . (Answering Brief due 11/4/2014., Reply Brief due 12/5/2014.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/23/2014. (fms)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER- GRANTING # 318 MOTION to Intervene filed by Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/22/2014. (lih)
October 21, 2014 Filing 319 MOTION for Extension of Time to the Class Certification Briefing Schedule - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Belger, Vera) Modified on 10/22/2014 (lih).
October 21, 2014 Filing 318 MOTION to Intervene - filed by Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sterbenz, Christopher)
October 21, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 10/21/2014. (Court Reporter T. Carroll( Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re # 315 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/21/2014. (lih)
October 21, 2014 MOTIONS REFERRED: # 318 MOTION to Intervene Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon.(nmfn)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re # 309 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Linda Carroll, Esq. and Begene Bahl, Esq.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/21/2014. (lih)
October 20, 2014 Filing 317 Joint Letter to Magistrate Judge Fallon from A. Zachary Naylor regarding October 21, 2014 Status Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F to October 20, 2014 Joint Letter to Magistrate Judge Fallon re October 21, 2014 Status Conference)(Belger, Vera) Modified on 10/21/2014 (lih).
October 20, 2014 Filing 316 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yvonne F. Mizusawa, Esq. - filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (Noel, Jennifer)
October 20, 2014 Filing 315 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Mizusawa, Yvonne)
October 20, 2014 Filing 314 REDACTED VERSION of # 303 Exhibit to a Document by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Belger, Vera) Modified on 10/21/2014 (lih).
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re # 313 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amanda-Jane Thomas. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/20/2014. (lih)
October 17, 2014 MOTIONS REFERRED: # 310 MOTION to Intervene, # 297 MOTION to Interveneand Motion for a Limited Stay of Discovery Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon per order of 8/7/2014.(nmfn)
October 17, 2014 Filing 313 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amanda-Jane Thomas - filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Norman, Stephen)
October 17, 2014 Filing 312 NOTICE of Intent to Assert Bank Examiner Privilege by Delaware Office of the State Bank Commissioner (Noel, Jennifer)
October 17, 2014 Filing 311 NOTICE of Intent to Assert Bank Examiner Privilege by Pennsylvania Department of BAnking and Securities re # 310 MOTION to Intervene (Noel, Jennifer)
October 17, 2014 Filing 310 MOTION to Intervene - filed by Pennsylvania Department of BAnking and Securities. (Noel, Jennifer)
October 17, 2014 Filing 309 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Linda Carroll, Esq. and Begene Bahl, Esq. - filed by Pennsylvania Department of BAnking and Securities. (Noel, Jennifer)
October 17, 2014 Filing 308 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer R. Noel on behalf of Delaware Office of the State Bank Commissioner (Noel, Jennifer)
October 17, 2014 Filing 307 NOTICE of Intent to Assert Bank Examination Privilege by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and Non-Party OCC (Mizusawa, Yvonne) Modified on 10/20/2014 (lih).
October 17, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The main pdf of D.I. # 286 has been replaced with a revised version to include a caption page. (lih)
October 15, 2014 Filing 306 Letter to Magistrate Judge Fallon from A. Zachary Naylor regarding , # 305 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A&B)(Belger, Vera) Modified on 10/15/2014 (lih).
October 15, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. numbers # 281 and # 283 have been replaced with revised versions of the documents to include a caption page. (lih)
October 14, 2014 Filing 305 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Thomas J. Allingham II, Esquire regarding A. Zachary Naylor's letter filed with the Court on October 14, 2014 - re # 302 Letter,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Allingham, Thomas)
October 14, 2014 Filing 304 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to the Wilmington Trust Defendants' Notices of Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions re # 272 Notice to Take Deposition, # 276 Notice to Take Deposition, # 273 Notice to Take Deposition, # 275 Notice to Take Deposition, # 270 Notice to Take Deposition filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
October 14, 2014 Filing 303 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re # 302 Letter by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service to Exhibits A-B )(Belger, Vera) Modified on 10/15/2014 (lih).
October 14, 2014 Filing 302 Letter to Magistrate Judge Fallon from A. Zachary Naylor regarding important information concerning the Wilmington Trust Defendants' submission of a document for in camera review in connection with Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order - re # 285 Letter, # 296 Letter, # 282 Letter,,,. (Belger, Vera)
October 10, 2014 Filing 301 REDACTED VERSION of # 288 Exhibit to a Document by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Saunders, Robert) Modified on 10/15/2014 (lih).
October 10, 2014 Filing 300 REDACTED VERSION of # 287 Letter by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Saunders, Robert) Modified on 10/15/2014 (lih).
October 10, 2014 Filing 299 REDACTED VERSION of # 285 Letter by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B and C)(Saunders, Robert) Modified on 10/15/2014 (lih).
October 10, 2014 Filing 298 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 297 MOTION to Intervene and Motion for a Limited Stay of Discovery filed by United States Attorney for the District of Delaware.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Kravetz, Robert) Modified on 10/10/2014 (lih).
October 10, 2014 Filing 297 MOTION to Intervene and Motion for a Limited Stay of Discovery - filed by United States Attorney for the District of Delaware. (Kravetz, Robert) Modified on 10/10/2014 (lih).
October 10, 2014 Filing 296 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Thomas J. Allingham II regarding a document for in camera review. (Allingham, Thomas)
October 9, 2014 Filing 295 REDACTED VERSION of # 283 Exhibit to a Document by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Belger, Vera) Modified on 10/10/2014 (lih).
October 9, 2014 Filing 294 REDACTED VERSION of # 280 Letter by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17-23)(Belger, Vera) Modified on 10/10/2014 (lih).
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/8/2014 re: # 289 Emergency MOTION for Scheduling Order - THE WILMINGTON TRUST DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES . The court will give Wilmington Trust the 5 day extension offered by plaintiffs. The motion is granted to that extent. No further briefing is required. (nmfn)
October 7, 2014 Filing 293 MOTION to Intervene - filed by Delaware Office of the State Bank Commissioner. (Handlon, Joseph)
October 7, 2014 Filing 292 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew T. O'Connor - filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Norman, Stephen)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 292 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew T. O'Connor filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/7/2014. (fms)
October 7, 2014 MOTIONS REFERRED: # 293 MOTION to Intervene Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(lih)
October 7, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 10/7/2014. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall conduct a status telephone conference on 10/21/2014 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/7/2014. (lih)
October 6, 2014 Filing 291 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 289 Emergency MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I to Lead Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to the Wilmington Trust Defendants' Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines)(Belger, Vera) Modified on 10/7/2014 (lih).
October 6, 2014 Filing 290 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Faye Loh, Greg Hartin, Steve Cummings, Margery Stuart, Robert Graber, Marty Infanti, Ronald Pendleton, Rich Conway, Robert Gehring, Vidya Saligrama, Todd Glandon, Joseph Terranova, Karen Thuresson, Anthony D'Imperio, Terry Brewer, Kevyn Rakowski, Donald Foley, Brian Bailey, Rene Jones, David Gibson, William North, Robert Harra Jr., Ted Cecala on 10/20/14, 10/21/14, 10/23/14, 10/27/14, 10/27/14, 10/28/14, 11/3/14, 11/4/14, 11/5/14, 11/6/14, 11/7/14, 11/10/14, 11/11/14, 11/13/14, 11/14/14, 12/2/14, 12/5/14, 12/8/14, 12/9/14, 12/11/14, 12/15/14, 12/17/14, 12/19/14 (respectively) filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
October 6, 2014 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. # 285, 286, 287 and 288. Counsel is advised that each document submitted must be bound separately by its D.I. number with the D.I. number written in the upper right hand corner of the document. re # 286 Exhibit to a Document, # 288 Exhibit to a Document, # 285 Letter, # 287 Letter,. (Polito, Rebecca)
October 6, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jacob Nachmani for Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mas)
October 3, 2014 Filing 289 Emergency MOTION for Scheduling Order - filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Certificate of Compliance - L.R. 7.1.1, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Allingham, Thomas) Modified on 10/7/2014 (lih).
October 3, 2014 Filing 288 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re # 287 Letter by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1 of 3, # 2 Exhibit A part 2 of 3, # 3 Exhibit A part 3 of 3, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Saunders, Robert) Modified on 10/7/2014 (lih).
October 3, 2014 Filing 287 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Robert S. Saunders regarding Wilmington Trust Defendants' Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' letter motion to compel (Re: Dkt. 280) - re # 280 Letter,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Saunders, Robert)
October 3, 2014 Filing 286 EXHIBIT re # 285 Letter by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 'Certificate of Service)(Allingham, Thomas) Modified on 10/7/2014 (lih). (Main Document 286 replaced on 10/17/2014) (lih).
October 3, 2014 Filing 285 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Thomas J. Allingham II regarding Wilmington Trust Defendants' Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Letter Requesting Protective Order - re # 283 Exhibit to a Document,,, # 282 Letter,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B and C (Under Seal), # 2 Certificate of Service)(Allingham, Thomas)
October 2, 2014 Filing 284 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Thomas J. Allingham, II regarding Resolution of Issues raised in the Wilmington Trust Defendants' Motion to Compel - re # 267 Letter,. (Allingham, Thomas)
October 2, 2014 Filing 283 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re # 282 Letter by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service to Letter to Judge Fallon from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Plaintiffs' request that the Court grant a protective order quashing the Wilmington Trust Defendants' Motice of Deposition of BLBG)(Belger, Vera) Modified on 10/7/2014 (lih). (Main Document 283 replaced on 10/15/2014) (lih).
October 2, 2014 Filing 282 Letter to Magistrate Judge Fallon from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Plaintiffs' request that the Court grant a protective order quashing the Wilmington Trust Defendants' Motice of Deposition of BLBG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Letter to Judge Fallon from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Plaintiffs' request that the Court grant a protective order quashing the Wilmington Trust Defendants' Motice of Deposition of BLBG, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Letter to Judge Fallon from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Plaintiffs' request that the Court grant a protective order quashing the Wilmington Trust Defendants' Motice of Deposition of BLBG, # 3 Exhibit A-G to Declaration of Hannah G. Ross in Support of Non-Party BLBG's Motion for a Protective Order)(Belger, Vera)
October 2, 2014 Filing 281 EXHIBIT re # 280 Letter by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Belger, Vera) Modified on 10/7/2014 (lih). (Main Document 281 replaced on 10/15/2014) (lih).
October 2, 2014 Filing 280 [SEALED] Letter to Magistrate Judge Fallon from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Plaintiffs' request that the Court compel Defendants to reinstate the agreed-upon search terms. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17-23 to October 2, 2014 Letter to Judge Fallon from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Plaintiffs' request that the Court compel Defendants to reinstate the agreed-upon search terms, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service to October 2, 2014 Letter to Judge Fallon from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Plaintiffs' request that the Court compel Defendants to reinstate the agreed-upon search terms)(Belger, Vera)
September 25, 2014 Filing 279 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Majarian on behalf of Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation (Majarian, Matthew)
September 25, 2014 Filing 278 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori W. Will on behalf of Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation (Will, Lori)
September 25, 2014 Filing 277 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs' Answers and Objections to Defendants' First Interrogatory filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
September 24, 2014 Filing 276 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Merced County Employees' Retirement Association on October 7, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation.(Allingham, Thomas)
September 24, 2014 Filing 275 NOTICE to Take Deposition of St. Petersburg Firefighters' Retirement System on October 8, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation.(Allingham, Thomas)
September 24, 2014 Filing 274 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Professor S.P. Kothari on October 10, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation.(Allingham, Thomas)
September 24, 2014 Filing 273 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Coral Springs Police Pension Fund on October 8, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation.(Allingham, Thomas)
September 24, 2014 Filing 272 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System on October 9, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation.(Allingham, Thomas)
September 24, 2014 Filing 271 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP on October 7, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation.(Allingham, Thomas)
September 24, 2014 Filing 270 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund on October 9, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation.(Allingham, Thomas)
September 23, 2014 Filing 269 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Non-Party M&T Bank Corporation's Responses and Objections to Lead Plaintiffs' Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action filed by M&T Bank Corporation.(Saunders, Robert)
September 22, 2014 Filing 268 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Lee Moultrie on behalf of William North (Moultrie, Samuel)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 265 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maxim M.L. Nowak filed by KPMG LLP, # 266 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erin Marie Meyer filed by KPMG LLP. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/22/2014. (fms)
September 19, 2014 Filing 267 Letter to Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Robert S. Saunders regarding Request to Compel Lead Plaintiffs to Produce Documents to the Wilmington Trust Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Certificate Under LR 7.1.1)(Saunders, Robert)
September 19, 2014 Filing 266 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erin Marie Meyer - filed by KPMG LLP. (Gibson, Virginia)
September 19, 2014 Filing 265 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maxim M.L. Nowak - filed by KPMG LLP. (Gibson, Virginia)
September 16, 2014 Filing 264 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to Barclays Bank PLC filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
September 16, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 9/16/2014. (Court Reporter H. Triozzi (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule: re # 233 MOTION to Compel: Answering Brief due 10/24/2014., Reply Brief due 10/31/2014. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/16/2014. (lih)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall conduct a telephone status conference on 10/7/2014 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: the court shall hear oral argument re # 233 Motion to Compel on 11/4/2014 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel shall collectively have one hour to present argument. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/16/2014. (lih)
September 15, 2014 Filing 263 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Lead Plaintiffs Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant KPMG re # 241 Notice of Service, filed by KPMG LLP.(Gibson, Virginia)
September 15, 2014 Filing 262 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn C. Levy on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. (Levy, Jaclyn)
September 12, 2014 Filing 261 DECLARATION re # 260 Opening Brief in Support, # 259 MOTION to Certify Class by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F, # 2 Exhibit G-K, # 3 Exhibit L)(Belger, Vera)
September 12, 2014 Filing 260 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 259 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/29/2014. (Belger, Vera)
September 12, 2014 Filing 259 MOTION to Certify Class - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Belger, Vera)
September 12, 2014 Filing 258 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant William North's Responses and Objections to Lead Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents to All Defendants and Certificate of Service re # 241 Notice of Service, filed by William North.(Wilks, David)
September 11, 2014 Filing 257 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Underwriter Defendants' Responses and Objections to Lead Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents to All Defendants re # 241 Notice of Service, filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc..(Levy, Jaclyn)
September 11, 2014 Filing 256 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Wilmington Trust Defendants' Responses And Objections To Lead Plaintiffs' Second Request For Production Of Documents To All Defendants filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation.(Saunders, Robert)
September 11, 2014 Filing 255 NOTICE OF SERVICE of INDEPENDENT DIRECTOR DEFENDANTS CAROLYN S. BURGER, R. KEITH ELLIOTT, DONALD E. FOLEY, LOUIS J. FREEH, GAILEN KRUG, REX L. MEARS, STACEY J. MOBLEY, MICHELLE M. ROLLINS, OLIVER R. SOCKWELL, ROBERT W. TUNNELL, JR., AND SUSAN D. WHITINGS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO LEAD PLAINTIFFS' SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by Carolyn S. Burger, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Michele M. Rollins, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting.(Chuff, Christopher)
September 10, 2014 Filing 254 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to M&T Bank Pursuant to Rules 26, 30(b)(6) and 45 filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
September 5, 2014 Filing 253 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of appearance of Matthew D. Stachel, Esquire as counsel for defendants J.P. Morgan Securities LLC and Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc. by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. (Sensing, John)
September 5, 2014 Filing 252 Joint Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Robert S. Saunders, Esquire, on behalf of the Wilmington Trust Defendants, Defendant KPMG LLP, the Independent Director Defendants, Defendant William B. North, and Lead Plaintiffs (the "Parties") regarding the Parties' Agreement concerning the Regulatory Privilege. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Saunders, Robert)
September 5, 2014 Filing 251 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Robert S. Saunders, Esquire regarding the Wilmington Trust Defendants' discovery. (Saunders, Robert)
September 4, 2014 Filing 250 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to M&T Bank Pursuant to Rules 26, 30(B)(6) and 45 filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
September 4, 2014 Filing 249 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to Clayton Holdings, LLC filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall conduct a telephone status conference on 9/16/2014 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/2/2014. (lih)
September 2, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 9/2/2014. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
August 25, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Common Interrogatory Directed to Lead Plaintiffs filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, J.P. Morgan Securities, KPMG LLP, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc., Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, William North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation.(Saunders, Robert)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- GRANTING # 246 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: the court shall conduct a status telephone conference on 9/2/2014 at 12:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/22/2014. (lih)
August 21, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 8/21/2014. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lih)
August 20, 2014 Filing 247 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 246 MOTION to Intervene filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/8/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Mizusawa, Yvonne)
August 20, 2014 Filing 246 MOTION to Intervene - filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mizusawa, Yvonne)
August 20, 2014 Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Schoch Brooks on behalf of William North (Brooks, Andrea)
August 19, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jonathan M. Stein for Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund added for electronic noticing. (els)
August 18, 2014 Filing 244 NOTICE of Change of Address by Vera Gerrit Belger (Belger, Vera)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall conduct a discovery status teleconference on 8/21/2014 at 04:30 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/18/2014. (lih)
August 13, 2014 Filing 243 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to M&T Bank filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
August 13, 2014 REQUEST: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office an additional copy of D.I. # 233 , # 234 and # 235 . (lih)
August 12, 2014 Filing 242 RESPONSE to Motion re # 233 MOTION to Compel filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Dargitz, Stephen) Modified on 8/13/2014 (lih).
August 12, 2014 Filing 241 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents to All Defendants filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Fact Discovery due by 12/19/2014. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/7/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Jury Trial is set for 10/26/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/12/2014. (nmfn)
August 12, 2014 Filing 239 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan M. Stein - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 239 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan M. Stein filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/12/2014. (fms)
August 8, 2014 Filing 238 Joint Rule 26(f) Proposed Scheduling Order by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Belger, Vera) Modified on 8/11/2014 (lih).
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER, On or before September 15, 2014, the Wilmington Trust Defendants shall complete their secondary review and production of documents previously produced to government entitites. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for all disputes related to fact discovery, including the pending motion to compel (D.I. # 233 ). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/7/2014. (nmfn)
August 6, 2014 Filing 236 Certificate of Service re # 234 Opening Brief in Support, # 233 MOTION to Compel, # 235 Exhibit to a Document by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Belger, Vera) Modified on 8/7/2014 (lih).
August 6, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 8/6/2014. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
August 6, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of the brief at D.I. # 234 has been replaced with a pdf containing a corrected cover page per request of filer. (nmfn)
August 5, 2014 Filing 235 EXHIBIT re # 234 Opening Brief in Support by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit L Part 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit N-Part 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit N-Part 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit N-Part 3, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit P)(Belger, Vera) Modified on 8/7/2014 (lih).
August 5, 2014 Filing 234 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 233 MOTION to Compel filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/22/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Hannah G. Ross in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of their Motion Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Defendants Based on "The Bank Examination" Privilege, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-K to Declaration of Hannah G. Ross in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of their Motion Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Defendants Based on "The Bank Examination" Privilege)(Belger, Vera) (Main Document 234 replaced on 8/6/2014) (nmfn, ). Modified on 8/7/2014 (lih).
August 5, 2014 Filing 233 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Defendants Based on The Bank Examination Privilege - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Belger, Vera) Modified on 8/7/2014 (lih).
August 5, 2014 The 8/6/2014 discovery conference will be held by telephone per Judge Robinson's approval of counsel's request. (nmfn)
July 31, 2014 Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance by Laina M. Herbert on behalf of William North (Herbert, Laina)
July 31, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Scheduling Conference held on 7/31/2014. (Court Reporter not present.) Counsel to submit the final proposed scheduling order to the court. (nmfn)
July 30, 2014 Set Hearings: A Discovery Conference is set for 8/6/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (nmfn)
July 28, 2014 Filing 231 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, the Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, the St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System and the Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement Systems Responses to the Wilmington Trust Defendants First Request for Production of Documents to Lead Plaintiffs filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Naylor, A.)
July 18, 2014 Filing 230 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jacob Nachmani - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 230 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jacob Nachmani filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/18/2014. (fms)
July 14, 2014 Filing 229 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Alicia N. Washington as attorney for defendants J.P. Morgan Securities and Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc. by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. re SO ORDERED (Stachel, Matthew)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 7/31/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/11/2014. (fms)
July 2, 2014 Filing 227 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
July 2, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sara A. Ricciardi for J.P. Morgan Securities added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 226 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sara A. Ricciardi filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/1/2014. (fms)
June 30, 2014 Filing 226 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sara A. Ricciardi - filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Stachel, Matthew)
June 27, 2014 Filing 225 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to Kamakura Corporation filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
June 26, 2014 Filing 224 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to Rosen Consulting Group filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
June 24, 2014 Filing 223 NOTICE OF SERVICE of the Wilmington Trust Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents Directed to Lead Plaintiffs filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation.(Saunders, Robert)
June 11, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to Ardmore Banking Advisors, Inc. filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
June 6, 2014 Filing 221 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT WILLIAM NORTHS RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO re # 195 Notice of Service,, filed by William North.(Wilks, David)
June 2, 2014 Filing 220 NOTICE OF SERVICE of THE UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO LEAD PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO THE UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS re # 194 Notice of Service, filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc..(Stachel, Matthew)
May 30, 2014 Filing 219 NOTICE OF SERVICE of INDEPENDENT DIRECTORS CAROLYN S. BURGER, R. KEITH ELLIOTT, DONALD E. FOLEY, LOUIS J. FREEH, GAILEN KRUG, REX L. MEARS, STACEY J. MOBLEY, MICHELLE M. ROLLINS, OLIVER R. SOCKWELL, ROBERT W. TUNNELL, JR., AND SUSAN D. WHITING'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO LEAD PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by Carolyn S. Burger, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Michele M. Rollins, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting.(Chuff, Christopher)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting # 215 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/28/2014. (nmfn)
May 27, 2014 Filing 217 NOTICE OF SERVICE of KPMGs Objections and Responses to Lead Plaintiffs First Request for Production Documents re # 193 Notice of Service, filed by KPMG LLP.(Gibson, Virginia)
May 22, 2014 Filing 216 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Wilmington Trust Defendants' Responses and Objections to Lead Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to Defendants Wilmington Trust, Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Jr., and Kevyn N. Rakowski re # 192 Notice of Service, filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation.(Saunders, Robert)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 197 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 3/31/2015., Dispositive Motions due by 4/27/2015., An Oral Argument is set for 6/29/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/19/2014. (nmfn)
May 16, 2014 Filing 215 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Submission Regarding Proposed Stipulated Protective Order - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Joint Submission Regarding Proposed Stipulated Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Joint Submission Regarding Proposed Stipulated Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Joint Submission Regarding Proposed Stipulated Protective Order, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Joint Submission Regarding Proposed Stipulated Protective Order, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Joint Submission Regarding Proposed Stipulated Protective Order, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Joint Submission Regarding Proposed Stipulated Protective Order, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Joint Submission Regarding Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Belger, Vera)
May 16, 2014 Filing 214 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Steve Singer and Sean O'Dowd as Counsel for Plaintiffs by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System (Belger, Vera)
May 16, 2014 Filing 213 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Kristin Meister, Adam Hollander, John Rizio-Hamilton, and Stefanie Sundel as Counsel for Plaintiffs by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System (Belger, Vera)
May 15, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to Treliant Risk Advisors, LLC filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
May 13, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure Statement filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Belger, Vera)
May 12, 2014 Filing 210 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: # 149 Amended Complaint, The Wilmington Trust Defendants Answer And Affirmative Defenses To The Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation.(Saunders, Robert)
May 12, 2014 Filing 209 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Wilmington Trust Defendants' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation.(Saunders, Robert)
May 12, 2014 Filing 208 NOTICE of INITIAL DISCLOSURES OF DEFENDANT J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC; INITIAL DISCLOSURES OF DEFENDANT KEEFE, BRUYETTE & WOODS, INC. by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. (Stachel, Matthew)
May 12, 2014 Filing 207 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: # 149 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand ANSWER OF UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFFS' FOURTH AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc..(Norman, Stephen)
May 12, 2014 Filing 206 NOTICE OF SERVICE of KPMG's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ 26(a) filed by KPMG LLP.(Gibson, Virginia) Modified on 5/13/2014 (rwc).
May 12, 2014 Filing 205 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: # 149 Amended Complaint, by KPMG LLP.(Gibson, Virginia)
May 12, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant William B. North's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by William North.(Wilks, David)
May 12, 2014 Filing 203 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Independent Directors' Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Carolyn S. Burger, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Michele M. Rollins, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting.(Chuff, Christopher)
May 12, 2014 Filing 202 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: # 149 Amended Complaint, Independent Directors' Answer to Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint by Carolyn S. Burger, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Michele M. Rollins, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting.(Chuff, Christopher)
May 12, 2014 Filing 200 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: # 149 Amended Complaint, by William North.(Wilks, David)
May 12, 2014 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by John Anderson Sensing on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. (Sensing, John)
May 12, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26 filed by William North (formerly D.I. 201) has been deleted from the docket. Please see L.R. 5.4 b) Service Without Filing. A Notice of Service should be filed containing a certification that a particular form of discovery or response was served on other counsel or opposing parties, and the date and manner of service. (fms) (fms)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 198 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alicia N. Washington filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/9/2014. (fms)
May 8, 2014 Filing 198 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alicia N. Washington - filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Stachel, Matthew)
May 2, 2014 The proposed scheduling order attached to D.I. # 196 has been deleted as an attachment to D.I. 196 and docketed separately. (fms)
May 1, 2014 Filing 197 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. (fms)
May 1, 2014 Filing 196 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Robert S. Saunders regarding Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order - re # 191 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order)(Saunders, Robert)
April 30, 2014 Filing 195 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs First Request For Production Of Documents To Defendant William North and Lead Plaintiffs First Request For Production Of Documents To Defendants Carolyn S. Burger, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, Rex L. Mears, Gailen Krug, Stacey J. Mobley, Michele M. Rollins, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr., and Susan D. Whiting filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Naylor, A.)
April 28, 2014 Filing 194 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs First Request For Production Of Documents To the Underwriter Defendants filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Naylor, A.)
April 23, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs First Request For Production Of Documents To Defendant KPMG filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Naylor, A.)
April 22, 2014 Filing 192 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs First Request For Production Of Documents To Defendants Wilmington Trust, Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Jr., and Kevyn N. Rakowski filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.(Naylor, A.)
April 22, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ivan Knauer for Louis J. Freeh added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
April 17, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew D. Foster for Louis J. Freeh added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
April 11, 2014 Filing 191 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Robert S. Saunders, Esquire regarding pretrial schedule - re SO ORDERED, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s),,,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (pretrial schedule))(Saunders, Robert)
April 10, 2014 Filing 190 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ivan B. Knauer - filed by Carolyn S. Burger, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Michele M. Rollins, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chuff, Christopher)
April 10, 2014 Filing 189 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew D. Foster - filed by Carolyn S. Burger, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Michele M. Rollins, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chuff, Christopher)
April 10, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Carolyn S. Burger, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Michele M. Rollins, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting: Entry of appearance of attorney M. Duncan Grant. Attorney Robert S. Saunders, Thomas J. Allingham II, Stephen D. Dargitz, and Daniel R. Ciarrocki terminated. (Grant, M.)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 189 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew D. Foster filed by Louis J. Freeh, Donald E. Foley, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr., R. Keith Elliott, Susan D. Whiting, Gailen Krug, Stacey J. Mobley, Carolyn S. Burger, Rex L. Mears, Michele M. Rollins, Oliver R. Sockwell, # 190 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ivan B. Knauer filed by Louis J. Freeh, Donald E. Foley, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr., R. Keith Elliott, Susan D. Whiting, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Carolyn S. Burger, Stacey J. Mobley, Michele M. Rollins, Oliver R. Sockwell. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/10/2014. (fms)
April 4, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Erin E. Rota, Esquire, formerly of Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, as counsel for defendants J.P. Morgan Securities and Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc. by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. re SO ORDERED (Stachel, Matthew)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 186 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Answer the Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint to May 12, 2014 filed by Robert W. Tunnell, Jr., Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Michele M. Rollins, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr., Louis J. Freeh, Donald E. Foley, Wilmington Trust Corporation, R. Keith Elliott, Gailen Krug, Susan D. Whiting, Carolyn S. Burger, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Stacey J. Mobley, Rex L. Mears, Oliver R. Sockwell, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Carolyn S. Burger answer due 5/12/2014; Ted T. Cecala answer due 5/12/2014; R. Keith Elliott answer due 5/12/2014; Donald E. Foley answer due 5/12/2014; Louis J. Freeh answer due 5/12/2014; David R. Gibson answer due 5/12/2014; Robert V. A. Harra, Jr answer due 5/12/2014; J.P. Morgan Securities answer due 5/12/2014; KPMG LLP answer due 5/12/2014; Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. answer due 5/12/2014; Gailen Krug answer due 5/12/2014; Rex L. Mears answer due 5/12/2014; Stacey J. Mobley answer due 5/12/2014; William North answer due 5/12/2014; Kevyn N. Rakowski answer due 5/12/2014; Michele M. Rollins answer due 5/12/2014; Oliver R. Sockwell answer due 5/12/2014; Robert W. Tunnell, Jr answer due 5/12/2014; Susan D. Whiting answer due 5/12/2014; Wilmington Trust Corporation answer due 5/12/2014. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/4/2014. (fms)
April 2, 2014 Filing 186 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Answer the Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint to May 12, 2014 - filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Saunders, Robert)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER denying # 158 Motion to Dismiss ; denying # 160 Motion to Dismiss ; granting # 162 Motion to Dismiss ; denying # 164 Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and denying in part # 166 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/20/2014. (nmfn)
March 20, 2014 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/20/2014. (nmfn)
September 19, 2013 Filing 183 REQUEST for Oral Argument by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. re # 160 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FOURTH AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT . (Norman, Stephen)
September 18, 2013 Filing 182 REQUEST for Oral Argument by William North re # 158 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Wilks, David)
September 18, 2013 Filing 181 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation re # 166 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint . (Saunders, Robert)
September 18, 2013 Filing 180 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System re # 160 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FOURTH AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT , # 164 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , # 166 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint , # 158 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , # 162 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim /Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont . (Naylor, A.)
September 17, 2013 Filing 179 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Thomas DuPont re # 162 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim /Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(O'Neill, James)
September 13, 2013 Filing 178 REPLY BRIEF re # 166 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Saunders, Robert)
September 13, 2013 Filing 177 REPLY BRIEF re # 158 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by William North. (Wilks, David)
September 13, 2013 Filing 176 REPLY BRIEF re # 160 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FOURTH AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Stachel, Matthew)
September 13, 2013 Filing 175 REQUEST for Oral Argument by KPMG LLP re # 164 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gibson, Virginia)
September 13, 2013 Filing 174 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of KPMG LLP's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint by KPMG LLP re # 173 Reply Brief (Gibson, Virginia)
September 13, 2013 Filing 173 REPLY BRIEF re # 164 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by KPMG LLP. (Gibson, Virginia)
September 12, 2013 Filing 172 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 162 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim /Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont // Reply in Further Support of Thomas L. Dupont's Motion to Dismiss filed by Thomas DuPont. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(O'Neill, James)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 171 Stipulation Regarding the Wilmington Trust Defendants' Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/12/2013. (nmfn)
September 11, 2013 Filing 171 STIPULATION extending page limit for the reply brief of the Wilmington Trust Defendants in support of their motion to dismiss the FAC to 30 pages re # 166 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Saunders, Robert)
September 4, 2013 Filing 170 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from A. Zachary Naylor regarding the Proposed Complex Case Scheduling Order filed in CA 10-01114-SLR. (Naylor, A.)
August 15, 2013 Filing 169 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 160 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FOURTH AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT , # 164 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , # 166 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint , # 158 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , # 162 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim /Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/26/2013. (Naylor, A.)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 156 Stipulation filed by KPMG LLP, Set Briefing Schedule: re # 164 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , # 158 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , # 166 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint , # 162 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim /Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont , # 160 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FOURTH AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT . (Answering Brief due 8/15/2013., Reply Brief due 9/13/2013.) See Stipulation for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/19/2013. (fms)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 157 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Rizio-Hamilton filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/18/2013. (fms)
July 18, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lauren A. Ormsbee for Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 18, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven B. Singer for Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 18, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stefanie J. Sundel,John J. Rizio-Hamilton for Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 17, 2013 Filing 168 DECLARATION re # 167 Opening Brief in Support,, Transmittal Declaration of Robert S. Saunders by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Exhibit 3-9, # 3 Exhibit 10-14, # 4 Exhibit 15-20, # 5 Exhibit 21-24)(Saunders, Robert)
July 17, 2013 Filing 167 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 166 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, Timothy Rooney, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/5/2013. (Saunders, Robert)
July 17, 2013 Filing 166 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint - filed by Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Saunders, Robert)
July 17, 2013 Filing 165 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 164 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by KPMG LLP.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gibson, Virginia)
July 17, 2013 Filing 164 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gibson, Virginia)
July 17, 2013 Filing 163 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 162 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim /Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont /Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont filed by Thomas DuPont.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service and Service List)(O'Neill, James)
July 17, 2013 Filing 162 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim /Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont - filed by Thomas DuPont. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service and Service List)(O'Neill, James)
July 17, 2013 Filing 161 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 160 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FOURTH AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/5/2013. (Norman, Stephen)
July 17, 2013 Filing 160 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FOURTH AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT - filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Norman, Stephen)
July 17, 2013 Filing 159 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 158 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by William North.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/5/2013. (Wilks, David)
July 17, 2013 Filing 158 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by William North. (Wilks, David)
July 17, 2013 Filing 157 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Rizio-Hamilton - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
July 16, 2013 Filing 156 STIPULATION Regarding the Expansion of Page Limits re # 143 Stipulation,, SO ORDERED,, by KPMG LLP. (Gibson, Virginia)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 155 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney ALEXANDRA C. PITNEY, ESQUIRE filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/25/2013. (fms)
June 21, 2013 Filing 155 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney ALEXANDRA C. PITNEY, ESQUIRE - filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Stachel, Matthew)
June 21, 2013 Filing 154 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF DAVID F.E. TEJTEL, ESQUIRE FOR DEFENDANTS J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES AND KEEFE, BRUYETTE & WOODS, INC. by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. re SO ORDERED,,,,, (Stachel, Matthew)
June 20, 2013 Filing 153 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Transmitting a Disk Including Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint with Embedded Hyperlinks to Exhibits. (Naylor, A.)
June 13, 2013 Filing 152 EXHIBIT re # 150 Declaration, Exhibits 20-33 to Ross Declaration by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
June 13, 2013 Filing 151 EXHIBIT re # 150 Declaration, Exhibits 6-8 to Ross Declaration by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9-19 to Ross Declaration)(Naylor, A.)
June 13, 2013 Filing 150 DECLARATION re # 149 Amended Complaint, Declaration of Hannah Ross in Support of the Fourth Amended and Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4 to Ross Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 5 to Ross Declaration)(Naylor, A.)
June 13, 2013 Filing 149 FOURTH AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System.(fms) Modified on 6/13/2013 (fms).
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 144 MOTION to Amend/Correct Lead Plaintiffs Motion to Supplement and Amend the Third Amended and Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/13/2013. (fms)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 146 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven B. Singer filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, # 148 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren McMillen Ormsbee filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, # 147 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stefanie J. Sundel filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/13/2013. (fms)
June 12, 2013 Filing 148 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren McMillen Ormsbee - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
June 12, 2013 Filing 147 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stefanie J. Sundel - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
June 12, 2013 Filing 146 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven B. Singer - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
June 11, 2013 Filing 145 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Informing the Court that Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement and Amend the Third Amended Consolidated Securities Class Complaint (DI 144) is Unopposed. (Naylor, A.)
June 7, 2013 Filing 144 MOTION to Amend/Correct Lead Plaintiffs Motion to Supplement and Amend the Third Amended and Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Proposed Fourth Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Redline, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Naylor, A.)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 143 Stipulation Suspending MOtion to Dismiss Briefing in Anticipation of Lead Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion for Leave to Supplement and /or Amend filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. (See Stipulation for further details and deadlines). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/4/2013. (fms)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 142 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Molly T. Cusson filed by Thomas DuPont. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/29/2013. (fms)
May 28, 2013 Filing 143 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Suspend Motion to Dismiss Briefing in Anticipation of Lead Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion for Leave to Supplement and/or Amend and to Extend Page Limits for Briefing Motions to Dismiss the Forthcoming Amended Pleading by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
May 24, 2013 Filing 142 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Molly T. Cusson - filed by Thomas DuPont. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(O'Neill, James)
May 24, 2013 Filing 141 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney (George Kostolampros) by Thomas DuPont (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(O'Neill, James)
April 25, 2013 Filing 140 DECLARATION re # 139 Answering Brief in Opposition,,, Declaration of A. Zachary Naylor by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 and 2)(Naylor, A.)
April 25, 2013 Filing 139 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 133 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Third Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint , # 125 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. duPont] , # 126 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , # 128 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT , # 129 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/6/2013. (Naylor, A.)
April 24, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Adam Hollander for Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund added for electronic noticing. (els)
April 1, 2013 Filing 138 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam Hollander - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 138 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam Hollander filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/1/2013. (fms)
March 5, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Stachel on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. (Stachel, Matthew)
March 1, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: The memorandum in support attached to D.I. # 125 has been deleted as an attachment to D.I. # 125 and docketed using the appropriate docket code. (fms)
February 28, 2013 Filing 136 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 125 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. duPont] filed by Thomas DuPont.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(fms)
February 28, 2013 Filing 135 DECLARATION re # 134 Opening Brief in Support,, Transmittal Declaration of Robert S. Saunders by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Exhibit 3-4, # 3 Exhibit 5-11, # 4 Exhibit 12-20, # 5 Exhibit 21-24, # 6 Exhibit 25-29)(Saunders, Robert)
February 28, 2013 Filing 134 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 133 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Third Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/18/2013. (Saunders, Robert)
February 28, 2013 Filing 133 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Third Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint - filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Saunders, Robert)
February 28, 2013 Filing 132 DECLARATION re # 128 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF DAVID F.E. TEJTEL IN SUPPORT OF UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Norman, Stephen)
February 28, 2013 Filing 131 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 128 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/18/2013. (Norman, Stephen)
February 28, 2013 Filing 130 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 129 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by William North.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/18/2013. (Wilks, David)
February 28, 2013 Filing 129 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by William North. (Wilks, David)
February 28, 2013 Filing 128 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT - filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Norman, Stephen)
February 28, 2013 Filing 127 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 126 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by KPMG LLP.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gibson, Virginia)
February 28, 2013 Filing 126 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gibson, Virginia)
February 28, 2013 Filing 125 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. duPont] - filed by Thomas DuPont. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Service)(O'Neill, James)
February 26, 2013 Filing 124 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erin E. Rota - filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Norman, Stephen)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 124 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erin E. Rota filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/26/2013. (fms)
January 14, 2013 Filing 123 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Transmitting a Disk Including Plaintiffs' Third Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint with Embedded Hyperlinks to Exhibits. (Naylor, A.)
January 10, 2013 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, the PDF for Exhibits 9-19 to D.I. 121 has been deleted and replaced. (fms)
January 9, 2013 Filing 122 NOTICE of Filing of Third Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System (Naylor, A.)
January 9, 2013 Filing 121 DECLARATION of Hannah Ross in Support of Third Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5, # 2 Exhibit 6-8, # 3 Exhibit 9-19, # 4 Exhibit 20-29)(Naylor, A.) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/10/2013) (fms).
January 9, 2013 Filing 120 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint (with Appendices A and B) against All Defendants - filed by Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association.(Naylor, A.)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 119 Stipulation Scheduling Stipulation and Proposed Order Governing Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend and Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Third Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint re 116 MOTION to Amend/Correct Lead Plaintiffs Motion To Supplement And Amend The Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint, filed by Robert W. Tunnell, Jr., Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Michele M. Rollins, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr., Louis J. Freeh, David P. Roselle, Donald E. Foley, Wilmington Trust Corporation, R. Keith Elliott, Gailen Krug, Susan D. Whiting, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Stacey J. Mobley, Carolyn S. Burger, Rex L. Mears, Oliver R. Sockwell. 1. Lead Plaintiffs shall file the TAC promptly after Court approval of this stipulation. 2. Defendants shall file motions to dismiss the TAC and briefs in support thereof on or before February 28, 2013. 3. Lead Plaintiffs shall file their answering brief in opposition to Defendantsmotions to dismiss the TAC on or before April 25, 2013. 4. Defendants shall file their reply briefs in further support of their motions todismiss the TAC on or before May 30, 2013. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/9/2013. (fms)
January 7, 2013 Filing 119 STIPULATION Scheduling Stipulation and Proposed Order Governing Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend and Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Third Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint re # 116 MOTION to Amend/Correct Lead Plaintiffs Motion To Supplement And Amend The Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Saunders, Robert)
December 7, 2012 Filing 118 DECLARATION Declaration Of A. Zachary Naylor In Support Of Lead Plaintiffs Motion To Supplement And Amend The Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint (with Exhibits A and B) by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
December 7, 2012 Filing 117 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 116 MOTION to Amend/Correct Lead Plaintiffs Motion To Supplement And Amend The Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/26/2012. (Naylor, A.)
December 7, 2012 Filing 116 MOTION to Amend/Correct Lead Plaintiffs Motion To Supplement And Amend The Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Redline)(Naylor, A.)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 115 Stipulation to Suspend Motion to Dismiss Briefing in Anticipation of Lead Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion for Leave to Supplement , filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/16/2012. (nmfn)
November 15, 2012 Filing 115 STIPULATION to Suspend Motion to Dismiss Briefing in Anticipation of Lead Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion for Leave to Supplement by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 114 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to FILE their Reply Briefs in Further Support of their Motions to Dismiss to November 16, 2012 filed by Robert W. Tunnell, Jr., Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Michele M. Rollins, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr., Louis J. Freeh, David P. Roselle, Donald E. Foley, Wilmington Trust Corporation, R. Keith Elliott, Gailen Krug, Susan D. Whiting, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Stacey J. Mobley, Carolyn S. Burger, Rex L. Mears, Oliver R. Sockwell, Set Briefing Schedule: re # 99 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , # 93 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont, # 95 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon the Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint, # 103 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint , # 100 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT . (Reply Brief due 11/16/2012.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/6/2012. (fms)
November 5, 2012 Filing 114 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to FILE their Reply Briefs in Further Support of their Motions to Dismiss to November 16, 2012 - filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Saunders, Robert)
October 1, 2012 Filing 113 DECLARATION of A. Zachary Naylor in Support of Lead Plaintiffs Omnibus Opposition To Defendants Motions To Dismiss The Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Naylor, A.)
October 1, 2012 Filing 112 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 95 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon the Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint, # 103 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint , # 99 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , # 93 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont, # 100 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/12/2012. (Naylor, A.)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 111 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Lead Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint and to file Defendants' Reply Briefs in Further Support. Set Briefing Schedule: re # 99 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , # 93 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont, # 95 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon the Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint, # 103 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint , # 100 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT . (Answering Brief due 10/1/2012., Reply Briefs due 11/5/2012.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/31/2012. (nmfn)
August 30, 2012 Filing 111 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Lead Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint and to file Defendants' Reply Briefs in Further Support of their Motions to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint to October 1, 2012 and November 5, 2012, respectively, from September 21, 2012 and October 26, 2012, respectively - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.) (Main Document 111 replaced on 8/30/2012) (fms).
August 30, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 111 has been removed and replaced with a version that contains a so ordered line. (fms)
August 21, 2012 Filing 110 REQUEST for Oral Argument by KPMG LLP re # 95 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon the Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint. (Gibson, Virginia)
August 6, 2012 Filing 109 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation re # 103 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint . (Saunders, Robert)
August 3, 2012 Filing 108 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Thomas DuPont re # 93 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hehn, Curtis)
July 30, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: The opening briefs attached to D.I. Nos. 93 and 99 have been deleted from the motion entries and have been docketed separately. MOTIONS and BRIEFS should be filed as two separate documents using twoseparate docket codes. Standard briefing on a motion should utilize the codes Motion, Brief-Opening Brief in Support, Brief-Answering Brief in Opposition and Brief-Reply. Also, for future filings, certificates of service should be included as either the last page of the main document or asan attachment to the main document. (fms)
July 30, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of D.I. # 101 has been replaced with a corrected version per request of filer. (nmfn)
July 27, 2012 Filing 107 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 99 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by William North.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/13/2012. (fms)
July 27, 2012 Filing 106 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 93 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont filed by Thomas DuPont.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(fms)
July 27, 2012 Filing 105 DECLARATION re # 104 Opening Brief in Support,, Transmittal Declaration of Robert S. Saunders by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Exhibit 3-4, # 3 Exhibit 5-11, # 4 Exhibit 12-20, # 5 Exhibit 21-24)(Saunders, Robert)
July 27, 2012 Filing 104 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 103 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/13/2012. (Saunders, Robert)
July 27, 2012 Filing 103 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint - filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Saunders, Robert)
July 27, 2012 Filing 102 DECLARATION re # 100 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF DAVID F.E. TEJTEL by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Norman, Stephen)
July 27, 2012 Filing 101 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 100 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/13/2012. (Norman, Stephen) (Main Document 101 replaced on 7/30/2012) (nmfn, ).
July 27, 2012 Filing 100 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT - filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Norman, Stephen)
July 27, 2012 Filing 99 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by William North. (Wilks, David) Modified on 7/30/2012 (fms).
July 27, 2012 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Dismiss, Opening Brief, Declaration by KPMG LLP re # 95 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon the Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint, # 96 Opening Brief in Support, # 97 Declaration, (Gibson, Virginia)
July 27, 2012 Filing 97 DECLARATION re # 95 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon the Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint, # 96 Opening Brief in Support by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Gibson, Virginia)
July 27, 2012 Filing 96 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 95 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon the Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint filed by KPMG LLP.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/13/2012. (Gibson, Virginia)
July 27, 2012 Filing 95 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon the Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint - filed by KPMG LLP. (Gibson, Virginia)
July 27, 2012 Filing 94 APPENDIX re # 93 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont by Thomas DuPont. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hehn, Curtis)
July 27, 2012 Filing 93 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont - filed by Thomas DuPont. (Attachments: # 2 Certificate of Service)(Hehn, Curtis) Modified on 7/30/2012 (fms).
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 92 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Motions to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and briefs in support and in opposition thereto. (See Stipulation for further details) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/12/2012. (fms)
July 6, 2012 Filing 92 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Motions to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and briefs in support and in opposition thereto to July 27, 2012 - filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Saunders, Robert)
May 22, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of the Second Amended Complaint (D.I. # 88 ) has been deleted and replaced with a version with the corrections made in the three footnotes identified in the 5/18/2012 letter (D.I. # 91 ). (fms)
May 18, 2012 Filing 91 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Delivery to Chambers and Defendants' Counsel an Electronic Copy of the Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint with Embedded Links to Source Documents. (Naylor, A.)
May 10, 2012 Filing 90 NOTICE of Filing of Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System (Naylor, A.)
May 10, 2012 Filing 89 DECLARATION re # 88 Amended Complaint, Declaration of Hannah Ross in Support of the Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29)(Naylor, A.)
May 10, 2012 Filing 88 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint against All Defendants - filed by Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Naylor, A.) (Main Document 88 replaced on 5/22/2012) (fms).
April 27, 2012 Filing 87 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To File Amended Complaint and to Respond to Amended Complaint to May 10, 2012 and July 9, 2012, respectively - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Cramer, Tiffany)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 87 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To File Amended Complaint and to Respond to Amended Complaint to May 10, 2012 and July 9, 2012, respectively filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/27/2012. (fms)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting # 49 Motion to Dismiss ; granting # 50 Motion to Dismiss ; granting # 52 Motion to Dismiss ; granting # 58 Motion to Dismiss ; granting # 61 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs have until April 30, 2012 to file their amended complaint. Failure to comply with this order shall result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/29/2012. (nmf)
March 29, 2012 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/29/2012. (nmf)
November 4, 2011 Filing 84 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation re # 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint . (Saunders, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 83 Supplemental DECLARATION re # 82 Reply Brief, Supplemental Transmittal Declaration of Daniel R. Ciarrocki in Support of Reply Brief of the Wilmington Trust Defendants in Further Support of Their Motion to Dismiss by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 35)(Saunders, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 82 REPLY BRIEF re # 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Saunders, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 81 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation for Wilmington Trust Corporation.. (Saunders, Robert)
November 3, 2011 Filing 80 REQUEST for Oral Argument by William North re # 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Wilks, David)
November 3, 2011 Filing 79 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Thomas DuPont re # 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont] . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hehn, Curtis)
November 3, 2011 Filing 78 REQUEST for Oral Argument by KPMG LLP re # 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Gibson, Virginia)
November 3, 2011 Filing 77 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System re # 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, # 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont] , # 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, # 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint , # 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT . (Naylor, A.)
October 31, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: The certificate of service for D.I. Nos. 75 and 76 (formerly D.I. No. 77) has been deleted from the docket as a separate entry and has been attached to D.I. Nos. 75 and 76. A certificate of service should be included as either the last page of the main document or as an attachment to the main document. (fms)
October 27, 2011 Filing 76 DECLARATION re # 75 Reply Brief by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Gibson, Virginia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2011: # 3 certificate of service) (fms).
October 27, 2011 Filing 75 REPLY BRIEF re # 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by KPMG LLP. (Gibson, Virginia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2011: # 1 certificate of service) (fms).
October 27, 2011 Filing 74 REQUEST for Oral Argument by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. re # 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT . (Norman, Stephen)
October 27, 2011 Filing 73 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Norman, Stephen)
October 27, 2011 Filing 72 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Broker-Dealer Holdings Inc. for J.P. Morgan Securities.. (Norman, Stephen)
October 27, 2011 Filing 71 DECLARATION re # 70 Reply Brief, Supplemental Declaration of David F.E. Tejtel in Support of Underwriter Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Norman, Stephen)
October 27, 2011 Filing 70 REPLY BRIEF re # 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT Underwriter Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Norman, Stephen)
October 27, 2011 Filing 69 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by William North. (Wilks, David)
October 27, 2011 Filing 68 REPLY BRIEF re # 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont] [Reply in Further Support of Thomas L. DuPont's Motion to Dismiss] filed by Thomas DuPont. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hehn, Curtis)
October 26, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: The "so ordered" of D.I. 67 was docketed incorrectly and has been corrected. (fms)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 67 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to FILE the Reply Brief in further support of WT Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to November 4, 2011 filed by Robert W. Tunnell, Jr., Ted T. Cecala, David R. Gibson, Michele M. Rollins, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr., Louis J. Freeh, David P. Roselle, Donald E. Foley, Wilmington Trust Corporation, R. Keith Elliott, Gailen Krug, Susan D. Whiting, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Stacey J. Mobley, Carolyn S. Burger, Rex L. Mears, Oliver R. Sockwell, Set Briefing Schedule: re # 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint . (Reply Brief due 11/4/2011.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/26/2011. (fms)
October 25, 2011 Filing 67 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to FILE the Reply Brief in further support of WT Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to November 4, 2011 - filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Saunders, Robert)
September 12, 2011 Filing 66 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, # 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont] , # 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, # 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint , # 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT Lead Plaintiffs Omnibus Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix A to Plaintiffs' Brief)(Naylor, A.)
August 22, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kevin T. Baumann for KPMG LLP added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
August 22, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter J. Dennin,George A. Salter for KPMG LLP added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 64 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter J. Dennin filed by KPMG LLP, # 63 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George A. Salter filed by KPMG LLP, # 65 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin T. Baumann filed by KPMG LLP. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/9/2011. (fms)
August 5, 2011 Filing 65 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin T. Baumann - filed by KPMG LLP. (Gibson, Virginia)
August 5, 2011 Filing 64 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter J. Dennin - filed by KPMG LLP. (Gibson, Virginia)
August 5, 2011 Filing 63 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George A. Salter - filed by KPMG LLP. (Gibson, Virginia)
August 1, 2011 Case Reassigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00990-SLR, 1:10-cv-00995-SLR, 1:10-cv-01020-SLR(rjb)
July 29, 2011 Filing 62 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by William North.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2011. (Wilks, David)
July 29, 2011 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by William North. (Wilks, David)
July 28, 2011 Filing 60 DECLARATION re # 59 Opening Brief in Support,, Transmittal Declaration of Daniel R. Ciarrocki by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4-7, # 3 Exhibit 8-11, # 4 Exhibit 12-13, # 5 Exhibit 14-15, # 6 Exhibit 16-18, # 7 Exhibit 19-20, # 8 Exhibit 21-34)(Saunders, Robert)
July 28, 2011 Filing 59 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2011. (Saunders, Robert)
July 28, 2011 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint - filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Saunders, Robert)
July 27, 2011 Filing 57 DECLARATION re # 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF DAVID F.E. TEJTEL IN SUPPORT OF THE UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-J)(Norman, Stephen)
July 27, 2011 Filing 56 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2011. (Norman, Stephen)
July 27, 2011 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of by KPMG LLP re # 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, # 51 Opening Brief in Support, # 47 Notice of Appearance, # 54 Declaration, # 48 Disclosure Statement (Gibson, Virginia)
July 27, 2011 Filing 54 DECLARATION re # 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Gibson, Virginia)
July 27, 2011 Filing 53 APPENDIX re # 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont] by Thomas DuPont. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Part 2)(Hehn, Curtis)
July 27, 2011 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Thomas L. DuPont] - filed by Thomas DuPont. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Hehn, Curtis)
July 27, 2011 Filing 51 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by KPMG LLP.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2011. (Gibson, Virginia)
July 27, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by KPMG LLP. (Gibson, Virginia)
July 27, 2011 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT - filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Norman, Stephen)
July 27, 2011 Filing 48 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by KPMG LLP. (Gibson, Virginia)
July 27, 2011 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Gibson on behalf of KPMG LLP (Gibson, Virginia)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Page Limit (D.I. # 42 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Opening Brief in Support of their Motion to Dismiss may not exceed sixty (60) pages. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have until July 29, 2011 to file their motion and brief. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/27/11. (ntl)
July 27, 2011 Filing 45 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Douglas Baldridge - filed by Thomas DuPont. (Jones, Laura)
July 27, 2011 Filing 44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George Kostolampros - filed by Thomas DuPont. (Jones, Laura)
July 27, 2011 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Davis Jones on behalf of Thomas DuPont (Jones, Laura)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 45 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Douglas Baldridge filed by Thomas DuPont, # 44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George Kostolampros filed by Thomas DuPont. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/27/11. (ntl)
July 21, 2011 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of the Opening Brief of the Wilmington Trust Defendants in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss - filed by Carolyn S. Burger, Ted T. Cecala, R. Keith Elliott, Donald E. Foley, Louis J. Freeh, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Gailen Krug, Rex L. Mears, Stacey J. Mobley, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Michele M. Rollins, David P. Roselle, Oliver R. Sockwell, Robert W. Tunnell, Jr, Susan D. Whiting, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting the Wilmington Trust Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Page Limit)(Saunders, Robert)
May 26, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Maya S. Saxena,Joseph E. White,Brandon Grzandziel,Lester Hooker for Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
May 25, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Katherine M. Sinderson,Hannah G. Ross,Kristin A. Meister,Sean O'Dowd for Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
May 17, 2011 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. KPMG LLP served on 5/17/2011, answer due 6/7/2011. (Naylor, A.)
May 17, 2011 Summons Issued as to KPMG LLP on 5/17/2011. (lid)
May 16, 2011 Filing 40 NOTICE of Filing Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System (Naylor, A.)
May 16, 2011 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Securites Class Action Complaint against All Defendants - filed by Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certifications of Lead Plaintiffs, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Naylor, A.)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lester R. Hooker filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, # 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas C. Rice, Esquire and David F.E. Tejtel, Esquire filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc., # 34 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maya Saxena filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, # 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brandon Grzandziel filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, # 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph E. White III filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/9/11. (ntl)
May 6, 2011 Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas C. Rice, Esquire and David F.E. Tejtel, Esquire - filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.. (Norman, Stephen)
May 6, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pro Hac Motion originally uploaded as d.i. 38 deleted per counsel's telephone request on 5/6/2011. (rpg)
May 5, 2011 Filing 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph E. White III - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
May 5, 2011 Filing 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brandon Grzandziel - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
May 5, 2011 Filing 35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lester R. Hooker - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
May 5, 2011 Filing 34 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maya Saxena - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re # 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine M. Sinderson filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, # 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kristin Ann Meister filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, # 33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean O'Dowd filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, # 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Hanna G. Ross filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Merced County Employees Retirement Association. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/5/11. (ntl)
May 4, 2011 Filing 33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean O'Dowd - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
May 4, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kristin Ann Meister - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
May 4, 2011 Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine M. Sinderson - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
May 4, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Hanna G. Ross - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Naylor, A.)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Approving # 28 Joint Motion to Establish a Schedule for Filing the Consolidated Amended Complaint and Responses. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/22/11. (ntl)
March 21, 2011 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order Agreed Joint Motion to Establish a Schedule for Filing the Consolidated Amended Complaint and Responses - filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Naylor, A.)
March 9, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Kornitzer Capital Management, Inc. (Farnan, Brian)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Appointing The Institutional Investor Group as Lead Plaintiff, Approving Its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel, and Consolidating All Related Actions: All papers shall be filed in Lead Case No. 10-990-LPS. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/7/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00990-LPS, 1:10-cv-00995-LPS, 1:10-cv-01020-LPS(ntl)
March 3, 2011 Filing 25 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Submission of Proposed Order appointing lead Plaintiff, lead counsel, consolidating the actions and setting a deadline for submission of a scheduling order. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Naylor, A.)
February 22, 2011 Filing 24 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from A. Zachary Naylor regarding Insitutional Investor Group's Withdrawal of its Previous Request for Oral Argument - re (12 in 1:10-cv-00990-LPS, 8 in 1:10-cv-00995-LPS, 6 in 1:10-cv-01020-LPS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of the institutional investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions . (Naylor, A.)
February 14, 2011 Filing 23 DECLARATION re (12 in 1:10-cv-01020-LPS) Reply Brief,, (13 in 1:10-cv-01086-LPS) Reply Brief,, (14 in 1:10-cv-00995-LPS) Reply Brief,, (22 in 1:10-cv-00990-LPS) Reply Brief,, Reply Declaration of A. Zachary Naylor in Support of the Brief in Further Support of the Motion of the Institutional Investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Naylor, A.)
February 14, 2011 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF re # 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of the institutional investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions Reply Brief in Further Support of the Motion of the Institutional Investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Naylor, A.)
February 11, 2011 Filing 21 Notice of Withdraw of KORNITZER CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, INC.'S # 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Kornitzer Capital Management, Inc.'s Motion for Consolidation, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of its Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel - filed by Kornitzer Capital Management, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 2/11/2011 (rpg).
February 11, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: docket text to d.i. # 21 updated per counsel's request. (rpg)
February 4, 2011 Filing 20 DECLARATION re (10 in 1:10-cv-01020-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (19 in 1:10-cv-00990-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,,, (12 in 1:10-cv-00995-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, (10 in 1:10-cv-01086-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition,,, Declaration of A. Zachary Naylor in Support of the Brief in Further Support of the Motion of the Institutional Investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-P)(Naylor, A.)
February 4, 2011 Filing 19 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of FMA Advisory, Inc. and Keith Cordery for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel , # 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of the institutional investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions , # 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Kornitzer Capital Management, Inc.'s Motion for Consolidation, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of its Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel , # 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel Brief in Further Support of the Motion of the Institutional Investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions filed by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/14/2011. (Naylor, A.)
February 4, 2011 Filing 18 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re # 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of the institutional investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions filed by Kornitzer Capital Management, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/14/2011. (Farnan, Brian)
February 4, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE of Notice of Withdawal of the Motion of FMA Advisory, Inc. and Keith Cordrey for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by Keith Cordrey, FMA Advisory, Inc. re # 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of FMA Advisory, Inc. and Keith Cordery for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel (Gottesman, Brian)
February 4, 2011 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re # 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of FMA Advisory, Inc. and Keith Cordery for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel , # 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of the institutional investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions , # 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Kornitzer Capital Management, Inc.'s Motion for Consolidation, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of its Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Public Pension Funds. (Azar, Christine)
January 18, 2011 Filing 15 STATEMENT re # 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Kornitzer Capital Management, Inc.'s Motion for Consolidation, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of its Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel by Kornitzer Capital Management, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
January 18, 2011 Filing 14 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of the institutional investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions filed by Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/4/2011. (Naylor, A.)
January 18, 2011 Filing 13 DECLARATION re (8 in 1:10-cv-00995-LPS, 5 in 1:10-cv-01086-LPS, 6 in 1:10-cv-01020-LPS, 12 in 1:10-cv-00990-LPS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of the institutional investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions Declaration of A. Zachary Naylor in Support of Motion of the institutional investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions by Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Naylor, A.)
January 18, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of the institutional investor Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidation of All Related Actions - filed by Merced County Employees Retirement Association, Coral Springs Police Pension Fund, St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System, Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Rule 7.1.1 Statement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Naylor, A.)
January 18, 2011 Filing 11 DECLARATION re # 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Kornitzer Capital Management, Inc.'s Motion for Consolidation, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of its Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel by Kornitzer Capital Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Farnan, Brian)
January 18, 2011 Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Kornitzer Capital Management, Inc.'s Motion for Consolidation, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of its Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Kornitzer Capital Management, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/4/2011. (Farnan, Brian)
January 18, 2011 Filing 9 STATEMENT re # 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Public Pension Funds. (Azar, Christine)
January 18, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Kornitzer Capital Management, Inc.'s Motion for Consolidation, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of its Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel - filed by Kornitzer Capital Management, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
January 18, 2011 Filing 7 DECLARATION re # 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Public Pension Funds. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Azar, Christine)
January 18, 2011 Filing 6 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Public Pension Funds.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/4/2011. (Azar, Christine)
January 18, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Public Pension Funds. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Azar, Christine)
January 18, 2011 Filing 4 OPENING BRIEF in Support re # 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of FMA Advisory, Inc. and Keith Cordery for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of FMA Advisory, Inc and Keith Cordrey for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Keith Cordrey, FMA Advisory, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/4/2011. (Gottesman, Brian)
January 18, 2011 Filing 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion of FMA Advisory, Inc. and Keith Cordery for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel - filed by FMA Advisory, Inc., Keith Cordrey. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of John G. Harris, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of John G. Harris, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of John G. Harris, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of John G. Harris, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of John G. Harris)(Gottesman, Brian)
November 24, 2010 Case assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 19, 2010 No Summons Issued (dmp, )
November 18, 2010 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dmp, )
November 18, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Ted T. Cecala, Donald E. Foley, David R. Gibson, Robert V. A. Harra, Jr, Kevyn N. Rakowski, Wilmington Trust Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 311-810314.) - filed by Pipefitters Local 537 Annuity Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Of Named Plaintiff, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Wilmington Trust Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Vera Gerrit Belger
Represented By: Tiffany Joanne Cramer
Represented By: Richard D. Gluck
Represented By: Brandon Grzandziel
Represented By: Lester Hooker
Represented By: Lauren A. McMillen-Ormsbee
Represented By: Jacob Nachmani
Represented By: A. Zachary Naylor
Represented By: Hannah G. Ross
Represented By: Maya S. Saxena
Represented By: Katherine M. Sinderson
Represented By: Jonathan M. Stein
Represented By: Kathryn W. Weidner
Represented By: Joseph E. White
Represented By: Adam Hollander
Represented By: Kristin A. Meister
Represented By: Sean O'Dowd
Represented By: John Rizio-Hamilton
Represented By: Steven B. Singer
Represented By: Stefanie J. Sundel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coral Springs Police Pension Fund
Represented By: Vera Gerrit Belger
Represented By: Tiffany Joanne Cramer
Represented By: A. Zachary Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Elzagha
Represented By: Norman M. Monhait
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merced County Employees Retirement Association
Represented By: Vera Gerrit Belger
Represented By: Tiffany Joanne Cramer
Represented By: A. Zachary Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipefitters Local 537 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Norman M. Monhait
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pompano Beach General Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Vera Gerrit Belger
Represented By: Tiffany Joanne Cramer
Represented By: A. Zachary Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Rooney
Represented By: A. Zachary Naylor
Represented By: Robert J. Kriner, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela S. Tikellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Petersburg Firefighters Retirement System
Represented By: Vera Gerrit Belger
Represented By: Tiffany Joanne Cramer
Represented By: A. Zachary Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn S. Burger
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted T. Cecala
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Christina Louise Golden
Represented By: Matthew P. Majarian
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas DuPont
Represented By: Curtis A. Hehn
Represented By: Laura Davis Jones
Represented By: James E. O'Neill, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Keith Elliott
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Foley
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis J. Freeh
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Matthew D. Foster
Represented By: Ivan Knauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Gibson
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Christina Louise Golden
Represented By: Matthew P. Majarian
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert V. A. Harra, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Christina Louise Golden
Represented By: Matthew P. Majarian
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities
Represented By: Jaclyn C. Levy
Represented By: Stephen C. Norman
Represented By: Alexandra C Pitney
Represented By: Sara A. Ricciardi
Represented By: John Anderson Sensing
Represented By: Matthew D. Stachel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPMG LLP
Represented By: Kevin T. Baumann
Represented By: Peter J. Dennin
Represented By: Virginia Gibson
Represented By: Maxim M.L. Nowak
Represented By: George A. Salter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keefe, Bruyette & Woods Inc.
Represented By: Jaclyn C. Levy
Represented By: Stephen C. Norman
Represented By: John Anderson Sensing
Represented By: Matthew D. Stachel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gailen Krug
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex L. Mears
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey J. Mobley
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William North
Represented By: Andrea Schoch Brooks
Represented By: Laina M. Herbert
Represented By: Samuel Lee Moultrie
Represented By: David E. Wilks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Comptroller of the Currency
Represented By: Christopher A. Sterbenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevyn N. Rakowski
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Christina Louise Golden
Represented By: Matthew P. Majarian
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele M. Rollins
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P. Roselle
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver R. Sockwell
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Tunnell, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan D. Whiting
Represented By: Christopher Brian Chuff
Represented By: M. Duncan Grant
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust Corporation
Represented By: Thomas J. Allingham, II
Represented By: Stephen Dale Dargitz
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Christina Louise Golden
Represented By: Matthew P. Majarian
Represented By: Lori W. Will
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Edmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?